This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2021 at 17:14:03 (UTC).

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC VS FIRST CHOICE BANK, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FIRST CHOICE BANK, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4659

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP LLC DBA THE ENTERPRISE ZONE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

DOES 1 - 10

FIRST CHOICE BANK A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENAKOTE AMIR D.

Defendant Attorney

RHIM J. ALEXANDRA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/5/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/17/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/7/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

5/7/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/15/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

6/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/15/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/21/2021

10/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/21/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

10/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

10/21/2021: Notice of Settlement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • Docketat 1:51 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 09:20 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/15/2021, Final Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FIRST CHOICE BANK, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by FIRST CHOICE BANK, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less