This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 00:53:56 (UTC).

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS APEX ATTORNEY SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against APEX ATTORNEY SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6664

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL CREDITS GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA THE ENTERPRISE ZONE COMPANY

Defendants

APEX ATTORNEY SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EULLOQUI JOSE M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GREEN VINCENT S.

TAMIR ROTEM

Defendant Attorneys

KNEAFSEY SEAN MARCO

SHIN JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/15/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/31/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/20/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

8/28/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/3/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/19/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/19/2020: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

9/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by APEX Attorney Services, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Jose M. Eulloqui (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by APEX Attorney Services, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Jose M. Eulloqui (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by APEX Attorney Services, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Jose M. Eulloqui (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Capital Credits Group, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less