Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 07:25:59 (UTC).

CAREN JEFFERSON VS ALLIANCE GAS STATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 CAREN JEFFERSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALLIANCE GAS STATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0771

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAREN

Defendants

ALLIANCE GAS STATION

ABDELMALAK ADLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

YEAGER KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/14/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/30/2021: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2024
  • Hearing03/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Hearing09/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Caren Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Caren Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Caren Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Caren Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Caren Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Caren Jefferson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEAGER KENNETH