Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 21:31:18 (UTC).

CAO, MEILING VS TSAO, WEI CHUN

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 CAO, MEILING filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TSAO, WEI CHUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8572

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAO MEILING

Respondent

TSAO WEI CHUN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons (personal ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Stipulation - Establish or Modify Child Support and Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 2A, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less