This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2019 at 01:43:28 (UTC).

CAPITOL MEDIA PARTNERS LLC VS AVERON US INC

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 CAPITOL MEDIA PARTNERS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AVERON US INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5524

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CAPITAL MEDIA PARTNERS LLC

Respondents and Defendants

CLOUDWEAR INC.

AVERON US INC.

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

O'BRIEN ROBERT C.

Defendant Attorney

KULA DONALD J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

2/27/2018: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

SUMMONS

2/27/2018: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/8/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/19/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

6/15/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/8/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

DEFENDANT AVERON US, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CAPITOL MEDIA PARTNERS, LLC'S COMPLAINT

4/2/2018: DEFENDANT AVERON US, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CAPITOL MEDIA PARTNERS, LLC'S COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Capital Media Partners,LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Capital Media Partners,LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Capital Media Partners,LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Averon US, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT AVERON US, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CAPITOL MEDIA PARTNERS, LLC'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Capital Media Partners,LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Capital Media Partners,LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'BRIEN ROBERT CHARLES