This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2020 at 14:40:40 (UTC).

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS ONEX IMPORTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ONEX IMPORTS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1054

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA THE ENTERPRISE ZONE COMPANY

Defendant

ONEX IMPORTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAMIR ROTEM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

7/6/2020: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

7/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

6/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/4/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less