This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2020 at 20:29:12 (UTC).

CARBAJAL, KIMBERLY LYNN VS PEREZ, JOSEFINA

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 CARBAJAL, KIMBERLY LYNN filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against PEREZ, JOSEFINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DURON, ARMANDO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0244

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DURON, ARMANDO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARBAJAL KIMBERLY LYNN

Respondent

PEREZ JOSEFINA

 

Court Documents

Petition - Civil Harassment

2/11/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

2/11/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/11/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

2/11/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

2/13/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Proof of Service

2/21/2020: Proof of Service

Minute Order

3/3/2020: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

3/3/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department M, Duron, Armando, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.