This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 01:40:28 (UTC).

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC VS TEMPEST FREERUNNING ACADEMY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TEMPEST FREERUNNING ACADEMY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3781

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP LLC DBA THE ENTERPRISE ZONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1-10

HENSLEY HEATH

NUNEZ GABRIEL

KING RICHARD

ELSON DAVID

TEMPEST FREERUNNING ACADEMY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LOPEZ VICTOR

DARNELL PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN VINCENT S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/13/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/1/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer - PLEADING PAPER

12/24/2020: Answer - PLEADING PAPER

Notice of Ruling

3/30/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Settlement

6/28/2021: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Ruling

6/28/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

9/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/15/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice Of Continuance Of Case Management Conference); Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketPleading Paper; Filed by Tempest Freerunning Academy, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Gabriel Nunez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less