This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 15:53:08 (UTC).

CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS BURGER BAR SAN FRANCISCO LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against BURGER BAR SAN FRANCISCO LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9463

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

RSG GROUP NORTH AMERICA LP.

MOTHER TONGUE SF LLC.

BURGER BAR SAN FRANCISCO LLC.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

BURGER BAR SAN FRANCISCO LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADLER JAMES E.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

ENGLAND BRIAN RAY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/24/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/2/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Cross-Complaint

7/21/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

7/20/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/17/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • Hearing11/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Capital Trust Escrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Capital Trust Escrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mother Tongue SF, LLC. (Cross-Complainant); RSG Group North America LP. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Capital Trust Escrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Mother Tongue SF, LLC. (Defendant); RSG Group North America LP. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mother Tongue SF, LLC. (Defendant); RSG Group North America LP. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Capital Trust Escrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Capital Trust Escrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Capital Trust Escrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Capital Trust Escrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Capital Trust Escrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Capital Trust Escrow (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPITAL TRUST ESCROW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENGLAND BRIAN RAY