This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2022 at 00:13:30 (UTC).

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC VS PRIMARY & MULTI-SPECIALTY CLINICS OF ANAHEIM, INC., A CALIFORNIA COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRIMARY MULTI-SPECIALTY CLINICS OF ANAHEIM, INC , A CALIFORNIA COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7926

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP LLC DBA THE ENTERPRISE ZONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1-10

PRIMARY & MULTI-SPECIALTY CLINICS OF ANAHEIM INC. A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAMIR ROTEM

Defendant Attorney

OUTWATER DAVID

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/15/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/21/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Order

4/12/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

1/29/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

4/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by PRIMARY AND MULTI-SPECIALTY CLINICS OF ANAHEIM, INC. Erroneously Sued As Primary & Multi-Specialty Clinics Of Anaheim, Inc., a California company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by PRIMARY AND MULTI-SPECIALTY CLINICS OF ANAHEIM, INC. Erroneously Sued As Primary & Multi-Specialty Clinics Of Anaheim, Inc., a California company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PRIMARY AND MULTI-SPECIALTY CLINICS OF ANAHEIM, INC. Erroneously Sued As Primary & Multi-Specialty Clinics Of Anaheim, Inc., a California company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less