This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 02:35:33 (UTC).

CANDY LOPEZ VS UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 CANDY LOPEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9489

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

LOPEZ CANDY

TEFT DON

UNITED PARCEL SERVICE

DURAN RUBEN

VARGAS FAUSTO

STANFORD LA SHAWN

PRICE MORGAN

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-10

QUON RYAN

UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GILLILAND DOUGLAS S. ESQ.

HANRAHAN COREY P. ESQ.

GILLILAND DOUGLAS SCOTT ESQ.

HANRAHAN COREY PATRICK ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

YANG ARLENE R.

FODE STACY LYNNE ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KHANZADA MUHAMED T.

DARLING KAREN S.

Cross Defendant Attorney

ANDERSON DANIEL CHAD

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

8/13/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Proof of Service

8/29/2018: Proof of Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/30/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

12/20/2018: Answer

Summons

12/20/2018: Summons

Proof of Service by Mail

2/8/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order

3/18/2019: Minute Order

Order

3/18/2019: Order

Notice of Ruling

3/19/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice

4/2/2019: Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/2/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Opposition

5/6/2019: Opposition

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

5/6/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

5/7/2019: Minute Order

Notice

5/8/2019: Notice

Substitution of Attorney

5/29/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Reply

6/10/2019: Reply

Order

6/17/2019: Order

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Summons (on Amended Cross Complaint (1st)); Filed by Ryan Quon (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by United Parcel Service (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Clarification and Modification of March 18, 2019 Order ReUnited Parcel Service, Inc.'s Motion to Sever Cross-Complaint for Damages) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • amended cross-complaint; Filed by Ryan Quon (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Clarification and Modification of M...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Order (re motion for clarification)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Amended Complaint (1st cross- complaint); Filed by Ryan Quon (Cross-Complainant); Ryan Quon (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Reply (Cross-Defendant/Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc's Reply in Support of its Motion for Clarification and Modification of the March 18, 2019 Order); Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Opposition (DEFENDANT/CROSS COMPLAINANT QUON'S OPPOSITION TO CROSS DEFENDANT/DEFENDANTS UNITED PARCEL SERVICE'S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE MARCH 18, 2019 ORDER); Filed by Ryan Quon (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Answer; Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CANDY LOPEZ'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Candy Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. RALPH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT CAL. CIV. CODE 517,52; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC699489    Hearing Date: November 02, 2020    Dept: 50

 

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

candy lopez,

Plaintiff,

vs.

united parcel service, inc., et al.

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 699489

Hearing Date:

November 2, 2020

Hearing Time:

10:00 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

CROSS-DEFENDANTS UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., MORGAN PRICE, DONALD TEFFT, LA SHAWN STANFORD, AND FAUSTO VARGAS’S DEMURRER TO THE FOURTH, NINTH AND TENTH CAUSES OF ACTION IN RYAN QUON’S THIRD AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

AND RELATED CROSS-ACTION

Background

On March 23, 2018, Plaintiff Candy Lopez (“Lopez”) filed this employment action against Defendants United Parcel Service, Inc. (“UPS”) and Ryan Quon (“Quon”) asserting, among other claims, violations of FEHA, stemming from allegations that Quon, Lopez’s supervisor at UPS, sexually harassed her and threatened her with violence.

On December 20, 2018, Quon filed a Cross-Complaint against Lopez and UPS for breach of contract and for wrongful discharge in violation of public policy. On June 17, 2019, Quon filed a First Amended Cross-Complaint (“FACC”), naming among others, individual Cross-Defendants Morgan Price (“Price”), Donald Tefft (“Tefft”), La Shawn Stanford (“Stanford”), and Fausto Vargas (“Vargas”). Tefft filed a demurrer to the FACC, which was sustained in its entirety on March 2, 2020. Thereafter, on March 16, 2020, Quon filed the Second Amended Cross Complaint (“SACC”), asserting 16 causes of action. UPS, Price, Tefft, Stanford, and Vargas (collectively, the “UPS Parties”) filed a demurrer to the SACC, which was sustained in part and overruled in part. On August 3, 2020, Quon filed the operative Third Amended Cross-Complaint (“TACC”), asserting ten causes of action against the UPS Parties.

The UPS Parties now demur to the fourth cause of action for retaliation (asserted against Price, Tefft, and UPS); the ninth cause of action for fraud and deceit (asserted against Price and Tefft); and the tenth cause of action for aiding and abetting conspiracy and attempted extortion (against Price, Vargas, Stanford, and UPS). Quon opposes.

Discussion

A demurrer can be used only to challenge defects that appear on the face of the pleading under attack or from matters outside the pleading that are judicially noticeable. ((Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318.) “To survive a demurrer, the complaint need only allege facts sufficient to state a cause of action; each evidentiary fact that might eventually form part of the plaintiff's proof need not be alleged.” ((C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872.) For the purpose of testing the sufficiency of the cause of action, the demurrer admits the truth of all material facts properly pleaded. ((Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967.) A demurrer “does not admit contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law.” ((Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713.)

Retaliation

The UPS Parties contend that the cause of action for retaliation in violation of the Labor Code[1] must fail because Quon has again failed to allege that he engaged in any protected activity.

Labor Code section 98.6 provides, among other things, that no employer shall discharge or discriminate against any employee because he engaged in conduct protected under the Labor Code, including “any conduct delineated in this chapter, including the conduct described in subdivision (k) of Section 96, and Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 1101) of Part 3 of Division 2, or because the employee or applicant for employment has filed a bona fide complaint or claim or instituted or caused to be instituted any proceeding under or relating to his or her rights that are under the jurisdiction of the Labor Commissioner, made a written or oral complaint that he or she is owed unpaid wages, or because the employee has initiated any action or notice pursuant to Section 2699, or has testified or is about to testify in a proceeding pursuant to that section, or because of the exercise by the employee or applicant for employment on behalf of himself, herself, or others of any rights afforded him or her.” (Lab. Code, § 98.6, subd. (a).) Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k) and Labor Code section 2699 set forth remedies available to an employee for retaliatory conduct.

In the TACC, Quon alleges that on or about September 26, 2018, UPS notified Quon that he was being terminated due to alleged violations of UPS’s policies on honesty and integrity because he made inconsistent and evasive statements during an interview relating to allegations made by a fellow UPS employee. (TACC, ¶ 139.) Quon alleges that before the interview, he “begged to be able to bring an attorney with him.” (TACC, ¶ 139.) Quon also alleges that the interview primarily concerned facts and issues related to lawful conduct that occurred during nonworking hours and not on UPS property. (TACC, ¶ 140.)

The UPS Parties contend that requesting to bring an attorney with him to his interview is not protected activity under the Labor Code, and that there is no authority for the proposition that requesting to bring an attorney to a noncriminal, noncustodial work meeting constitutes protected activity. The UPS Parties also argue that the scope of Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k) (relating to lawful conduct occurring during nonworking hours away from the employer’s premises) is limited to conduct asserting “recognized constitutional rights.” ((Barbee v. Household Automotive Finance Corp. (2003) 113 Cal.App.4th 525, 533.) Therefore, Quon must allege that his employment was terminated because “he asserted civil rights guaranteed by article I of the California Constitution.” ((Id. at pp. 532, 534.) In the TACC, Quon does not allege that the “lawful conduct” about which the interview occurred involved any constitutional rights.

In Quon’s opposition, he contends that wanting to appear at an interview with his supervisors with an attorney is lawful conduct occurring during nonworking hours away from the employer’s premises. The Court notes that Quon does not argue that requesting that an attorney be present with him at an interview with his supervisors is some other form of protected activity set forth in Labor Code section 98.6, subdivision (a). In response to the argument by the UPS Parties that the lawful conduct must involve a recognized constitutional right, Quon argues that as long as his cause of action relates to constitutional rights, the requirement is satisfied. But this is not what the case law provides. As set forth above, Quon must allege that the lawful conduct he is asserting (requesting an attorney at a work meeting) involves the assertion of a constitutional right. Quon does not identify any constitutional right to have an attorney present at a work interview that could potentially result in discipline leading to termination, and the Court is unaware of any such right.

Quon separately attacks the demurrer by arguing that UPS is raising new grounds to attack a cause of action asserted in prior versions of the cross-complaint. ((Code Civ. Proc., § 430.41, subd. (b).) This appears to be in response to the UPS Parties’ argument that the fourth cause of action must fail as to Price, Tefft, and Vargas because Labor Code section 98.6 does not confer personal liability on individual officers and agents. This argument was not raised when Tefft demurred to the FACC and when the UPS Parties demurrer to the SACC. Nevertheless, because the Court finds that Quon has failed to allege protected activity, which is a required element of the claim as to any of the UPS Parties, the Court sustains the demurrer to the fourth cause of action.[2]

Fraud and Deceit

The UPS Parties argue that the cause of action for fraud and deceit must fail because the elements have still not been alleged with particularity.

In the TACC, Quon alleges that on or about August 29, 2018, Tefft instructed Price to lure Quon into an interview to be conducted by Tefft and under the pretext of it being a formality before Quon could return to work and something for which he would not be allowed to bring outside counsel. (TACC, ¶ 179.) Quon alleges that Price told Quon “that [his] suspension would be removed and to return to work” and that Quon would meet with Tefft. (TACC, ¶ 179.) However, Price and Tefft planned to ambush Quon with questions relating to his social media accounts and the allegations against him by another employee. (TACC, ¶ 179.) Quon alleges that these “representations” were false, that Price and Tefft intended to induce Quon to attend the interview without representation, and that Quon was surprised and confused at the line of questioning, which reaction Price and Tefft then used against Quon to find that he was dishonest and uncooperative. (TACC, ¶¶ 181-182.) As a result, Quon alleges that he suffered emotional distress. (TACC, ¶ 183.)

Again, there are no allegations of any misrepresentations by Tefft. Quon counters that his fraud claim against Tefft is instead based on concealment, but Quon does not set forth the elements of a fraudulent concealment claim, nor does he apply any of the facts of the TACC to the elements. In any event, the Court notes that the UPS Parties do not address this argument in their reply. Instead, the UPS Parties focus on their argument that Quon has failed to allege recoverable damages, which applies to both Price and Tefft. Quon alleges that the only damages he sustained from the alleged fraud was emotional distress, and as argued by the UPS Parties, “[a]lthough damages for emotional distress can be recovered in a fraud cause of action, such damages have been allowed only as an aggravation of other damages.” ((Nagy v. Nagy (1989) 210 Cal.App.3d 1262, 1269.) Quon offers no rebuttal to this argument. Therefore, the Court finds that Quon has failed to state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action for fraud and deceit, and the demurrer is sustained.

Aiding and Abetting Conspiracy and Attempted Extortion

Liability may “be imposed on one who aids and abets the commission of an intentional tort if the person (a) knows the other’s conduct constitutes a breach of duty and gives substantial assistance or encouragement to the other to so act or (b) gives substantial assistance to the other in accomplishing a tortious result and the person’s own conduct, separately considered, constitutes a breach of duty to the third person.” ((Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 324.)

In the TACC, Quon alleges that he informed UPS of threats of bodily harm and extortion made by Cross-Defendant Ruben Duran (“Duran”), who is alleged to be an employee of Cross-Defendant Teamsters Local 396 (“Teamsters”). (TACC, ¶¶ 4, 6, 186.) Duran is alleged to have threatened Quon that he would “have his job” if he did not transfer items of personal property to Lopez. (TACC, ¶ 186.) Quon alleges that the UPS Parties assisted in this extortion by protecting Duran (and Lopez, who Duran is alleged to have been protecting with his threats against Quon) and terminating Quon. (TACC, ¶ 187.) Quon alleges that the UPS Parties directed subordinate UPS staff to launch and substantiate investigations that resulted in Quon losing his job, thereby carrying out Duran’s threat. (TACC, ¶ 187.)

The UPS Parties argue that there are no allegations as to the attempted extortion of Quon. “[T]he elements of attempted extortion are (1) a specific intent to commit extortion—i.e., to obtain property from another, with his or her consent, induced by a wrongful use of fear and (2) a direct but ineffectual act done towards its commission.” ((Cross v. Cooper (2011) 197 Cal.App.4th 357, 386-387.) The Court finds that Quon has alleged an attempted extortion by Duran. In addition to the allegation that Duran threatened that he would “have” Quon’s job, Quon also alleges that on November 8, 2017, Duran made threats of violence against Quon to coerce him into giving him the pink slip for a 2006 Honda Civic that Quon had purchased for Lopez’s use. (TACC, ¶¶ 30, 80.)

Next, the UPS Parties contend that the tenth cause of action must fail because an employer is not liable for tortious conduct of an employee if the employee substantially deviates from the employment duties for personal purposes. The UPS Parties argue that attempted extortion is a substantial deviation from employment duties. But this argument would apply only to UPS, since only UPS is alleged to be Quon’s employer. Moreover, the aiding and abetting cause of action does not rely on vicarious liability but relies on the UPS Parties’ direct actions in assisting or encouraging the commission of an intentional tort.

Lastly, the UPS Parties argue in a conclusory manner that Quon has still failed to allege substantial assistance and encouragement on the part of the UPS Parties. But the Court takes as true the allegation that the UPS Parties “direct[ed] subordinate UPS staff to launch and substantiate investigations resulting in carrying out DURAN and LOPEZ’ threat to ‘have QUON’S job,’ discrediting/dismissing/rejecting QUON’S claims and then terminating QUON’s employment” and thus finds that this is sufficient to demonstrate substantial assistance and encouragement. (TAC, ¶ 187.) Therefore, the demurrer to the tenth cause of action is overruled.

Conclusion

Based on the foregoing, the Court sustains the UPS Parties’ demurrer to the fourth and ninth causes of action of Quon’s TACC without leave to amend. The Court overrules the UPS Parties’ demurrer to the tenth cause of action of Quon’s TACC.

The Court orders the UPS Parties to file and serve an answer within 10 days of the date of this order.

The UPS Parties are ordered to provide notice of this ruling.

DATED: November 2, 2020 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court


[1] There is some confusion as to which specific Labor Code sections Quon is alleging were violated. Under the heading for the fourth cause of action, Quon alleges retaliatory discharge in violation of Labor Code sections 98.6(K) and 98.7(G). On the caption page of the TACC, the fourth cause of action is set forth as one for retaliation for acts in violation of Labor Code sections 96(K), 98.6, and 2699. As noted by the UPS Parties, there is no section 98.6(K) of the Labor Code, and Labor Code section 98.7, subdivision (g) pertains to the lack of a requirement to exhaust administrative remedies in whistleblower retaliation cases brought under the Labor Code.

[2] For this reason, the Court also finds that it need not determine whether there is a private right of action under Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k).

Case Number: BC699489    Hearing Date: July 24, 2020    Dept: 50

 

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

candy lopez,

Plaintiff,

vs.

united parcel service, inc., et al.

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 699489

Hearing Date:

July 24, 2020

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

CROSS-DEFENDANTS UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC., MORGAN PRICE, DONALD TEFFT, LA SHAWN STANFORD, AND FAUSTO VARGAS’S DEMURRER TO RYAN QUON’S SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

AND RELATED CROSS-ACTION

Background

On March 23, 2018, Plaintiff Candy Lopez (“Lopez”) filed this employment action against Defendants United Parcel Service, Inc. (“UPS”) and Ryan Quon (“Quon”) asserting, among other claims, violations of FEHA, stemming from allegations that Quon, Lopez’s supervisor at UPS, sexually harassed her and threatened her with violence.

On December 20, 2018, Quon filed a Cross-Complaint against Lopez and UPS for breach of contract and for wrongful discharge in violation of public policy. On June 17, 2019, Quon filed a First Amended Cross-Complaint (“FACC”), naming among others, individual Cross-Defendants Morgan Price (“Price”), Donald Tefft (“Tefft”), La Shawn Stanford (“Stanford”), and Fausto Vargas (“Vargas”). UPS, Price, Tefft, Stanford, and Vargas are collectively referenced herein as the “UPS Parties.” Tefft filed a demurrer to the FACC, which was sustained in its entirety on March 2, 2020. Thereafter, on March 16, 2020, Quon filed the operative Second Amended Cross Complaint (“SACC”).

The SACC asserts 16 different causes of action stemming from Quon’s employment at UPS. Of these, the second cause of action for aiding and abetting conspiracy and attempted extortion, the third cause of action for breach of employment contract, the fourth cause of action for interference with contract, the fifth cause of action for FEHA discrimination based on gender, the sixth cause of action for FEHA discrimination based on race, the seventh cause of action for FEHA harassment based on gender, the eighth cause of action for FEHA harassment based on race, the tenth cause of action for aiding and abetting discrimination based on race, the eleventh cause of action for retaliation, and the fifteenth cause of action for negligent hiring, retention and supervision are alleged against the UPS Parties. The ninth cause of action for aiding and abetting harassment based on race is alleged against UPS only. The twelfth cause of action for intentional infliction of emotional distress and the thirteenth cause of action for unfair business practices are alleged against UPS, Price, and Tefft. The fourteenth cause of action is alleged against Price and Tefft. The sixteenth cause of action for statutory indemnity is alleged against UPS only.

The “UPS Parties” now demur to the SACC and the causes of action asserted against them. The demurrer is unopposed.

Procedural Issues

The Court notes that although no opposition was filed to the UPS Parties’ demurrer, Quon did file a motion to strike the demurrer on July 13, 2020. There is no reservation number for the motion to strike, and the motion to strike is noticed to be heard on July 24, 2020 (the same date as the UPS Parties’ demurrer). Notwithstanding that the motion to strike is not on calendar and that notice is defective, the Court will consider the arguments made by Quon to the extent that the “motion to strike” is actually an opposition to the UPS Parties’ demurrer. In other words, the only objection Quon appears to be making to the UPS Parties’ demurrer is procedural and not substantive. The Court also notes that the UPS Parties have filed a response to Quon’s “motion to strike,” which the Court also considers.

Quon contends that the UPS Parties’ demurrer is moot because he filed a Third Amended Cross-Complaint. The Third Amended Cross-Complaint was received by the Court’s e-filing system on July 13, 2020, but it does not appear to have actually been filed. Even if it had been filed, the Third Amended Cross-Complaint would not have (and does not) moot the UPS Parties’ demurrer. “Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CitationText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]","ModifiedCitationText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":[],"IconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":0,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":8,"IsEnabled":false,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":0,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":true,"ShowPinPointPage":false,"SuggestionVisibility":false,"SuggestedDocUri":"Any%20pleading%20may%20be%20amended%20once%20by%20the%20party%20of%20course,%20and%20without%20costs,%20at%20any%20time%20before%20the%20answer%20or%20demurrer%20is%20filed."}}}' docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Any pleading may be amended once by the party of course, and without costs, at any time before the answer or demurrer is filed.” (\r\n PsychStateSubjectCode\r\n Full.StateStatuteCite\r\n Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 472\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]","original_string":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]","error":null,"fullText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 472","isParallel":false,"parallel":null,"start":4104,"end":4154,"pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","readOrderIndex":4104,"index":4104,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":0,"CiteShepSignalLink":null,"story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":null,"name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK14","foundBy":"PsychStateSubjectCode","FullTextParen":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a)","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$id":"1","End":922,"Offset":3599,"Start":0,"nref":0,"nind":0,"story":"wdMainTextStory","namedRanges":[{"$id":"2","Name":"Psych_Cite_14","Range":{"$id":"3","ts":{"$ref":"1"},"_Start":505,"_End":555,"_Text":"Quon contends that the UPS Parties’ demurrer is moot because he filed a Third Amended Cross-Complaint. The Third Amended Cross-Complaint was received by the Court’s e-filing system on July 13, 2020, but it does not appear to have actually been filed. Even if it had been filed, the Third Amended Cross-Complaint would not have (and does not) moot the UPS Parties’ demurrer. “Any pleading may be amended once by the party of course, and without costs, at any time before the answer or demurrer is filed.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added].) Quon already amended his cross-complaint once when he filed the FACC, so Quon was required to seek leave to amend before attempting to file the Third Amended Cross-Complaint. (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a).) Because Quon did not seek leave to file a Third Amended Cross-Complaint, the Court does not find that the demurrer by the UPS Parties has been mooted. \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null},{"$id":"4","Name":"Psych_Cite_15","Range":{"$id":"5","ts":{"$ref":"1"},"_Start":734,"_End":767,"_Text":"Quon contends that the UPS Parties’ demurrer is moot because he filed a Third Amended Cross-Complaint. The Third Amended Cross-Complaint was received by the Court’s e-filing system on July 13, 2020, but it does not appear to have actually been filed. Even if it had been filed, the Third Amended Cross-Complaint would not have (and does not) moot the UPS Parties’ demurrer. “Any pleading may be amended once by the party of course, and without costs, at any time before the answer or demurrer is filed.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added].) Quon already amended his cross-complaint once when he filed the FACC, so Quon was required to seek leave to amend before attempting to file the Third Amended Cross-Complaint. (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a).) Because Quon did not seek leave to file a Third Amended Cross-Complaint, the Court does not find that the demurrer by the UPS Parties has been mooted. \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null}],"Range":{"$id":"6","ts":{"$ref":"1"},"_Start":0,"_End":922,"_Text":"Quon contends that the UPS Parties’ demurrer is moot because he filed a Third Amended Cross-Complaint. The Third Amended Cross-Complaint was received by the Court’s e-filing system on July 13, 2020, but it does not appear to have actually been filed. Even if it had been filed, the Third Amended Cross-Complaint would not have (and does not) moot the UPS Parties’ demurrer. “Any pleading may be amended once by the party of course, and without costs, at any time before the answer or demurrer is filed.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added].) Quon already amended his cross-complaint once when he filed the FACC, so Quon was required to seek leave to amend before attempting to file the Third Amended Cross-Complaint. (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a).) Because Quon did not seek leave to file a Third Amended Cross-Complaint, the Court does not find that the demurrer by the UPS Parties has been mooted. \r"}},"master":"___RESULTS_18","kernel_data":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.Year__StatuteParentheticals [emphasis added] __StatuteParentheticals.([ [__StatuteParentheticals.([.[[__StatuteParentheticals.([._Pattern([.([__StatuteParentheticals.])] __StatuteParentheticals.]).]]__StatuteParentheticals.])._Pattern]).])__StatuteParentheticals.__OtherReasonableParentheticalemphasis added__StatuteParentheticals._PatternStatuteParentheticals.StatuteParentheticalsJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteCode Civ. Proc., §472, subd. (a)StateStatute.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections §472, subd. (a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol §StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subdsubd. (a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd._PatternSubdsList.SubdsListStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First(a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First._PatternSubdScalarOrRangeCal.SubdScalarOrRangeCalStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First.First(a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.subdivisionssubdivisionStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X1472StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectCiv. Proc. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_18"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]","CitationRichText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":-1,"Title":"No Analysis","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/blank.jpg","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":null,"ShowShepardSignal":false,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]","ShortText":"Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 472","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Code\r\nCiv. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.Year__StatuteParentheticals [emphasis added] __StatuteParentheticals.([ [__StatuteParentheticals.([.[[__StatuteParentheticals.([._Pattern([.([__StatuteParentheticals.])] __StatuteParentheticals.]).]]__StatuteParentheticals.])._Pattern]).])__StatuteParentheticals.__OtherReasonableParentheticalemphasis added__StatuteParentheticals._PatternStatuteParentheticals.StatuteParentheticalsJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteCode Civ. Proc., §472, subd. (a)StateStatute.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections §472, subd. (a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol §StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subdsubd. (a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd._PatternSubdsList.SubdsListStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First(a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First._PatternSubdScalarOrRangeCal.SubdScalarOrRangeCalStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First.First(a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.subdivisionssubdivisionStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X1472StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectCiv. Proc. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_18","Markup":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]","Master":"___RESULTS_18","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK14","Original_string":"Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","PinPage":"","ReadOrderIndex":4104,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"Cal. Civ. Proc. Code §472","Start":4104,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Code\r\nCiv. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added]

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Code Civ. Proc., § 472, subd. (a) [emphasis added].) Quon already amended his cross-complaint once when he filed the FACC, so Quon was required to seek leave to amend before attempting to file the Third Amended Cross-Complaint. (\r\n PsychStateSubjectCode\r\n Full.StateStatuteCite\r\n Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 473\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)","original_string":"Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)","error":null,"fullText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 473","isParallel":false,"parallel":null,"start":4333,"end":4366,"pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","readOrderIndex":4333,"index":4333,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":0,"CiteShepSignalLink":null,"story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":null,"name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK15","foundBy":"PsychStateSubjectCode","FullTextParen":"Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"1"},"master":"___RESULTS_19","kernel_data":"Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteCode Civ. Proc., §473, subd. (a)StateStatute.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections §473, subd. (a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol §StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subdsubd. (a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd._PatternSubdsList.SubdsListStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First(a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First._PatternSubdScalarOrRangeCal.SubdScalarOrRangeCalStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First.First(a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.subdivisionssubdivisionStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X1473StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectCiv. Proc. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_19"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)","CitationRichText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":-1,"Title":"No Analysis","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/blank.jpg","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":null,"ShowShepardSignal":false,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)","ShortText":"Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 473","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Code\r\nCiv. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteCode Civ. Proc., §473, subd. (a)StateStatute.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections §473, subd. (a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol §StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subdsubd. (a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd._PatternSubdsList.SubdsListStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First(a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First._PatternSubdScalarOrRangeCal.SubdScalarOrRangeCalStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First.First(a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.subdivisionssubdivisionStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X1473StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectCiv. Proc. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_19","Markup":"Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)","Master":"___RESULTS_19","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK15","Original_string":"Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","PinPage":"","ReadOrderIndex":4333,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"Cal. Civ. Proc. Code §473","Start":4333,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Code\r\nCiv. Proc., § 473, subd. (a)

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (a).) Because Quon did not seek leave to file a Third Amended Cross-Complaint, the Court does not find that the demurrer by the UPS Parties has been mooted.

Quon also objects to the demurrer by the UPS Parties on the basis that the UPS Parties failed to meet and confer prior to the filing of the demurrer. But as set forth in the Declaration of Tracy R. Williams filed in support of the demurrer, counsel for the UPS Parties, by sending a letter to counsel for Quon outlining the perceived defects in the SACC, initiated an attempt to meet and confer on April 9, 2020. (Williams Decl., ¶ 2, Ex. A.) Counsel for the UPS Parties did not receive a response to the letter. (Williams Decl., ¶ 3.) \r\n PsychStateSubjectCode\r\n Full.StateStatuteCite\r\n Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 430.41\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)","original_string":"Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)","error":null,"fullText":"Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 430.41","isParallel":false,"parallel":null,"start":5057,"end":5112,"pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","readOrderIndex":5057,"index":5057,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":0,"CiteShepSignalLink":null,"story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":null,"name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK16","foundBy":"PsychStateSubjectCode","FullTextParen":"Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$id":"7","End":4216,"Offset":4521,"Start":0,"nref":0,"nind":0,"story":"wdMainTextStory","namedRanges":[{"$id":"8","Name":"Psych_Cite_16","Range":{"$id":"9","ts":{"$ref":"7"},"_Start":536,"_End":591,"_Text":"Quon also objects to the demurrer by the UPS Parties on the basis that the UPS Parties failed to meet and confer prior to the filing of the demurrer. But as set forth in the Declaration of Tracy R. Williams filed in support of the demurrer, counsel for the UPS Parties, by sending a letter to counsel for Quon outlining the perceived defects in the SACC, initiated an attempt to meet and confer on April 9, 2020. (Williams Decl., ¶ 2, Ex. A.) Counsel for the UPS Parties did not receive a response to the letter. (Williams Decl., ¶ 3.) Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3) requires only that a demurring party either file a declaration stating that the parties met and conferred and did not reach agreement or stating that the party who filed the pleading failed to respond to the meet and confer request of the demurrer party. Thus, the Court finds that the UPS Parties complied with the meet and confer requirements. \r\tDiscussion\rA demurrer can be used only to challenge defects that appear on the face of the pleading under attack or from matters outside the pleading that are judicially noticeable. (Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318.) “To survive a demurrer, the complaint need only allege facts sufficient to state a cause of action; each evidentiary fact that might eventually form part of the plaintiff's proof need not be alleged.” (C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872.) For the purpose of testing the sufficiency of the cause of action, the demurrer admits the truth of all material facts properly pleaded. (Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967.) A demurrer “does not admit contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law.” (Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713.) \rIn the SACC, Quon alleges the following: Quon was hired by UPS on January 17, 2005. (SACC, ¶ 19.) Quon met Lopez on or about November 22, 2016. (SACC, ¶ 21.) Quon and Lopez engaged in a romantic relationship. (See generally SACC.) In February 2017, Quon introduced Lopez to Cross-Defendant Ruben Duran (“Duran”), who was a Teamsters representative. (SACC, ¶ 53.) In November 2017, Quon filed a UPS corporate complaint which stated that Lopez was having an inappropriate relationship with Duran. (SACC, ¶ 83.) Instead of disciplining Lopez or Duran, UPS disciplined Quon. (SACC, ¶¶ 84-85.) \rOn or about November 21, 2017, Quon was ordered into a meeting with UPS HR Manager Stanford and Security Officer Vargas. (SACC, ¶ 92.) At the meeting, Quon was asked questions about his relationship with Lopez. (SACC, ¶ 93.) \tQuon was then instructed to write himself up and threatened with discipline or termination. (SACC, ¶ 95.) \rOn or about January 11, 2018, Quon was ordered into a meeting with Price, another employee of UPS, and Vargas. (SACC, ¶ 96.) At the meeting, Quon was accused of being at the Bell UPS facility in violation of company policy. (SACC, ¶ 96.) Lopez had apparently complained that Quon was harassing her at the Bell facility. (SACC, ¶ 96.) At this same meeting, Quon was accused of creating a Facebook account to harass Lopez. (SACC, ¶ 98.) \rOn or about April 18, 2018, Quon’s supervisor informed him that he was being transferred to the Baldwin Park facility, where he would have no contact with Lopez. (SACC, ¶ 99.) On or about July 24, 2018, Quon was ordered to an HR meeting with Price and Tefft, another UPS employee. (SACC, ¶ 100.) There, Teft told Quon that Quon was at fault regarding his issues with Lopez. (SACC, ¶ 100.) Quon was then placed on administrative leave with pay. (SACC, ¶ 102.) \rOn or about August 29, 2018, Price ordered Quon to another meeting the next day with himself and Tefft. (SACC, ¶ 105.) Price told Quon that the suspension would be removed, and he would be able to return to work. (SACC, ¶ 105.) On or around August 30, 2018, Quon attended a meeting with Tefft and Price, where he was questioned regarding his affiliation with USC and an old LinkedIn account. (SACC, ¶ 106.) Quon was also questioned about various other social media accounts. (SACC, ¶ 107.) \rOn September 26, 2018, a letter was sent to Quon terminating his employment with UPS. (SAC, ¶ 109.) \rAiding and Abetting\r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null}],"Range":{"$id":"10","ts":{"$ref":"7"},"_Start":0,"_End":4216,"_Text":"Quon also objects to the demurrer by the UPS Parties on the basis that the UPS Parties failed to meet and confer prior to the filing of the demurrer. But as set forth in the Declaration of Tracy R. Williams filed in support of the demurrer, counsel for the UPS Parties, by sending a letter to counsel for Quon outlining the perceived defects in the SACC, initiated an attempt to meet and confer on April 9, 2020. (Williams Decl., ¶ 2, Ex. A.) Counsel for the UPS Parties did not receive a response to the letter. (Williams Decl., ¶ 3.) Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3) requires only that a demurring party either file a declaration stating that the parties met and conferred and did not reach agreement or stating that the party who filed the pleading failed to respond to the meet and confer request of the demurrer party. Thus, the Court finds that the UPS Parties complied with the meet and confer requirements. \r\tDiscussion\rA demurrer can be used only to challenge defects that appear on the face of the pleading under attack or from matters outside the pleading that are judicially noticeable. (Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318.) “To survive a demurrer, the complaint need only allege facts sufficient to state a cause of action; each evidentiary fact that might eventually form part of the plaintiff's proof need not be alleged.” (C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872.) For the purpose of testing the sufficiency of the cause of action, the demurrer admits the truth of all material facts properly pleaded. (Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967.) A demurrer “does not admit contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law.” (Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713.) \rIn the SACC, Quon alleges the following: Quon was hired by UPS on January 17, 2005. (SACC, ¶ 19.) Quon met Lopez on or about November 22, 2016. (SACC, ¶ 21.) Quon and Lopez engaged in a romantic relationship. (See generally SACC.) In February 2017, Quon introduced Lopez to Cross-Defendant Ruben Duran (“Duran”), who was a Teamsters representative. (SACC, ¶ 53.) In November 2017, Quon filed a UPS corporate complaint which stated that Lopez was having an inappropriate relationship with Duran. (SACC, ¶ 83.) Instead of disciplining Lopez or Duran, UPS disciplined Quon. (SACC, ¶¶ 84-85.) \rOn or about November 21, 2017, Quon was ordered into a meeting with UPS HR Manager Stanford and Security Officer Vargas. (SACC, ¶ 92.) At the meeting, Quon was asked questions about his relationship with Lopez. (SACC, ¶ 93.) \tQuon was then instructed to write himself up and threatened with discipline or termination. (SACC, ¶ 95.) \rOn or about January 11, 2018, Quon was ordered into a meeting with Price, another employee of UPS, and Vargas. (SACC, ¶ 96.) At the meeting, Quon was accused of being at the Bell UPS facility in violation of company policy. (SACC, ¶ 96.) Lopez had apparently complained that Quon was harassing her at the Bell facility. (SACC, ¶ 96.) At this same meeting, Quon was accused of creating a Facebook account to harass Lopez. (SACC, ¶ 98.) \rOn or about April 18, 2018, Quon’s supervisor informed him that he was being transferred to the Baldwin Park facility, where he would have no contact with Lopez. (SACC, ¶ 99.) On or about July 24, 2018, Quon was ordered to an HR meeting with Price and Tefft, another UPS employee. (SACC, ¶ 100.) There, Teft told Quon that Quon was at fault regarding his issues with Lopez. (SACC, ¶ 100.) Quon was then placed on administrative leave with pay. (SACC, ¶ 102.) \rOn or about August 29, 2018, Price ordered Quon to another meeting the next day with himself and Tefft. (SACC, ¶ 105.) Price told Quon that the suspension would be removed, and he would be able to return to work. (SACC, ¶ 105.) On or around August 30, 2018, Quon attended a meeting with Tefft and Price, where he was questioned regarding his affiliation with USC and an old LinkedIn account. (SACC, ¶ 106.) Quon was also questioned about various other social media accounts. (SACC, ¶ 107.) \rOn September 26, 2018, a letter was sent to Quon terminating his employment with UPS. (SAC, ¶ 109.) \rAiding and Abetting\r"}},"master":"___RESULTS_21","kernel_data":"Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteCode of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections section 430.41, subdivision (3)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol section StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subdsubdivision (3)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd._PatternSubdsList.SubdsListStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First(3)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First._PatternSubdScalarOrRangeCal.SubdScalarOrRangeCalStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First.First(3)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.subdivisionssubdivisionStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X1430.41StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectCiv. Proc. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_21"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)","CitationRichText":"Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":-1,"Title":"No Analysis","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/blank.jpg","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":null,"ShowShepardSignal":false,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)","ShortText":"Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 430.41","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Code\r\nof Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteCode of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections section 430.41, subdivision (3)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol section StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subdsubdivision (3)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd._PatternSubdsList.SubdsListStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First(3)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First._PatternSubdScalarOrRangeCal.SubdScalarOrRangeCalStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First.First(3)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.subdivisionssubdivisionStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X1430.41StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectCiv. Proc. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_21","Markup":"Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)","Master":"___RESULTS_21","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK16","Original_string":"Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","PinPage":"","ReadOrderIndex":5057,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"Cal. Civ. Proc. Code section 430.41","Start":5057,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Code\r\nof Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3)

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Code of Civil Procedure section 430.41, subdivision (3) requires only that a demurring party either file a declaration stating that the parties met and conferred and did not reach agreement or stating that the party who filed the pleading failed to respond to the meet and confer request of the demurrer party. Thus, the Court finds that the UPS Parties complied with the meet and confer requirements.

Discussion

A demurrer can be used only to challenge defects that appear on the face of the pleading under attack or from matters outside the pleading that are judicially noticeable. (\r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 39 Cal. 3d 311\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318","original_string":"Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318","error":null,"fullText":"Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"39 Cal. 3d 311","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":5643,"end":5684,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":5643,"index":172,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":4,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XW4-F4N1-2NSF-C04W-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"318","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK1","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":null,"ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$id":"11","End":834,"Offset":5471,"Start":0,"nref":0,"nind":0,"story":"wdMainTextStory","namedRanges":[{"$id":"12","Name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK1","Range":{"$id":"13","ts":{"$ref":"11"},"_Start":172,"_End":213,"_Text":"A demurrer can be used only to challenge defects that appear on the face of the pleading under attack or from matters outside the pleading that are judicially noticeable. (Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318.) “To survive a demurrer, the complaint need only allege facts sufficient to state a cause of action; each evidentiary fact that might eventually form part of the plaintiff's proof need not be alleged.” (C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872.) For the purpose of testing the sufficiency of the cause of action, the demurrer admits the truth of all material facts properly pleaded. (Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967.) A demurrer “does not admit contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law.” (Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713.) \r"},"foundBy":"PsychCase","pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","tabName":"39 Cal. 3d 311"},{"$id":"14","Name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK2","Range":{"$id":"15","ts":{"$ref":"11"},"_Start":418,"_End":492,"_Text":"A demurrer can be used only to challenge defects that appear on the face of the pleading under attack or from matters outside the pleading that are judicially noticeable. (Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318.) “To survive a demurrer, the complaint need only allege facts sufficient to state a cause of action; each evidentiary fact that might eventually form part of the plaintiff's proof need not be alleged.” (C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872.) For the purpose of testing the sufficiency of the cause of action, the demurrer admits the truth of all material facts properly pleaded. (Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967.) A demurrer “does not admit contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law.” (Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713.) \r"},"foundBy":"PsychCase","pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","tabName":"53 Cal. 4th 861"},{"$id":"16","Name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK3","Range":{"$id":"17","ts":{"$ref":"11"},"_Start":633,"_End":695,"_Text":"A demurrer can be used only to challenge defects that appear on the face of the pleading under attack or from matters outside the pleading that are judicially noticeable. (Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318.) “To survive a demurrer, the complaint need only allege facts sufficient to state a cause of action; each evidentiary fact that might eventually form part of the plaintiff's proof need not be alleged.” (C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872.) For the purpose of testing the sufficiency of the cause of action, the demurrer admits the truth of all material facts properly pleaded. (Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967.) A demurrer “does not admit contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law.” (Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713.) \r"},"foundBy":"PsychCase","pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","tabName":"2 Cal. 4th 962"},{"$id":"18","Name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK4","Range":{"$id":"19","ts":{"$ref":"11"},"_Start":782,"_End":830,"_Text":"A demurrer can be used only to challenge defects that appear on the face of the pleading under attack or from matters outside the pleading that are judicially noticeable. (Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318.) “To survive a demurrer, the complaint need only allege facts sufficient to state a cause of action; each evidentiary fact that might eventually form part of the plaintiff's proof need not be alleged.” (C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872.) For the purpose of testing the sufficiency of the cause of action, the demurrer admits the truth of all material facts properly pleaded. (Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967.) A demurrer “does not admit contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law.” (Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713.) \r"},"foundBy":"PsychCase","pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","tabName":"67 Cal. 2d 695"}],"Range":{"$id":"20","ts":{"$ref":"11"},"_Start":0,"_End":834,"_Text":"A demurrer can be used only to challenge defects that appear on the face of the pleading under attack or from matters outside the pleading that are judicially noticeable. (Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318.) “To survive a demurrer, the complaint need only allege facts sufficient to state a cause of action; each evidentiary fact that might eventually form part of the plaintiff's proof need not be alleged.” (C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872.) For the purpose of testing the sufficiency of the cause of action, the demurrer admits the truth of all material facts properly pleaded. (Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967.) A demurrer “does not admit contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law.” (Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713.) \r"}},"master":"___RESULTS_1","kernel_data":"Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyBlankCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyBlankCaseName.SecondPartyKirwanCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyKirwanCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1985) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1985 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1985CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1985CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyBlank HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter39 Cal.3d 311, 318Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages318Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First318Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber318Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage311Reporter.NameCal. 3dReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume39RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyKirwan suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_1"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318","CitationRichText":"Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":4,"Title":"Validity questioned - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalQuestionedAnalysis.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XW4-F4N1-2NSF-C04W-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318","ShortText":"39 Cal. 3d 311","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d\r\n311, 318

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyBlankCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyBlankCaseName.SecondPartyKirwanCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyKirwanCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1985) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1985 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1985CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1985CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyBlank HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter39 Cal.3d 311, 318Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages318Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First318Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber318Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage311Reporter.NameCal. 3dReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume39RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyKirwan suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_1","Markup":"Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318","Master":"___RESULTS_1","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK1","Original_string":"Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","PinPage":"318","ReadOrderIndex":5643,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"39 Cal. 3d 311","Start":5643,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Blank\r\nv. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318.) “Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CitationText":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872","ModifiedCitationText":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":[],"IconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":0,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":8,"IsEnabled":false,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":0,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":true,"ShowPinPointPage":false,"SuggestionVisibility":false,"SuggestedDocUri":"To%20survive%20a%20demurrer,%20the%20complaint%20need%20only%20allege%20facts%20sufficient%20to%20state%20a%20cause%20of%20action;%20each%20evidentiary%20fact%20that%20might%20eventually%20form%20part%20of%20the%20plaintiff's%20proof%20need%20not%20be%20alleged."}}}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">To survive a demurrer, the complaint need only allege facts sufficient to state a cause of action; each evidentiary fact that might eventually form part of the plaintiff's proof need not be alleged.” (\r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 53 Cal. 4th 861\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872","original_string":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872","error":null,"fullText":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"53 Cal. 4th 861","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":5889,"end":5963,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":5889,"index":418,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":2,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:554Y-9V21-J9X6-H4RV-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"872","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK2","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":null,"ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"11"},"master":"___RESULTS_2","kernel_data":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyC.A.CaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyC.A.CaseName.SecondPartyWilliam S. Hart Union High School Dist.CaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyWilliam S. Hart Union High School Dist.CaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2012) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2012 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2012CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2012CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyC.A. HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter53 Cal.4th 861, 872Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages872Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First872Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber872Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage861Reporter.NameCal. 4thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume53RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyWilliam S. Hart Union High School Dist. suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_2"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872","CitationRichText":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":2,"Title":"Possible negative treatment - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalPossibleNegative.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:554Y-9V21-J9X6-H4RV-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872","ShortText":"53 Cal. 4th 861","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School\r\nDist. (2012)\r\n53 Cal.4th 861, 872

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyC.A.CaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyC.A.CaseName.SecondPartyWilliam S. Hart Union High School Dist.CaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyWilliam S. Hart Union High School Dist.CaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2012) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2012 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2012CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2012CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyC.A. HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter53 Cal.4th 861, 872Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages872Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First872Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber872Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage861Reporter.NameCal. 4thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume53RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyWilliam S. Hart Union High School Dist. suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_2","Markup":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872","Master":"___RESULTS_2","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK2","Original_string":"C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","PinPage":"872","ReadOrderIndex":5889,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"53 Cal. 4th 861","Start":5889,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

C.A.\r\nv. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">C.A. v. William S. Hart Union High School Dist. (2012) 53 Cal.4th 861, 872
.) For the purpose of testing the sufficiency of the cause of action, the demurrer admits the truth of all material facts properly pleaded. (\r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 2 Cal. 4th 962\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967","original_string":"Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967","error":null,"fullText":"Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"2 Cal. 4th 962","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":6104,"end":6166,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":6104,"index":633,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":2,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XWN-0391-2NSF-C0VN-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"966","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK3","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":null,"ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"11"},"master":"___RESULTS_3","kernel_data":"Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyAubryCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyAubryCaseName.SecondPartyTri-City Hospital Dist.CaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyTri-City Hospital Dist.CaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1992) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1992 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1992CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1992CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyAubry HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967 Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages966-967 Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First966Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber966Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter.__PinPages.Last967 Reporter.__PinPages.Last._PatternLastPageNumber.LastPageNumberReporter.__PinPages.Last.PageNumber67Reporter.__PinPages.Last.PageNumber_Full967Reporter.__PinPages.RangeDash-Reporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage962Reporter.NameCal. 4thReporter.pagepagesReporter.Reporter.pagepagesReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume2RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyTri-City Hospital Dist. suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_3"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967","CitationRichText":"Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":2,"Title":"Possible negative treatment - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalPossibleNegative.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XWN-0391-2NSF-C0VN-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967","ShortText":"2 Cal. 4th 962","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th\r\n962, 966-967

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyAubryCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyAubryCaseName.SecondPartyTri-City Hospital Dist.CaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyTri-City Hospital Dist.CaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1992) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1992 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1992CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1992CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyAubry HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967 Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages966-967 Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First966Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber966Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter.__PinPages.Last967 Reporter.__PinPages.Last._PatternLastPageNumber.LastPageNumberReporter.__PinPages.Last.PageNumber67Reporter.__PinPages.Last.PageNumber_Full967Reporter.__PinPages.RangeDash-Reporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage962Reporter.NameCal. 4thReporter.pagepagesReporter.Reporter.pagepagesReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume2RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyTri-City Hospital Dist. suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_3","Markup":"Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967","Master":"___RESULTS_3","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK3","Original_string":"Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","PinPage":"966","ReadOrderIndex":6104,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"2 Cal. 4th 962","Start":6104,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Aubry\r\nv. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Aubry v. Tri-City Hospital Dist. (1992) 2 Cal.4th 962, 966-967.) A demurrer “Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CitationText":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713","ModifiedCitationText":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":[],"IconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":0,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":8,"IsEnabled":false,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":0,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":true,"ShowPinPointPage":false,"SuggestionVisibility":false,"SuggestedDocUri":"does%20not%20admit%20contentions,%20deductions%20or%20conclusions%20of%20fact%20or%20law."}}}' docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">does not admit contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law.” (\r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 67 Cal. 2d 695\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713","original_string":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713","error":null,"fullText":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"67 Cal. 2d 695","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":6253,"end":6301,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":6253,"index":782,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":2,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XWN-0391-2NSF-C1JS-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"713","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK4","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":null,"ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"11"},"master":"___RESULTS_4","kernel_data":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyDaarCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyDaarCaseName.SecondPartyYellow Cab Co.CaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyYellow Cab Co.CaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1967) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1967 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1967CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1967CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyDaar HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter67 Cal.2d 695, 713Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages713Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First713Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber713Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage695Reporter.NameCal. 2dReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume67RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyYellow Cab Co. suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_4"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713","CitationRichText":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":2,"Title":"Possible negative treatment - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalPossibleNegative.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XWN-0391-2NSF-C1JS-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713","ShortText":"67 Cal. 2d 695","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d\r\n695, 713

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyDaarCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyDaarCaseName.SecondPartyYellow Cab Co.CaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyYellow Cab Co.CaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1967) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1967 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1967CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1967CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyDaar HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter67 Cal.2d 695, 713Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages713Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First713Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber713Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage695Reporter.NameCal. 2dReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume67RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyYellow Cab Co. suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_4","Markup":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713","Master":"___RESULTS_4","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK4","Original_string":"Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","PinPage":"713","ReadOrderIndex":6253,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"67 Cal. 2d 695","Start":6253,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Daar\r\nv. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Daar v. Yellow Cab Co. (1967) 67 Cal.2d 695, 713.)

In the SACC, Quon alleges the following: Quon was hired by UPS on January 17, 2005. (SACC, ¶ 19.) Quon met Lopez on or about November 22, 2016. (SACC, ¶ 21.) Quon and Lopez engaged in a romantic relationship. (See generally SACC.) In February 2017, Quon introduced Lopez to Cross-Defendant Ruben Duran (“Duran”), who was a Teamsters representative. (SACC, ¶ 53.) In November 2017, Quon filed a UPS corporate complaint which stated that Lopez was having an inappropriate relationship with Duran. (SACC, ¶ 83.) Instead of disciplining Lopez or Duran, UPS disciplined Quon. (SACC, ¶¶ 84-85.)

On or about November 21, 2017, Quon was ordered into a meeting with UPS HR Manager Stanford and Security Officer Vargas. (SACC, ¶ 92.) At the meeting, Quon was asked questions about his relationship with Lopez. (SACC, ¶ 93.) Quon was then instructed to write himself up and threatened with discipline or termination. (SACC, ¶ 95.)

On or about January 11, 2018, Quon was ordered into a meeting with Price, another employee of UPS, and Vargas. (SACC, ¶ 96.) At the meeting, Quon was accused of being at the Bell UPS facility in violation of company policy. (SACC, ¶ 96.) Lopez had apparently complained that Quon was harassing her at the Bell facility. (SACC, ¶ 96.) At this same meeting, Quon was accused of creating a Facebook account to harass Lopez. (SACC, ¶ 98.)

On or about April 18, 2018, Quon’s supervisor informed him that he was being transferred to the Baldwin Park facility, where he would have no contact with Lopez. (SACC, ¶ 99.) On or about July 24, 2018, Quon was ordered to an HR meeting with Price and Tefft, another UPS employee. (SACC, ¶ 100.) There, Teft told Quon that Quon was at fault regarding his issues with Lopez. (SACC, ¶ 100.) Quon was then placed on administrative leave with pay. (SACC, ¶ 102.)

On or about August 29, 2018, Price ordered Quon to another meeting the next day with himself and Tefft. (SACC, ¶ 105.) Price told Quon that the suspension would be removed, and he would be able to return to work. (SACC, ¶ 105.) On or around August 30, 2018, Quon attended a meeting with Tefft and Price, where he was questioned regarding his affiliation with USC and an old LinkedIn account. (SACC, ¶ 106.) Quon was also questioned about various other social media accounts. (SACC, ¶ 107.)

On September 26, 2018, a letter was sent to Quon terminating his employment with UPS. (SAC, ¶ 109.)

Aiding and Abetting

The UPS Parties argue that there is no civil cause of action for aiding and abetting conspiracy and attempted extortion under California law. While aiding and abetting may not be a separate cause of action from the underlying tort (conspiracy itself is not a separate cause of action), liability may still “Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CitationText":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323","ModifiedCitationText":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":["Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 324"],"IconIndicator":9,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":9,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":9,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":9,"IsEnabled":false,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":1,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":false,"ShowPinPointPage":true,"SuggestionVisibility":false,"SuggestedDocUri":"be%20imposed%20on%20one%20who%20aids%20and%20abets%20the%20commission%20of%20an%20intentional%20tort%20if%20the%20person%20(a)%20knows%20the%20other%e2%80%99s%20conduct%20constitutes%20a%20breach%20of%20duty%20and%20gives%20substantial%20assistance%20or%20encouragement%20to%20the%20other%20to%20so%20act%20or%20(b)%20gives%20substantial%20assistance%20to%20the%20other%20in%20accomplishing%20a%20tortious%20result%20and%20the%20person%e2%80%99s%20own%20conduct,%20separately%20considered,%20constitutes%20a%20breach%20of%20duty%20to%20the%20third%20person."}}}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">be imposed on one who aids and abets the commission of an intentional tort if the person (a) knows the other’s conduct constitutes a breach of duty and gives substantial assistance or encouragement to the other to so act or (b) gives substantial assistance to the other in accomplishing a tortious result and the person’s own conduct, separately considered, constitutes a breach of duty to the third person.” (\r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 222 Cal. App. 4th 303\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323","original_string":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323","error":null,"fullText":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"222 Cal. App. 4th 303","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":9453,"end":9523,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":9499,"index":9453,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":1,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5B0C-84N1-J9X6-H3H8-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"323","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK17","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$id":"21","End":1944,"Offset":8735,"Start":0,"nref":0,"nind":0,"story":"wdMainTextStory","namedRanges":[{"$id":"22","Name":"Psych_Cite_17","Range":{"$id":"23","ts":{"$ref":"21"},"_Start":718,"_End":788,"_Text":"\tThe UPS Parties argue that there is no civil cause of action for aiding and abetting conspiracy and attempted extortion under California law. While aiding and abetting may not be a separate cause of action from the underlying tort (conspiracy itself is not a separate cause of action), liability may still “be imposed on one who aids and abets the commission of an intentional tort if the person (a) knows the other’s conduct constitutes a breach of duty and gives substantial assistance or encouragement to the other to so act or (b) gives substantial assistance to the other in accomplishing a tortious result and the person’s own conduct, separately considered, constitutes a breach of duty to the third person.” (Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323.) \r\tHere, Quon alleges that the UPS Parties gave substantial assistance or encouragement to Lopez in his attempted extortion of Quon. (SACC, ¶ 121.) The only facts alleged by Quon are that Quon informed UPS of the threats of extortion made by Lopez, and the rest of the UPS Parties knew that Duran had threatened Quon. (SACC, ¶ 120.) As noted by the UPS Parties, these facts are insufficient to show substantial assistance or encouragement. This defect was raised by the Court in its order sustaining Tefft’s demurrer to the FACC, and although Quon was given an opportunity to cure the defect, he has failed to do so. Therefore, the Court sustains the UPS Parties’ demurrer to the second cause of action for aiding and abetting without leave to amend.\r\tBreach of Contract\r\tThe UPS Parties contend that the third cause of action for breach of employment contract must fail because Quan fails to allege the existence of any contract between himself and any of the individual UPS Parties. That was true of the FACC, and that remains true of the SACC. As to UPS, Quon does allege the existence of a contract with UPS—his employment contract. (SACC, ¶¶ 127.) \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null}],"Range":{"$id":"24","ts":{"$ref":"21"},"_Start":0,"_End":1944,"_Text":"\tThe UPS Parties argue that there is no civil cause of action for aiding and abetting conspiracy and attempted extortion under California law. While aiding and abetting may not be a separate cause of action from the underlying tort (conspiracy itself is not a separate cause of action), liability may still “be imposed on one who aids and abets the commission of an intentional tort if the person (a) knows the other’s conduct constitutes a breach of duty and gives substantial assistance or encouragement to the other to so act or (b) gives substantial assistance to the other in accomplishing a tortious result and the person’s own conduct, separately considered, constitutes a breach of duty to the third person.” (Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323.) \r\tHere, Quon alleges that the UPS Parties gave substantial assistance or encouragement to Lopez in his attempted extortion of Quon. (SACC, ¶ 121.) The only facts alleged by Quon are that Quon informed UPS of the threats of extortion made by Lopez, and the rest of the UPS Parties knew that Duran had threatened Quon. (SACC, ¶ 120.) As noted by the UPS Parties, these facts are insufficient to show substantial assistance or encouragement. This defect was raised by the Court in its order sustaining Tefft’s demurrer to the FACC, and although Quon was given an opportunity to cure the defect, he has failed to do so. Therefore, the Court sustains the UPS Parties’ demurrer to the second cause of action for aiding and abetting without leave to amend.\r\tBreach of Contract\r\tThe UPS Parties contend that the third cause of action for breach of employment contract must fail because Quan fails to allege the existence of any contract between himself and any of the individual UPS Parties. That was true of the FACC, and that remains true of the SACC. As to UPS, Quon does allege the existence of a contract with UPS—his employment contract. (SACC, ¶¶ 127.) \r"}},"master":"___RESULTS_22","kernel_data":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 324Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 324Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 324Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyStueve Bros. Farms, LLCCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyStueve Bros. Farms, LLCCaseName.SecondPartyBerger KahnCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyBerger KahnCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2013) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2013 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2013CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2013CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyStueve Bros. Farms, LLC HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter222 Cal.App.4th 303, 324Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages324Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First324Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber324Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage303Reporter.NameCal. App. 4thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume222RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyBerger Kahn suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_8"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323","CitationRichText":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":1,"Title":"Positive treatment - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalPositive.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5B0C-84N1-J9X6-H3H8-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323","ShortText":"222 Cal. App. 4th 303","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Stueve\r\nBros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 324Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 324Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 324Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyStueve Bros. Farms, LLCCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyStueve Bros. Farms, LLCCaseName.SecondPartyBerger KahnCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyBerger KahnCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2013) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2013 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2013CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2013CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyStueve Bros. Farms, LLC HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter222 Cal.App.4th 303, 324Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages324Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First324Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber324Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage303Reporter.NameCal. App. 4thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume222RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyBerger Kahn suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_8","Markup":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323","Master":"___RESULTS_22","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK17","Original_string":"Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","PinPage":"323","ReadOrderIndex":9453,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"222 Cal. App. 4th 303","Start":9453,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Stueve\r\nBros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 323

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Stueve Bros. Farms, LLC v. Berger Kahn (2013) 222 Cal.App.4th 303, 324.)

Here, Quon alleges that the UPS Parties gave substantial assistance or encouragement to Lopez in her attempted extortion of Quon. (SACC, ¶ 121.) The only facts alleged by Quon are that Quon informed UPS of the threats of extortion made by Lopez, and the rest of the UPS Parties knew that Duran had threatened Quon. (SACC, ¶ 120.) As noted by the UPS Parties, these facts are insufficient to show substantial assistance or encouragement. This defect was raised by the Court in its order sustaining Tefft’s demurrer to the FACC, and although Quon was given an opportunity to cure the defect, he has failed to do so. Therefore, the Court sustains the UPS Parties’ demurrer to the second cause of action for aiding and abetting without leave to amend.

Breach of Contract

The UPS Parties contend that the third cause of action for breach of employment contract must fail because Quan fails to allege the existence of any contract between himself and any of the individual UPS Parties. That was true of the FACC, and that remains true of the SACC. As to UPS, Quon does allege the existence of a contract with UPS—his employment contract. (SACC, ¶¶ 127.)

The UPS Parties argue that the cause of action also fails as to UPS because Quon does not allege whether the contract was written, oral, or implied by conduct. (\r\n PsychStateSubjectCode\r\n Full.StateStatuteCite\r\n Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 430.10\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)","original_string":"Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)","error":null,"fullText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 430.10","isParallel":false,"parallel":null,"start":10836,"end":10872,"pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","readOrderIndex":10836,"index":10836,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":0,"CiteShepSignalLink":null,"story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":null,"name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK18","foundBy":"PsychStateSubjectCode","FullTextParen":"Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$id":"25","End":1122,"Offset":10675,"Start":0,"nref":0,"nind":0,"story":"wdMainTextStory","namedRanges":[{"$id":"26","Name":"Psych_Cite_18","Range":{"$id":"27","ts":{"$ref":"25"},"_Start":161,"_End":197,"_Text":"The UPS Parties argue that the cause of action also fails as to UPS because Quon does not allege whether the contract was written, oral, or implied by conduct. (Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g).) But Quon alleges that UPS promised “by words and/or conduct” to terminate him only for good cause. (SACC, ¶ 128.) Next, the UPS Parties argue that Quon fails to plead facts that allow him to overcome the presumption of at-will employment under Labor Code section 2922, which provides that “[a]n employment, having no specified term, may be terminated at will of either party on notice to the other.” In the SACC, Quon alleges that throughout his 13 years with UPS, he has received raises, commendations, positive evaluations, and promotions. (SACC, ¶ 128.) Quon also alleges that he was informed that he had an employee right to participate in its Employee Dispute Resolution program and that Price told Quon that his suspension would be removed and he would be able to return to work. (SACC, ¶ 128.) Quon also alleges that UPS’s policies and practices show that employees may only be discharged for cause. (SAC, ¶ 128.) \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null},{"$id":"28","Name":"Psych_Cite_19","Range":{"$id":"29","ts":{"$ref":"25"},"_Start":444,"_End":467,"_Text":"The UPS Parties argue that the cause of action also fails as to UPS because Quon does not allege whether the contract was written, oral, or implied by conduct. (Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g).) But Quon alleges that UPS promised “by words and/or conduct” to terminate him only for good cause. (SACC, ¶ 128.) Next, the UPS Parties argue that Quon fails to plead facts that allow him to overcome the presumption of at-will employment under Labor Code section 2922, which provides that “[a]n employment, having no specified term, may be terminated at will of either party on notice to the other.” In the SACC, Quon alleges that throughout his 13 years with UPS, he has received raises, commendations, positive evaluations, and promotions. (SACC, ¶ 128.) Quon also alleges that he was informed that he had an employee right to participate in its Employee Dispute Resolution program and that Price told Quon that his suspension would be removed and he would be able to return to work. (SACC, ¶ 128.) Quon also alleges that UPS’s policies and practices show that employees may only be discharged for cause. (SAC, ¶ 128.) \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null}],"Range":{"$id":"30","ts":{"$ref":"25"},"_Start":0,"_End":1122,"_Text":"The UPS Parties argue that the cause of action also fails as to UPS because Quon does not allege whether the contract was written, oral, or implied by conduct. (Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g).) But Quon alleges that UPS promised “by words and/or conduct” to terminate him only for good cause. (SACC, ¶ 128.) Next, the UPS Parties argue that Quon fails to plead facts that allow him to overcome the presumption of at-will employment under Labor Code section 2922, which provides that “[a]n employment, having no specified term, may be terminated at will of either party on notice to the other.” In the SACC, Quon alleges that throughout his 13 years with UPS, he has received raises, commendations, positive evaluations, and promotions. (SACC, ¶ 128.) Quon also alleges that he was informed that he had an employee right to participate in its Employee Dispute Resolution program and that Price told Quon that his suspension would be removed and he would be able to return to work. (SACC, ¶ 128.) Quon also alleges that UPS’s policies and practices show that employees may only be discharged for cause. (SAC, ¶ 128.) \r"}},"master":"___RESULTS_24","kernel_data":"Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteCode Civ. Proc., §430.10, subd. (g)StateStatute.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections §430.10, subd. (g)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol §StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subdsubd. (g)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd._PatternSubdsList.SubdsListStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First(g)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First._PatternSubdScalarOrRangeCal.SubdScalarOrRangeCalStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First.First(g)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.subdivisionssubdivisionStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X1430.10StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectCiv. Proc. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_24"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)","CitationRichText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":-1,"Title":"No Analysis","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/blank.jpg","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":null,"ShowShepardSignal":false,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)","ShortText":"Cal. Civ. Proc. Code § 430.10","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Code\r\nCiv. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteCode Civ. Proc., §430.10, subd. (g)StateStatute.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections §430.10, subd. (g)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol §StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subdsubd. (g)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd._PatternSubdsList.SubdsListStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First(g)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First._PatternSubdScalarOrRangeCal.SubdScalarOrRangeCalStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First.First(g)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.subdivisionssubdivisionStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X1430.10StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectCiv. Proc. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_24","Markup":"Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)","Master":"___RESULTS_24","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK18","Original_string":"Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","PinPage":"","ReadOrderIndex":10836,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"Cal. Civ. Proc. Code §430.10","Start":10836,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Code\r\nCiv. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g)

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Code Civ. Proc., § 430.10, subd. (g).) But Quon alleges that UPS promised “by words and/or conduct” to terminate him only for good cause. (SACC, ¶ 128.) Next, the UPS Parties argue that Quon fails to plead facts that allow him to overcome the presumption of at-will employment under \r\n PsychStateSubjectCode\r\n Full.StateStatuteCite\r\n Cal. Lab. Code § 2922\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Labor Code section 2922","original_string":"Labor Code section 2922","error":null,"fullText":"Labor Code section 2922","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"Cal. Lab. Code § 2922","isParallel":false,"parallel":null,"start":11119,"end":11142,"pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","readOrderIndex":11119,"index":11119,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":0,"CiteShepSignalLink":null,"story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":null,"name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK19","foundBy":"PsychStateSubjectCode","FullTextParen":"Labor Code section 2922","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"25"},"master":"___RESULTS_25","kernel_data":"Labor Code section 2922Labor Code section 2922Labor Code section 2922Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteLabor Code section 2922 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections section 2922 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol section StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X12922StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectLab. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_25"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Labor Code section 2922","CitationRichText":"Labor Code section 2922","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":-1,"Title":"No Analysis","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/blank.jpg","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":null,"ShowShepardSignal":false,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Labor Code section 2922","ShortText":"Cal. Lab. Code § 2922","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Labor Code section 2922","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Labor Code section 2922"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Labor\r\nCode section 2922

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Labor Code section 2922Labor Code section 2922Labor Code section 2922Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteLabor Code section 2922 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections section 2922 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol section StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X12922StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectLab. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_25","Markup":"Labor Code section 2922","Master":"___RESULTS_25","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK19","Original_string":"Labor Code section 2922","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","PinPage":"","ReadOrderIndex":11119,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"Cal. Lab. Code section 2922","Start":11119,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Labor\r\nCode section 2922

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Labor Code section 2922, which provides that “at . . . will of either party on notice to the other .","SuggestionForQuote":"an employment, having no specified term, may be terminated at the will of either party on notice to the other","CCSuggestionForQuote":" an employment , having no specified term , may be terminated at the will of either party on notice to the other","CitationText":"Labor Code section 2922","ModifiedCitationText":"Labor Code section 2922","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":[],"IconIndicator":9,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":10,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":8,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":8,"IsEnabled":true,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":0,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":false,"ShowPinPointPage":false,"SuggestionVisibility":true,"SuggestedDocUri":"[a]n%20employment,%20having%20no%20specified%20term,%20may%20be%20terminated%20at%20will%20of%20either%20party%20on%20notice%20to%20the%20other."}}}' docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">[a]n employment, having no specified term, may be terminated at the will of either party on notice to the other.” In the SACC, Quon alleges that throughout his 13 years with UPS, he has received raises, commendations, positive evaluations, and promotions. (SACC, ¶ 128.) Quon also alleges that he was informed that he had an employee right to participate in its Employee Dispute Resolution program and that Price told Quon that his suspension would be removed and he would be able to return to work. (SACC, ¶ 128.) Quon also alleges that UPS’s policies and practices show that employees may only be discharged for cause. (SAC, ¶ 128.)

“including [ \" ] the personnel policies or practices of the employer , the employee’s longevity of service , actions or communications by the employer reflecting assurances of continued employment , and the practices of the industry in which the employee is engaged .","SuggestionForQuote":"In the employment context, factors apart from consideration and express terms may be used to ascertain the existence and content of an employment agreement, including 'the personnel policies or practices of the employer, the employee's longevity of service, actions or communications by the employer reflecting assurances of continued employment, and the practices of the industry in which the employee is engaged.","CCSuggestionForQuote":" In the employment context , factors apart from consideration and express terms may be used to ascertain the existence and content of an employment agreement , including \" the personnel policies or practices of the employer , the employee's longevity of service , actions or communications by the employer reflecting assurances of continued employment , and the practices of the industry in which the employee is engaged .","CitationText":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]","ModifiedCitationText":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":[],"IconIndicator":9,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":10,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":8,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":8,"IsEnabled":true,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":0,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":false,"ShowPinPointPage":false,"SuggestionVisibility":true,"SuggestedDocUri":"In%20the%20employment%20context,%20factors%20apart%20from%20consideration%20and%20express%20terms%20may%20be%20used%20to%20ascertain%20the%20existence%20and%20content%20of%20an%20employment%20agreement,%20including%20the%20personnel%20policies%20or%20practices%20of%20the%20employer,%20the%20employee%e2%80%99s%20longevity%20of%20service,%20actions%20or%20communications%20by%20the%20employer%20reflecting%20assurances%20of%20continued%20employment,%20and%20the%20practices%20of%20the%20industry%20in%20which%20the%20employee%20is%20engaged."}}}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">In the employment context, factors apart from consideration and express terms may be used to ascertain the existence and content of an employment agreement, including the personnel policies or practices of the employer, the employee’s longevity of service, actions or communications by the employer reflecting assurances of continued employment, and the practices of the industry in which the employee is engaged.” (\r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 47 Cal. 3d 654\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]","original_string":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]","error":null,"fullText":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"47 Cal. 3d 654","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":12214,"end":12301,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":12253,"index":12214,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":2,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XW4-F561-2NSF-C1TS-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"680","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK20","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$id":"31","End":933,"Offset":11797,"Start":0,"nref":0,"nind":0,"story":"wdMainTextStory","namedRanges":[{"$id":"32","Name":"Psych_Cite_20","Range":{"$id":"33","ts":{"$ref":"31"},"_Start":417,"_End":504,"_Text":"“In the employment context, factors apart from consideration and express terms may be used to ascertain the existence and content of an employment agreement, including the personnel policies or practices of the employer, the employee’s longevity of service, actions or communications by the employer reflecting assurances of continued employment, and the practices of the industry in which the employee is engaged.” (Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted].) Moreover, “[t]he existence of an implied promise to discharge an employee only for good cause is generally, but not always, a question of fact for the jury.” (Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386.) Based on the above authorities, the Court finds that Quon has alleged sufficient facts to overcome the demurrer to the breach of contract cause of action as to UPS. \r\tInterference with Contract\r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null},{"$id":"34","Name":"Psych_Cite_21","Range":{"$id":"35","ts":{"$ref":"31"},"_Start":666,"_End":736,"_Text":"“In the employment context, factors apart from consideration and express terms may be used to ascertain the existence and content of an employment agreement, including the personnel policies or practices of the employer, the employee’s longevity of service, actions or communications by the employer reflecting assurances of continued employment, and the practices of the industry in which the employee is engaged.” (Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted].) Moreover, “[t]he existence of an implied promise to discharge an employee only for good cause is generally, but not always, a question of fact for the jury.” (Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386.) Based on the above authorities, the Court finds that Quon has alleged sufficient facts to overcome the demurrer to the breach of contract cause of action as to UPS. \r\tInterference with Contract\r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null}],"Range":{"$id":"36","ts":{"$ref":"31"},"_Start":0,"_End":933,"_Text":"“In the employment context, factors apart from consideration and express terms may be used to ascertain the existence and content of an employment agreement, including the personnel policies or practices of the employer, the employee’s longevity of service, actions or communications by the employer reflecting assurances of continued employment, and the practices of the industry in which the employee is engaged.” (Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted].) Moreover, “[t]he existence of an implied promise to discharge an employee only for good cause is generally, but not always, a question of fact for the jury.” (Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386.) Based on the above authorities, the Court finds that Quon has alleged sufficient facts to overcome the demurrer to the breach of contract cause of action as to UPS. \r\tInterference with Contract\r"}},"master":"___RESULTS_26","kernel_data":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyFoleyCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyFoleyCaseName.SecondPartyInteractive Data Corp.CaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyInteractive Data Corp.CaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1988) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1988 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1988CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1988CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyFoley HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Parenthetical [internal quotations omitted] Parenthetical.([ [Parenthetical.([.[[Parenthetical.([._Pattern([.([Parenthetical.])] Parenthetical.]).]]Parenthetical.])._Pattern]).])Parenthetical.__OtherReasonableExplanationinternal quotations omittedParenthetical._PatternParenthetical.ParentheticalReporter47 Cal.3d 654, 680Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages680Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First680Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber680Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage654Reporter.NameCal. 3dReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume47RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyInteractive Data Corp. suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_26"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]","CitationRichText":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":2,"Title":"Possible negative treatment - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalPossibleNegative.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XW4-F561-2NSF-C1TS-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]","ShortText":"47 Cal. 3d 654","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Foley\r\nv. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations\r\nomitted]

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyFoleyCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyFoleyCaseName.SecondPartyInteractive Data Corp.CaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyInteractive Data Corp.CaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1988) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1988 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1988CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1988CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyFoley HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Parenthetical [internal quotations omitted] Parenthetical.([ [Parenthetical.([.[[Parenthetical.([._Pattern([.([Parenthetical.])] Parenthetical.]).]]Parenthetical.])._Pattern]).])Parenthetical.__OtherReasonableExplanationinternal quotations omittedParenthetical._PatternParenthetical.ParentheticalReporter47 Cal.3d 654, 680Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages680Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First680Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber680Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage654Reporter.NameCal. 3dReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume47RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyInteractive Data Corp. suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_26","Markup":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]","Master":"___RESULTS_26","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK20","Original_string":"Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted]","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","PinPage":"680","ReadOrderIndex":12214,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"47 Cal. 3d 654","Start":12214,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Foley\r\nv. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations\r\nomitted]

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Foley v. Interactive Data Corp. (1988) 47 Cal.3d 654, 680 [internal quotations omitted].) Moreover, “Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CitationText":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386","ModifiedCitationText":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":[],"IconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":0,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":8,"IsEnabled":false,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":0,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":true,"ShowPinPointPage":false,"SuggestionVisibility":false,"SuggestedDocUri":"[t]he%20existence%20of%20an%20implied%20promise%20to%20discharge%20an%20employee%20only%20for%20good%20cause%20is%20generally,%20but%20not%20always,%20a%20question%20of%20fact%20for%20the%20jury."}}}' docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">[t]he existence of an implied promise to discharge an employee only for good cause is generally, but not always, a question of fact for the jury.” (\r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 74 Cal. App. 4th 1359\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386","original_string":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386","error":null,"fullText":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"74 Cal. App. 4th 1359","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":12463,"end":12533,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":12508,"index":12463,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":2,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XWN-D8V1-2NSD-R294-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"1386","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK21","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"31"},"master":"___RESULTS_27","kernel_data":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyEisenbergCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyEisenbergCaseName.SecondPartyAlameda Newspapers, Inc.CaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyAlameda Newspapers, Inc.CaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1999) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1999 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1999CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1999CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyEisenberg HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages1386Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First1386Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber1386Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage1359Reporter.NameCal. App. 4thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume74RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyAlameda Newspapers, Inc. suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_27"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386","CitationRichText":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":2,"Title":"Possible negative treatment - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalPossibleNegative.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XWN-D8V1-2NSD-R294-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386","ShortText":"74 Cal. App. 4th 1359","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Eisenberg\r\nv. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyEisenbergCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyEisenbergCaseName.SecondPartyAlameda Newspapers, Inc.CaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyAlameda Newspapers, Inc.CaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1999) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1999 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1999CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1999CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyEisenberg HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages1386Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First1386Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber1386Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage1359Reporter.NameCal. App. 4thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume74RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyAlameda Newspapers, Inc. suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_27","Markup":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386","Master":"___RESULTS_27","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK21","Original_string":"Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","PinPage":"1386","ReadOrderIndex":12463,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"74 Cal. App. 4th 1359","Start":12463,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Eisenberg\r\nv. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Eisenberg v. Alameda Newspapers, Inc. (1999) 74 Cal.App.4th 1359, 1386.) Based on the above authorities, the Court finds that Quon has alleged sufficient facts to overcome the demurrer to the breach of contract cause of action as to UPS.

Interference with Contract

The UPS Parties contend that the fourth cause of action for interference with contract must fail because Quon exceeded the scope of permissible amendment when he added the UPS Parties as cross-defendants to this cause of action. In the FACC, the interference with contractual relations claim was asserted solely against Lopez. Therefore, the demurrer by Tefft did not address that cause of action, and the Court did not grant Quon leave to amend that cause of action in sustaining Tefft’s demurrer. “demurrer . . . with leave to amend , the plaintiff may amend his or her complaint only as authorized by the court’s order .","SuggestionForQuote":"Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CCSuggestionForQuote":"Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CitationText":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456","ModifiedCitationText":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":[],"IconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":0,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":8,"IsEnabled":false,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":0,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":true,"ShowPinPointPage":false,"SuggestionVisibility":false,"SuggestedDocUri":"Following%20an%20order%20sustaining%20a%20demurrer%20.%20.%20.%20with%20leave%20to%20amend,%20the%20plaintiff%20may%20amend%20his%20or%20her%20complaint%20only%20as%20authorized%20by%20the%20court%e2%80%99s%20order."}}}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Following an order sustaining a demurrer . . . with leave to amend, the plaintiff may amend his or her complaint only as authorized by the court’s order.” (\r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 33 Cal. App. 5th 431\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456","original_string":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456","error":null,"fullText":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"33 Cal. App. 5th 431","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":13385,"end":13430,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":13407,"index":13385,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":6,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5VPW-RSP1-J9X6-H1DJ-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"456","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK23","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$id":"37","End":1188,"Offset":12729,"Start":0,"nref":0,"nind":0,"story":"wdMainTextStory","namedRanges":[{"$id":"38","Name":"Psych_Cite_22","Range":{"$id":"39","ts":{"$ref":"37"},"_Start":912,"_End":917,"_Text":"The UPS Parties contend that the fourth cause of action for interference with contract must fail because Quon exceeded the scope of permissible amendment when he added the UPS Parties as cross-defendants to this cause of action. In the FACC, the interference with contractual relations claim was asserted solely against Lopez. Therefore, the demurrer by Tefft did not address that cause of action, and the Court did not grant Quon leave to amend that cause of action in sustaining Tefft’s demurrer. “Following an order sustaining a demurrer . . . with leave to amend, the plaintiff may amend his or her complaint only as authorized by the court’s order.” (Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456.) “The plaintiff may not amend the complaint to add a new cause of action without having obtained permission to do so, unless the new cause of action is within the scope of the order granting leave to amend.” (Ibid.) Here, the Court did not grant Quon leave to add a new cause of action against the UPS Parties, and the new cause of action is not within the scope of the order granting leave to amend because the interference with contractual relations claim was not addressed at all. \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null},{"$id":"40","Name":"Psych_Cite_23","Range":{"$id":"41","ts":{"$ref":"37"},"_Start":656,"_End":701,"_Text":"The UPS Parties contend that the fourth cause of action for interference with contract must fail because Quon exceeded the scope of permissible amendment when he added the UPS Parties as cross-defendants to this cause of action. In the FACC, the interference with contractual relations claim was asserted solely against Lopez. Therefore, the demurrer by Tefft did not address that cause of action, and the Court did not grant Quon leave to amend that cause of action in sustaining Tefft’s demurrer. “Following an order sustaining a demurrer . . . with leave to amend, the plaintiff may amend his or her complaint only as authorized by the court’s order.” (Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456.) “The plaintiff may not amend the complaint to add a new cause of action without having obtained permission to do so, unless the new cause of action is within the scope of the order granting leave to amend.” (Ibid.) Here, the Court did not grant Quon leave to add a new cause of action against the UPS Parties, and the new cause of action is not within the scope of the order granting leave to amend because the interference with contractual relations claim was not addressed at all. \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null}],"Range":{"$id":"42","ts":{"$ref":"37"},"_Start":0,"_End":1188,"_Text":"The UPS Parties contend that the fourth cause of action for interference with contract must fail because Quon exceeded the scope of permissible amendment when he added the UPS Parties as cross-defendants to this cause of action. In the FACC, the interference with contractual relations claim was asserted solely against Lopez. Therefore, the demurrer by Tefft did not address that cause of action, and the Court did not grant Quon leave to amend that cause of action in sustaining Tefft’s demurrer. “Following an order sustaining a demurrer . . . with leave to amend, the plaintiff may amend his or her complaint only as authorized by the court’s order.” (Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456.) “The plaintiff may not amend the complaint to add a new cause of action without having obtained permission to do so, unless the new cause of action is within the scope of the order granting leave to amend.” (Ibid.) Here, the Court did not grant Quon leave to add a new cause of action against the UPS Parties, and the new cause of action is not within the scope of the order granting leave to amend because the interference with contractual relations claim was not addressed at all. \r"}},"master":"___RESULTS_28","kernel_data":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyZakkCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyZakkCaseName.SecondPartyDieselCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyDieselCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2019) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2019 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2019CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2019CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyZakk HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages456Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First456Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber456Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage431Reporter.NameCal. App. 5thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume33RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyDiesel suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_28"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456","CitationRichText":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":6,"Title":"Information available - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalCiteInfoAvailable.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5VPW-RSP1-J9X6-H1DJ-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456","ShortText":"33 Cal. App. 5th 431","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Zakk\r\nv. Diesel (2019)\r\n33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyZakkCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyZakkCaseName.SecondPartyDieselCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyDieselCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2019) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2019 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2019CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2019CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyZakk HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages456Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First456Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber456Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage431Reporter.NameCal. App. 5thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume33RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyDiesel suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_28","Markup":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456","Master":"___RESULTS_28","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK23","Original_string":"Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","PinPage":"456","ReadOrderIndex":13385,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"33 Cal. App. 5th 431","Start":13385,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Zakk\r\nv. Diesel (2019)\r\n33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Zakk v. Diesel (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456.) “Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CitationText":"Ibid.","ModifiedCitationText":"Ibid.","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":[],"IconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":0,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":8,"IsEnabled":false,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":0,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":true,"ShowPinPointPage":false,"SuggestionVisibility":false,"SuggestedDocUri":"The%20plaintiff%20may%20not%20amend%20the%20complaint%20to%20add%20a%20new%20cause%20of%20action%20without%20having%20obtained%20permission%20to%20do%20so,%20unless%20the%20new%20cause%20of%20action%20is%20within%20the%20scope%20of%20the%20order%20granting%20leave%20to%20amend."}}}' docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">The plaintiff may not amend the complaint to add a new cause of action without having obtained permission to do so, unless the new cause of action is within the scope of the order granting leave to amend.” (\r\n PsychId\r\n Id\r\n 33 Cal. App. 5th 431\r\n","ParentCiteID":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK23","Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Ibid.","original_string":"Ibid.","error":null,"fullText":"Ibid.","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"33 Cal. App. 5th 431","isParallel":false,"parallel":null,"start":13641,"end":13646,"pattern":"Id","readOrderIndex":13640,"index":13641,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":6,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5VPW-RSP1-J9X6-H1DJ-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"456","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK22","foundBy":"PsychId","FullTextParen":"Ibid.","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"37"},"master":"___RESULTS_28","kernel_data":"Ibid.Ibid.Ibid. Id.CaseUIdciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyZakkCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyZakkCaseName.SecondPartyDieselCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyDieselCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2019) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2019 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2019CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2019CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyZakk HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESIdIbid.Id._PatternIbidGraph.IbidGraphId.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaId.IdIbid.master_name___RESULTS_28NY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages456Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First456Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber456Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage431Reporter.NameCal. App. 5thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume33RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyDiesel suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupra"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Ibid.","CitationRichText":"Ibid.","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":6,"Title":"Information available - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalCiteInfoAvailable.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5VPW-RSP1-J9X6-H1DJ-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":true,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Ibid.","ShortText":"33 Cal. App. 5th 431","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Ibid.","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Ibid."},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Ibid.

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Ibid.Ibid.Ibid.Id.CaseUIdciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyZakkCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyZakkCaseName.SecondPartyDieselCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyDieselCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2019) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2019 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2019CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2019CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyZakk HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESIdIbid.Id._PatternIbidGraph.IbidGraphId.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaId.IdIbid.master_name___RESULTS_28NY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter33 Cal.App.5th 431, 456Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages456Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First456Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber456Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage431Reporter.NameCal. App. 5thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume33RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyDiesel suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupra","Markup":"Ibid.","Master":"___RESULTS_28","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK22","Original_string":"Ibid.","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Id.CaseUId","PinPage":"456","ReadOrderIndex":13641,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"33 Cal. App. 5th 431","Start":13641,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Ibid.

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Ibid.) Here, the Court did not grant Quon leave to add a new cause of action against the UPS Parties, and the new cause of action is not within the scope of the order granting leave to amend because the interference with contractual relations claim was not addressed at all.

The UPS Parties also argue that as to UPS, there is no cause of action stated for interference with contract because UPS is alleged to be a party to the contract at issue. (See Applied Equipment Corp. v. Litton Saudi Arabia Ltd. (1994) 7 Cal.4th 503, 514 [“The tort duty not to interfere with the contract falls only on strangers—interlopers who have no legitimate interest in the scope or course of the contract’s performance.”].)

Therefore, the demurrer to the fourth cause of action is sustained, without leave to amend.

FEHA Discrimination

The UPS Parties argue that the discrimination claims fail as to the individual UPS Parties because the individuals are not alleged to be Quon’s employer, and discrimination claims are viable only as to employers. (\r\n PsychStateSubjectCode\r\n Full.StateStatuteCite\r\n Cal. Gov't Code §12940\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)","original_string":"Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)","error":null,"fullText":"Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"Cal. Gov't Code §12940","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":14680,"end":14709,"pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","readOrderIndex":14680,"index":215,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":0,"CiteShepSignalLink":null,"story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK13","foundBy":"PsychStateSubjectCode","FullTextParen":null,"ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$id":"47","End":472,"Offset":14465,"Start":0,"nref":0,"nind":0,"story":"wdMainTextStory","namedRanges":[{"$id":"48","Name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK13","Range":{"$id":"49","ts":{"$ref":"47"},"_Start":215,"_End":244,"_Text":"\tThe UPS Parties argue that the discrimination claims fail as to the individual UPS Parties because the individuals are not alleged to be Quon’s employer, and discrimination claims are viable only as to employers. (Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a); Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663, superseded by statute on other grounds [“[W]e conclude that individuals who do not themselves qualify as employers may not be sued under the FEHA for alleged discriminatory acts.”].) \r"},"foundBy":"PsychStateSubjectCode","pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","tabName":"Cal. Gov't Code §12940"},{"$id":"50","Name":"Psych_Cite_25","Range":{"$id":"51","ts":{"$ref":"47"},"_Start":246,"_End":286,"_Text":"\tThe UPS Parties argue that the discrimination claims fail as to the individual UPS Parties because the individuals are not alleged to be Quon’s employer, and discrimination claims are viable only as to employers. (Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a); Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663, superseded by statute on other grounds [“[W]e conclude that individuals who do not themselves qualify as employers may not be sued under the FEHA for alleged discriminatory acts.”].) \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null}],"Range":{"$id":"52","ts":{"$ref":"47"},"_Start":0,"_End":472,"_Text":"\tThe UPS Parties argue that the discrimination claims fail as to the individual UPS Parties because the individuals are not alleged to be Quon’s employer, and discrimination claims are viable only as to employers. (Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a); Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663, superseded by statute on other grounds [“[W]e conclude that individuals who do not themselves qualify as employers may not be sued under the FEHA for alleged discriminatory acts.”].) \r"}},"master":"___RESULTS_13","kernel_data":"Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteGov. Code, §12940, subd. (a)StateStatute.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections §12940, subd. (a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol §StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subdsubd. (a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd._PatternSubdsList.SubdsListStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First(a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First._PatternSubdScalarOrRangeCal.SubdScalarOrRangeCalStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First.First(a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.subdivisionssubdivisionStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X112940StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectGov't CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_13"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)","CitationRichText":"Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":-1,"Title":"No Analysis","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/blank.jpg","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":null,"ShowShepardSignal":false,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)","ShortText":"Cal. Gov't Code §12940","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteGov. Code, §12940, subd. (a)StateStatute.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections §12940, subd. (a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol §StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subdsubd. (a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd._PatternSubdsList.SubdsListStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First(a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First._PatternSubdScalarOrRangeCal.SubdScalarOrRangeCalStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First.First(a)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.subdivisionssubdivisionStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X112940StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectGov't CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_13","Markup":"Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)","Master":"___RESULTS_13","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK13","Original_string":"Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a)","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","PinPage":"","ReadOrderIndex":14680,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"Cal. Gov't Code §12940","Start":14680,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Gov.\r\nCode, § 12940, subd. (a)

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Gov. Code, § 12940, subd. (a); \r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 18 Cal. 4th 640\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663","original_string":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663","error":null,"fullText":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"18 Cal. 4th 640","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":14711,"end":14751,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":14732,"index":14711,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":3,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XWN-0BW1-2NSF-C0XG-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"663","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK25","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"47"},"master":"___RESULTS_30","kernel_data":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyRenoCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyRenoCaseName.SecondPartyBairdCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyBairdCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1998) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1998 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1998CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1998CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyReno HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter18 Cal.4th 640, 663Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages663Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First663Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber663Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage640Reporter.NameCal. 4thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume18RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyBaird suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_30"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663","CitationRichText":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":3,"Title":"Negative treatment - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalNegative.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XWN-0BW1-2NSF-C0XG-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663","ShortText":"18 Cal. 4th 640","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Reno\r\nv. Baird (1998)\r\n18 Cal.4th 640, 663

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyRenoCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyRenoCaseName.SecondPartyBairdCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyBairdCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1998) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1998 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1998CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1998CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyReno HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter18 Cal.4th 640, 663Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages663Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First663Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber663Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage640Reporter.NameCal. 4thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume18RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyBaird suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_30","Markup":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663","Master":"___RESULTS_30","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK25","Original_string":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","PinPage":"663","ReadOrderIndex":14711,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"18 Cal. 4th 640","Start":14711,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Reno\r\nv. Baird (1998)\r\n18 Cal.4th 640, 663

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663, superseded by statute on other grounds [“Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CitationText":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663","ModifiedCitationText":"Reno v. Baird (1998) 18 Cal.4th 640, 663","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":[],"IconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":0,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":8,"IsEnabled":false,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":0,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":true,"ShowPinPointPage":false,"SuggestionVisibility":false,"SuggestedDocUri":"[W]e%20conclude%20that%20individuals%20who%20do%20not%20themselves%20qualify%20as%20employers%20may%20not%20be%20sued%20under%20the%20FEHA%20for%20alleged%20discriminatory%20acts."}}}' docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">[W]e conclude that individuals who do not themselves qualify as employers may not be sued under the FEHA for alleged discriminatory acts.”].)

As to UPS, the UPS Parties contend that the cause of action for discrimination based on gender must also fail because Quon has not alleged any facts supporting the elements of the claims. In support of the fifth cause of action, Quon alleges that he was subjected to harassment by Lopez, and that UPS failed to take action to stop her harassment. (SACC, ¶¶ 143-144.) This is not a discrimination claim, as there are no facts establishing that Quon was a member of a protected class, that he was qualified for a position or was performing competently in a position he held, that he suffered an adverse employment action such as termination or demotion, and other circumstances suggest discriminatory motive. (\r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 5 Cal. App. 5th 368\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378","original_string":"Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378","error":null,"fullText":"Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"5 Cal. App. 5th 368","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":15645,"end":15719,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":15697,"index":15645,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":1,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5M4R-SN71-DXC8-737M-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"378","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK26","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":"Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$id":"53","End":2107,"Offset":14936,"Start":0,"nref":0,"nind":0,"story":"wdMainTextStory","namedRanges":[{"$id":"54","Name":"Psych_Cite_26","Range":{"$id":"55","ts":{"$ref":"53"},"_Start":709,"_End":783,"_Text":"\tAs to UPS, the UPS Parties contend that the cause of action for discrimination based on gender must also fail because Quon has not alleged any facts supporting the elements of the claims. In support of the fifth cause of action, Quon alleges that he was subjected to harassment by Lopez, and that UPS failed to take action to stop her harassment. (SACC, ¶¶ 143-144.) This is not a discrimination claim, as there are no facts establishing that Quon was a member of a protected class, that he was qualified for a position or was performing competently in a position he held, that he suffered an adverse employment action such as termination or demotion, and other circumstances suggest discriminatory motive. (Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378.) \r\tNext, the UPS Parties argue that the race discrimination claim fails because Quon does not allege that he belongs to a protected class. The Court notes that in various parts of the SACC, Quon indirectly alleges that he is Asian, which the Court finds suffices to establish that he belongs to a protected class. (See SACC, ¶¶ 92, 98.) The UPS Parties also contend that Quon fails to allege a causal connection between his race and the decision to terminate him. Quon alleges that he was terminated based on “racial and ethnic stereotypes.” (SACC, ¶ 149.) The Court notes that Quon alleges that during two separate meetings with HR, Vargas made a comment relating Quon’s Asian heritage to being good at technology/computers. (SACC, ¶¶ 92, 98.) The Court finds that this is sufficient to allege circumstances that suggest discriminatory motive. \r\tTherefore, the demurrer to the fifth and sixth causes of action is sustained as to the individual UPS Parties without leave to amend, the demurrer to the fifth cause of action is sustained as to UPS with leave to amend, but the demurrer to the sixth cause of action is overruled as to UPS.\r\r\tFEHA Harassment\r\tThe UPS Parties contend that the harassment claims fail as a matter of law because Quon has not alleged any severe or pervasive harassing conduct by the UPS Parties.\r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null}],"Range":{"$id":"56","ts":{"$ref":"53"},"_Start":0,"_End":2107,"_Text":"\tAs to UPS, the UPS Parties contend that the cause of action for discrimination based on gender must also fail because Quon has not alleged any facts supporting the elements of the claims. In support of the fifth cause of action, Quon alleges that he was subjected to harassment by Lopez, and that UPS failed to take action to stop her harassment. (SACC, ¶¶ 143-144.) This is not a discrimination claim, as there are no facts establishing that Quon was a member of a protected class, that he was qualified for a position or was performing competently in a position he held, that he suffered an adverse employment action such as termination or demotion, and other circumstances suggest discriminatory motive. (Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378.) \r\tNext, the UPS Parties argue that the race discrimination claim fails because Quon does not allege that he belongs to a protected class. The Court notes that in various parts of the SACC, Quon indirectly alleges that he is Asian, which the Court finds suffices to establish that he belongs to a protected class. (See SACC, ¶¶ 92, 98.) The UPS Parties also contend that Quon fails to allege a causal connection between his race and the decision to terminate him. Quon alleges that he was terminated based on “racial and ethnic stereotypes.” (SACC, ¶ 149.) The Court notes that Quon alleges that during two separate meetings with HR, Vargas made a comment relating Quon’s Asian heritage to being good at technology/computers. (SACC, ¶¶ 92, 98.) The Court finds that this is sufficient to allege circumstances that suggest discriminatory motive. \r\tTherefore, the demurrer to the fifth and sixth causes of action is sustained as to the individual UPS Parties without leave to amend, the demurrer to the fifth cause of action is sustained as to UPS with leave to amend, but the demurrer to the sixth cause of action is overruled as to UPS.\r\r\tFEHA Harassment\r\tThe UPS Parties contend that the harassment claims fail as a matter of law because Quon has not alleged any severe or pervasive harassing conduct by the UPS Parties.\r"}},"master":"___RESULTS_31","kernel_data":"Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyDinslageCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyDinslageCaseName.SecondPartyCity and County of San FranciscoCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyCity and County of San FranciscoCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2016) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2016 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2016CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2016CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyDinslage HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages378Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First378Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber378Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage368Reporter.NameCal. App. 5thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume5RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyCity and County of San Francisco suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_31"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378","CitationRichText":"Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":1,"Title":"Positive treatment - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalPositive.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5M4R-SN71-DXC8-737M-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378","ShortText":"5 Cal. App. 5th 368","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Dinslage\r\nv. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyDinslageCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyDinslageCaseName.SecondPartyCity and County of San FranciscoCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyCity and County of San FranciscoCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2016) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2016 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2016CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2016CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyDinslage HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages378Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First378Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber378Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage368Reporter.NameCal. App. 5thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume5RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyCity and County of San Francisco suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_31","Markup":"Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378","Master":"___RESULTS_31","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK26","Original_string":"Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","PinPage":"378","ReadOrderIndex":15645,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"5 Cal. App. 5th 368","Start":15645,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Dinslage\r\nv. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Dinslage v. City and County of San Francisco (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 368, 378.)

Next, the UPS Parties argue that the race discrimination claim fails because Quon does not allege that he belongs to a protected class. The Court notes that in various parts of the SACC, Quon indirectly alleges that he is Asian, which the Court finds suffices to establish that he belongs to a protected class. (See SACC, ¶¶ 92, 98.) The UPS Parties also contend that Quon fails to allege a causal connection between his race and the decision to terminate him. Quon alleges that he was terminated based on “racial and ethnic stereotypes.” (SACC, ¶ 149.) The Court notes that Quon alleges that during two separate meetings with HR, Vargas made a comment relating Quon’s Asian heritage to being good at technology/computers. (SACC, ¶¶ 92, 98.) The Court finds that this is sufficient to allege circumstances that suggest discriminatory motive.

Therefore, the demurrer to the fifth and sixth causes of action is sustained as to the individual UPS Parties without leave to amend, the demurrer to the fifth cause of action is sustained as to UPS with leave to amend, but the demurrer to the sixth cause of action is overruled as to UPS.

FEHA Harassment

The UPS Parties contend that the harassment claims fail as a matter of law because Quon has not alleged any severe or pervasive harassing conduct by the UPS Parties.

To state a claim for harassment, a plaintiff must show that (1) he was a member of a protected class; (2) he was subjected to unwelcome harassment; (3) the harassment was based on membership in the protected class; (4) the harassment unreasonably interfered with his work performance by creating an intimidating, hostile, or offensive work environment; and (5) the employer is liable for the harassment. (\r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 186 Cal. App. 4th 860\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876","original_string":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876","error":null,"fullText":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"186 Cal. App. 4th 860","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":17444,"end":17504,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":17480,"index":17444,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":1,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7YY5-FXY0-Y87G-94KD-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"876","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK27","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$id":"57","End":1575,"Offset":17038,"Start":0,"nref":0,"nind":0,"story":"wdMainTextStory","namedRanges":[{"$id":"58","Name":"Psych_Cite_27","Range":{"$id":"59","ts":{"$ref":"57"},"_Start":406,"_End":466,"_Text":" To state a claim for harassment, a plaintiff must show that (1) he was a member of a protected class; (2) he was subjected to unwelcome harassment; (3) the harassment was based on membership in the protected class; (4) the harassment unreasonably interfered with his work performance by creating an intimidating, hostile, or offensive work environment; and (5) the employer is liable for the harassment. (Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876; see also Dickson v. Burke Williams, Inc. (2015) 234 Cal.App.4th 1307, 1313 [“One of the elements of a harassment claim . . . is that the harassment be sufficiently severe or pervasive so as to alter the conditions of employment and create an abusive working environment.”].)\rThe basis of both harassment causes of action (gender and race) are the following two incidents involving Vargas and Quon: (1) on or about November 21, 2017, Vargas stated to Quon, “You are good looking Asian-male, smart and good with computers . . . are you good with technology?” and (2) on or about January 11, 2018, Vargas stated to Quon, “You are a good-looking Asian man, you must be good with computers.” (SACC, ¶¶ 157, 166.) Quon alleges that these statements were heard by UPS HR personnel who failed to take immediate and appropriate corrective action. (SACC, ¶¶ 157, 166.) \rWith respect to Vargas and UPS, the UPS Parties contend that the statements do not rise to the level of severe or pervasive. But the Court declines to determine as a matter of law that Vargas’s comments did not create a hostile work environment. \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null},{"$id":"60","Name":"Psych_Cite_28","Range":{"$id":"61","ts":{"$ref":"57"},"_Start":468,"_End":740,"_Text":" To state a claim for harassment, a plaintiff must show that (1) he was a member of a protected class; (2) he was subjected to unwelcome harassment; (3) the harassment was based on membership in the protected class; (4) the harassment unreasonably interfered with his work performance by creating an intimidating, hostile, or offensive work environment; and (5) the employer is liable for the harassment. (Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876; see also Dickson v. Burke Williams, Inc. (2015) 234 Cal.App.4th 1307, 1313 [“One of the elements of a harassment claim . . . is that the harassment be sufficiently severe or pervasive so as to alter the conditions of employment and create an abusive working environment.”].)\rThe basis of both harassment causes of action (gender and race) are the following two incidents involving Vargas and Quon: (1) on or about November 21, 2017, Vargas stated to Quon, “You are good looking Asian-male, smart and good with computers . . . are you good with technology?” and (2) on or about January 11, 2018, Vargas stated to Quon, “You are a good-looking Asian man, you must be good with computers.” (SACC, ¶¶ 157, 166.) Quon alleges that these statements were heard by UPS HR personnel who failed to take immediate and appropriate corrective action. (SACC, ¶¶ 157, 166.) \rWith respect to Vargas and UPS, the UPS Parties contend that the statements do not rise to the level of severe or pervasive. But the Court declines to determine as a matter of law that Vargas’s comments did not create a hostile work environment. \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null}],"Range":{"$id":"62","ts":{"$ref":"57"},"_Start":0,"_End":1575,"_Text":" To state a claim for harassment, a plaintiff must show that (1) he was a member of a protected class; (2) he was subjected to unwelcome harassment; (3) the harassment was based on membership in the protected class; (4) the harassment unreasonably interfered with his work performance by creating an intimidating, hostile, or offensive work environment; and (5) the employer is liable for the harassment. (Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876; see also Dickson v. Burke Williams, Inc. (2015) 234 Cal.App.4th 1307, 1313 [“One of the elements of a harassment claim . . . is that the harassment be sufficiently severe or pervasive so as to alter the conditions of employment and create an abusive working environment.”].)\rThe basis of both harassment causes of action (gender and race) are the following two incidents involving Vargas and Quon: (1) on or about November 21, 2017, Vargas stated to Quon, “You are good looking Asian-male, smart and good with computers . . . are you good with technology?” and (2) on or about January 11, 2018, Vargas stated to Quon, “You are a good-looking Asian man, you must be good with computers.” (SACC, ¶¶ 157, 166.) Quon alleges that these statements were heard by UPS HR personnel who failed to take immediate and appropriate corrective action. (SACC, ¶¶ 157, 166.) \rWith respect to Vargas and UPS, the UPS Parties contend that the statements do not rise to the level of severe or pervasive. But the Court declines to determine as a matter of law that Vargas’s comments did not create a hostile work environment. \r"}},"master":"___RESULTS_32","kernel_data":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 877Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 877Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 877Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyThompsonCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyThompsonCaseName.SecondPartyCity of MonroviaCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyCity of MonroviaCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2010) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2010 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2010CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2010CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyThompson HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter186 Cal.App.4th 860, 877Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages877Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First877Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber877Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage860Reporter.NameCal. App. 4thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume186RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyCity of Monrovia suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_17"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876","CitationRichText":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":1,"Title":"Positive treatment - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalPositive.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7YY5-FXY0-Y87G-94KD-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876","ShortText":"186 Cal. App. 4th 860","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 877Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 877Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 877Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyThompsonCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyThompsonCaseName.SecondPartyCity of MonroviaCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyCity of MonroviaCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2010) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2010 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2010CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2010CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyThompson HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter186 Cal.App.4th 860, 877Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages877Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First877Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber877Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage860Reporter.NameCal. App. 4thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume186RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyCity of Monrovia suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_17","Markup":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876","Master":"___RESULTS_32","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK27","Original_string":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","PinPage":"876","ReadOrderIndex":17444,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"186 Cal. App. 4th 860","Start":17444,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Thompson\r\nv. City of Monrovia (2010)\r\n186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 877; see also Dickson v. Burke Williams, Inc. (2015) 234 Cal.App.4th 1307, 1313 [“One of the elements of a harassment claim . . . is that the harassment be sufficiently severe or pervasive so as to alter the conditions of employment and create an abusive working environment .","QuotationType":"SentenceQuote","EditedQuotationText":"One of the elements of a harassment claim . . . is that the harassment be sufficiently severe or pervasive so as to alter the conditions of employment and create an abusive working environment.","MarkedQuotationText":"[One] of [the elements] of a [harassment claim] [)] [is that] the harassment [be] sufficiently severe or pervasive [so as] to alter the conditions of . . . employment and create an abusive [working] environment . . . .","CCMarkedQuotationText":" [One] of [ the elements] of a [harassment claim] [ ) ] [is that] the harassment [be] sufficiently severe or pervasive [ so as ] to alter the conditions of . . . employment and create an abusive [ working ] environment . . . .","SuggestionForQuote":"pattern of harassment of a repeated, routine or a generalized nature’ ” (Aguilar, at p. 131). Whether the harassment is sufficiently severe or pervasive to alter the conditions of the victim's employment and create an abusive environment “","CCSuggestionForQuote":" pattern of harassment of a repeated , routine or a generalized nature Aguilar at p 131 ) . Whether the harassment is sufficiently severe or pervasive to alter the conditions of the victim's employment and create an abusive environment","CitationText":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876","ModifiedCitationText":"Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 876","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":["Thompson v. City of Monrovia (2010) 186 Cal.App.4th 860, 877"],"IconIndicator":9,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":9,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":9,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":9,"IsEnabled":true,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":1,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":false,"ShowPinPointPage":true,"SuggestionVisibility":true,"SuggestedDocUri":"One%20of%20the%20elements%20of%20a%20harassment%20claim%20.%20.%20.%20is%20that%20the%20harassment%20be%20sufficiently%20severe%20or%20pervasive%20so%20as%20to%20alter%20the%20conditions%20of%20employment%20and%20create%20an%20abusive%20working%20environment."}}}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">One of the elements of a harassment claim . . . is that the harassment be sufficiently severe or pervasive so as to alter the conditions of employment and create an abusive working environment.”].)

The basis of both harassment causes of action (gender and race) are the following two incidents involving Vargas and Quon: (1) on or about November 21, 2017, Vargas stated to Quon, “You are good looking Asian-male, smart and good with computers . . . are you good with technology?” and (2) on or about January 11, 2018, Vargas stated to Quon, “You are a good-looking Asian man, you must be good with computers.” (SACC, ¶¶ 157, 166.) Quon alleges that these statements were heard by UPS HR personnel who failed to take immediate and appropriate corrective action. (SACC, ¶¶ 157, 166.)

With respect to Vargas and UPS, the UPS Parties contend that the statements do not rise to the level of severe or pervasive. But the Court declines to determine as a matter of law that Vargas’s comments did not create a hostile work environment.

With respect to the remaining individual cross-defendants, the UPS Parties correctly note that inaction by management cannot constitute harassment as a matter of law. (See Fiol v. Doellstedt (1996) 50 Cal.App.4th 1318, 1327-1328 [holding that “a nonharassing second-tier supervisor who fails to take action when an employee complains to the nonharassing second-tier supervisor of sexual harassment by the employee’s immediate supervisor” is not personally liable for harassment under FEHA].)

Therefore, the demurrer to the seventh and eighth causes of action is sustained without leave to amend as to Stanford, Price, and Tefft. The demurrer to the seventh and eighth causes of action is overruled as to UPS and Vargas.

Aiding and Abetting Discrimination and Harassment

As with the other aiding and abetting causes of action, the ninth and tenth causes of action contain no allegations of substantial assistance or encouragement by UPS or the individual UPS Parties other than Vargas. Therefore, the demurrer to the ninth and tenth causes of action is sustained with leave to amend.

Retaliation

The UPS Parties contend that the cause of action for retaliation in violation of Labor Code sections 96(k), 98.6, and 2699Labor Code sections 96(k), 98.6, 2699Labor Code sections 96(k), 98.6, 2699Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteLabor Code sections 96(k), 98.6, 2699 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections sections 96(k), 98.6, 2699 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Next98.6, 2699 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Next.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Next._PatternX1NoSectionSymbol.X1NoSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Next.ampersandandStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Next.Next2699 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Next.Next._PatternX1NoSectionSymbol.X1NoSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Next.Next.X12699StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Next.X198.6StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol sections StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X196(k)StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectLab. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_35","Markup":"Labor Code sections 96(k), 98.6, 2699","Master":"___RESULTS_35","name":"Psych_Cite_41","Original_string":"Labor Code sections 96(k), 98.6, and 2699","Page":null,"Parallel":null,"Pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","PinPage":null,"ReadOrderIndex":19792,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"Cal. Lab. Code § 96","Start":19792,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Labor\r\nCode sections 96(k), 98.6, and 2699

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Labor Code sections 96(k), 98.6, and 2699 must fail because Quon has not alleged that he engaged in any protected activity. \r\n PsychStateSubjectCode\r\n Full.StateStatuteCite\r\n Cal. Lab. Code § 98.6\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Labor Code section 98.6","original_string":"Labor Code section 98.6","error":null,"fullText":"Labor Code section 98.6","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"Cal. Lab. Code § 98.6","isParallel":false,"parallel":null,"start":19916,"end":19939,"pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","readOrderIndex":19916,"index":19916,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":0,"CiteShepSignalLink":null,"story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":null,"name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK31","foundBy":"PsychStateSubjectCode","FullTextParen":"Labor Code section 98.6","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"67"},"master":"___RESULTS_36","kernel_data":"Labor Code section 98.6Labor Code section 98.6Labor Code section 98.6Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteLabor Code section 98.6 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections section 98.6 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol section StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X198.6StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectLab. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_36"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Labor Code section 98.6","CitationRichText":"Labor Code section 98.6","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":-1,"Title":"No Analysis","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/blank.jpg","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":null,"ShowShepardSignal":false,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Labor Code section 98.6","ShortText":"Cal. Lab. Code § 98.6","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Labor Code section 98.6","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Labor Code section 98.6"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Labor\r\nCode section 98.6

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Labor Code section 98.6Labor Code section 98.6Labor Code section 98.6Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteLabor Code section 98.6 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections section 98.6 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol section StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X198.6StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectLab. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_36","Markup":"Labor Code section 98.6","Master":"___RESULTS_36","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK31","Original_string":"Labor Code section 98.6","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","PinPage":"","ReadOrderIndex":19916,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"Cal. Lab. Code section 98.6","Start":19916,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Labor\r\nCode section 98.6

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Labor Code section 98.6 provides, among other things, that no employer shall discharge or discriminate against any employee because he engaged in conduct protected under the Labor Code. Protected activity under \r\n PsychStateSubjectCode\r\n Full.StateStatuteCite\r\n Cal. Lab. Code section 98.6\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Labor Code section 98.6","original_string":"Labor Code section 98.6","error":null,"fullText":"Labor Code section 98.6","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"Cal. Lab. Code section 98.6","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":20127,"end":20150,"pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","readOrderIndex":20127,"index":416,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":11,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:805G-KBV1-2NSD-R4RP-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK11","foundBy":"PsychStateSubjectCode","FullTextParen":null,"ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"70"},"master":"___RESULTS_12","kernel_data":"Labor Code section 98.6Labor Code section 98.6Labor Code section 98.6Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteLabor Code section 98.6 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections section 98.6 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol section StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X198.6StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectLab. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_12"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Labor Code section 98.6","CitationRichText":"Labor Code section 98.6","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":11,"Title":"Positive treatment - statutes","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalPositive.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:805G-KBV1-2NSD-R4RP-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Labor Code section 98.6","ShortText":"Cal. Lab. Code section 98.6","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Labor Code section 98.6","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Labor Code section 98.6"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Labor Code section 98.6

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Labor Code section 98.6Labor Code section 98.6Labor Code section 98.6Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteLabor Code section 98.6 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections section 98.6 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol section StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X198.6StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectLab. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_12","Markup":"Labor Code section 98.6","Master":"___RESULTS_12","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK11","Original_string":"Labor Code section 98.6","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","PinPage":"","ReadOrderIndex":20127,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"Cal. Lab. Code section 98.6","Start":20127,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Labor\r\nCode section 98.6

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Labor Code section 98.6 includes “the exercise by the employee . . . on behalf of himself, herself, or others of any rights afforded him or her.” \r\n PsychStateSubjectCode\r\n Full.StateStatuteCite\r\n Cal. Lab. Code § 96\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)","original_string":"Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)","error":null,"fullText":"Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"Cal. Lab. Code § 96","isParallel":false,"parallel":null,"start":20273,"end":20311,"pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","readOrderIndex":20273,"index":20273,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":0,"CiteShepSignalLink":null,"story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":null,"name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK32","foundBy":"PsychStateSubjectCode","FullTextParen":"Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"67"},"master":"___RESULTS_37","kernel_data":"Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteLabor Code section 96, subdivision (k)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections section 96, subdivision (k)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol section StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subdsubdivision (k)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd._PatternSubdsList.SubdsListStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First(k)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First._PatternSubdScalarOrRangeCal.SubdScalarOrRangeCalStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First.First(k)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.subdivisionssubdivisionStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X196StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectLab. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_37"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)","CitationRichText":"Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":-1,"Title":"No Analysis","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/blank.jpg","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":null,"ShowShepardSignal":false,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)","ShortText":"Cal. Lab. Code § 96","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Labor\r\nCode section 96, subdivision (k)

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteLabor Code section 96, subdivision (k)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections section 96, subdivision (k)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.,,StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol section StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subdsubdivision (k)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd._PatternSubdsList.SubdsListStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First(k)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First._PatternSubdScalarOrRangeCal.SubdScalarOrRangeCalStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.First.First(k)StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.Subd.subdivisionssubdivisionStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X196StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectLab. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_37","Markup":"Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)","Master":"___RESULTS_37","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK32","Original_string":"Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k)","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","PinPage":"","ReadOrderIndex":20273,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"Cal. Lab. Code section 96","Start":20273,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Labor\r\nCode section 96, subdivision (k)

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Labor Code section 96, subdivision (k) and \r\n PsychStateSubjectCode\r\n Full.StateStatuteCite\r\n Cal. Lab. Code § 2699\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Labor Code section 2699","original_string":"Labor Code section 2699","error":null,"fullText":"Labor Code section 2699","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"Cal. Lab. Code § 2699","isParallel":false,"parallel":null,"start":20316,"end":20339,"pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","readOrderIndex":20316,"index":20316,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":0,"CiteShepSignalLink":null,"story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":null,"name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK33","foundBy":"PsychStateSubjectCode","FullTextParen":"Labor Code section 2699","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"67"},"master":"___RESULTS_38","kernel_data":"Labor Code section 2699Labor Code section 2699Labor Code section 2699Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteLabor Code section 2699 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections section 2699 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol section StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X12699StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectLab. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_38"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Labor Code section 2699","CitationRichText":"Labor Code section 2699","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":-1,"Title":"No Analysis","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/blank.jpg","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":null,"ShowShepardSignal":false,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Labor Code section 2699","ShortText":"Cal. Lab. Code § 2699","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Labor Code section 2699","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Labor Code section 2699"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Labor\r\nCode section 2699

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Labor Code section 2699Labor Code section 2699Labor Code section 2699Full.StateStatuteCitecite__AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite._PatternAfterStatutoryCite.AfterStatutoryCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite()__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.((__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.))__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite._PatternStatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition._PatternStatutoryCodeEdition.StatutoryCodeEdition__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.PublisherDeering __AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year._PatternYear.Year__AfterStatutoryCite.StatutoryCodeEditionCite.StatutoryCodeEdition.Year.YearJURISDICTIONYESPUBLISHERDeeringStateStatuteLabor Code section 2699 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections section 2699 StateStatute.__SectionOrSections._PatternX1.X1StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol section StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol._PatternRequiredSectionSymbol.RequiredSectionSymbolStateStatute.__SectionOrSections.RequiredSectionSymbol.SectionSymbol§StateStatute.__SectionOrSections.X12699StateStatute._PatternStateStatutes.StateStatutesStateStatute.CalCal.StateStatute.CaliforniaCodeSubjectLab. CodeStateStatute.Sectionsectionmaster_name___RESULTS_38","Markup":"Labor Code section 2699","Master":"___RESULTS_38","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK33","Original_string":"Labor Code section 2699","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.StateStatuteCite","PinPage":"","ReadOrderIndex":20316,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"Cal. Lab. Code section 2699","Start":20316,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Labor\r\nCode section 2699

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Labor Code section 2699 set forth remedies available to an employee for retaliatory conduct.

The Court sustained Tefft’s demurrer to this cause of action in the FACC because Quon had failed to allege that he engaged in any protected activity. In the SACC, Quon still fails to allege that he engaged in any protected activity prior to any adverse employment action. Therefore, the demurrer to the eleventh cause of action is sustained without leave to amend.

Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress (IIED)

In sustaining Tefft’s demurrer to this cause of action in the FACC, the Court found that workers’ compensation exclusivity barred Quon’s intentional infliction of emotional distress claim because it was based on Quon’s termination from employment. Now, Quon alleges in general and conclusory terms that “UPS and its employees’ conduct was extreme and outrageous” after incorporating by reference all prior paragraphs in the SACC. (SACC, ¶¶ 191-192.) The UPS Parties nevertheless argue that workers’ compensation exclusivity applies presumably because the alleged wrongful conduct occurred at the worksite in the normal course of the employer-employee relationship. The general rule is that an employee is “[an] employer or its agents","QuotationType":"PhraseQuote","EditedQuotationText":"generally prohibited from pursuing any tort remedies against [an] employer or its agents","MarkedQuotationText":"generally prohibited from pursuing any tort remedies against [an] employer or its agents","CCMarkedQuotationText":" generally prohibited from pursuing any tort remedies against [an] employer or its agents","SuggestionForQuote":"Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CCSuggestionForQuote":"Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CitationText":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966","ModifiedCitationText":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":["Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 96"],"IconIndicator":9,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":9,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":9,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":9,"IsEnabled":false,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":1,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":false,"ShowPinPointPage":true,"SuggestionVisibility":false,"SuggestedDocUri":"generally%20prohibited%20from%20pursuing%20any%20tort%20remedies%20against%20[an]%20employer%20or%20its%20agents"}}}' docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">generally prohibited from pursuing any tort remedies against [an] employer or its agents” because the employer is already liable for an employee’s injuries arising out of and in the course of the employment under the workers’ compensation system. (\r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 14 Cal. App. 5th 75\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966","original_string":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966","error":null,"fullText":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"14 Cal. App. 5th 75","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":21781,"end":21852,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":21830,"index":21781,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":1,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5P78-V3S1-DXC8-725T-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"966","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK36","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$id":"81","End":1714,"Offset":20827,"Start":0,"nref":0,"nind":0,"story":"wdMainTextStory","namedRanges":[{"$id":"82","Name":"Psych_Cite_34","Range":{"$id":"83","ts":{"$ref":"81"},"_Start":1240,"_End":1252,"_Text":"In sustaining Tefft’s demurrer to this cause of action in the FACC, the Court found that workers’ compensation exclusivity barred Quon’s intentional infliction of emotional distress claim because it was based on Quon’s termination from employment. Now, Quon alleges in general and conclusory terms that “UPS and its employees’ conduct was extreme and outrageous” after incorporating by reference all prior paragraphs in the SACC. (SACC, ¶¶ 191-192.) The UPS Parties nevertheless argue that workers’ compensation exclusivity applies presumably because the alleged wrongful conduct occurred at the worksite in the normal course of the employer-employee relationship. The general rule is that an employee is “generally prohibited from pursuing any tort remedies against [an] employer or its agents” because the employer is already liable for an employee’s injuries arising out of and in the course of the employment under the workers’ compensation system. (Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966.) However, workers’ compensation exclusivity does not apply when the employee’s injuries are the result of employer conduct that does not stem “from a risk reasonably encompassed within the compensation bargain.” (Id. at p. 97.) Notably, \u000b“unlawful discrimination and retaliation in violation of FEHA falls outside the compensation bargain and therefore claims of intentional infliction of emotional distress based on such discrimination and retaliation are not subject to workers’ compensation exclusivity.” (Id. at p. 101.) Because there remains a claim for discrimination against UPS, the Court finds that workers’ compensation exclusivity does not apply as to the claim against UPS. \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null},{"$id":"84","Name":"Psych_Cite_35","Range":{"$id":"85","ts":{"$ref":"81"},"_Start":1536,"_End":1549,"_Text":"In sustaining Tefft’s demurrer to this cause of action in the FACC, the Court found that workers’ compensation exclusivity barred Quon’s intentional infliction of emotional distress claim because it was based on Quon’s termination from employment. Now, Quon alleges in general and conclusory terms that “UPS and its employees’ conduct was extreme and outrageous” after incorporating by reference all prior paragraphs in the SACC. (SACC, ¶¶ 191-192.) The UPS Parties nevertheless argue that workers’ compensation exclusivity applies presumably because the alleged wrongful conduct occurred at the worksite in the normal course of the employer-employee relationship. The general rule is that an employee is “generally prohibited from pursuing any tort remedies against [an] employer or its agents” because the employer is already liable for an employee’s injuries arising out of and in the course of the employment under the workers’ compensation system. (Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966.) However, workers’ compensation exclusivity does not apply when the employee’s injuries are the result of employer conduct that does not stem “from a risk reasonably encompassed within the compensation bargain.” (Id. at p. 97.) Notably, \u000b“unlawful discrimination and retaliation in violation of FEHA falls outside the compensation bargain and therefore claims of intentional infliction of emotional distress based on such discrimination and retaliation are not subject to workers’ compensation exclusivity.” (Id. at p. 101.) Because there remains a claim for discrimination against UPS, the Court finds that workers’ compensation exclusivity does not apply as to the claim against UPS. \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null},{"$id":"86","Name":"Psych_Cite_36","Range":{"$id":"87","ts":{"$ref":"81"},"_Start":954,"_End":1025,"_Text":"In sustaining Tefft’s demurrer to this cause of action in the FACC, the Court found that workers’ compensation exclusivity barred Quon’s intentional infliction of emotional distress claim because it was based on Quon’s termination from employment. Now, Quon alleges in general and conclusory terms that “UPS and its employees’ conduct was extreme and outrageous” after incorporating by reference all prior paragraphs in the SACC. (SACC, ¶¶ 191-192.) The UPS Parties nevertheless argue that workers’ compensation exclusivity applies presumably because the alleged wrongful conduct occurred at the worksite in the normal course of the employer-employee relationship. The general rule is that an employee is “generally prohibited from pursuing any tort remedies against [an] employer or its agents” because the employer is already liable for an employee’s injuries arising out of and in the course of the employment under the workers’ compensation system. (Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966.) However, workers’ compensation exclusivity does not apply when the employee’s injuries are the result of employer conduct that does not stem “from a risk reasonably encompassed within the compensation bargain.” (Id. at p. 97.) Notably, \u000b“unlawful discrimination and retaliation in violation of FEHA falls outside the compensation bargain and therefore claims of intentional infliction of emotional distress based on such discrimination and retaliation are not subject to workers’ compensation exclusivity.” (Id. at p. 101.) Because there remains a claim for discrimination against UPS, the Court finds that workers’ compensation exclusivity does not apply as to the claim against UPS. \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null}],"Range":{"$id":"88","ts":{"$ref":"81"},"_Start":0,"_End":1714,"_Text":"In sustaining Tefft’s demurrer to this cause of action in the FACC, the Court found that workers’ compensation exclusivity barred Quon’s intentional infliction of emotional distress claim because it was based on Quon’s termination from employment. Now, Quon alleges in general and conclusory terms that “UPS and its employees’ conduct was extreme and outrageous” after incorporating by reference all prior paragraphs in the SACC. (SACC, ¶¶ 191-192.) The UPS Parties nevertheless argue that workers’ compensation exclusivity applies presumably because the alleged wrongful conduct occurred at the worksite in the normal course of the employer-employee relationship. The general rule is that an employee is “generally prohibited from pursuing any tort remedies against [an] employer or its agents” because the employer is already liable for an employee’s injuries arising out of and in the course of the employment under the workers’ compensation system. (Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966.) However, workers’ compensation exclusivity does not apply when the employee’s injuries are the result of employer conduct that does not stem “from a risk reasonably encompassed within the compensation bargain.” (Id. at p. 97.) Notably, \u000b“unlawful discrimination and retaliation in violation of FEHA falls outside the compensation bargain and therefore claims of intentional infliction of emotional distress based on such discrimination and retaliation are not subject to workers’ compensation exclusivity.” (Id. at p. 101.) Because there remains a claim for discrimination against UPS, the Court finds that workers’ compensation exclusivity does not apply as to the claim against UPS. \r"}},"master":"___RESULTS_39","kernel_data":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyLightCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyLightCaseName.SecondPartyDepartment of Parks & RecreationCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyDepartment of Parks & RecreationCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2017) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2017 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2017CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2017CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyLight HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages966Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First966Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber966Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage75Reporter.NameCal. App. 5thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume14RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyDepartment of Parks & Recreation suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_39"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966","CitationRichText":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":1,"Title":"Positive treatment - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalPositive.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5P78-V3S1-DXC8-725T-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":false,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966","ShortText":"14 Cal. App. 5th 75","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Light v. Department of Parks &\r\nRecreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyLightCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyLightCaseName.SecondPartyDepartment of Parks & RecreationCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyDepartment of Parks & RecreationCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2017) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2017 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2017CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2017CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyLight HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages966Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First966Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber966Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage75Reporter.NameCal. App. 5thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume14RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyDepartment of Parks & Recreation suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupramaster_name___RESULTS_39","Markup":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966","Master":"___RESULTS_39","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK36","Original_string":"Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","PinPage":"966","ReadOrderIndex":21781,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"14 Cal. App. 5th 75","Start":21781,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Light\r\nv. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 966

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Light v. Department of Parks & Recreation (2017) 14 Cal.App.5th 75, 96
.) However, workers’ compensation exclusivity does not apply when the employee’s injuries are the result of employer conduct that does not stem “Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CitationText":"Id. at p. 97","ModifiedCitationText":"Id. at p. 97","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":[],"IconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":0,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":8,"IsEnabled":false,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":0,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":true,"ShowPinPointPage":false,"SuggestionVisibility":false,"SuggestedDocUri":"from%20a%20risk%20reasonably%20encompassed%20within%20the%20compensation%20bargain."}}}' docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">from a risk reasonably encompassed within the compensation bargain.” (\r\n PsychId\r\n Id\r\n 14 Cal. App. 5th 75\r\n","ParentCiteID":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK36","Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Id. at p. 97","original_string":"Id. at p. 97","error":null,"fullText":"Id. at p. 97","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"14 Cal. App. 5th 75","isParallel":false,"parallel":null,"start":22067,"end":22079,"pattern":"Id","readOrderIndex":22066,"index":22067,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":1,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5P78-V3S1-DXC8-725T-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"97","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK34","foundBy":"PsychId","FullTextParen":"Id. at p. 97","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"81"},"master":"___RESULTS_39","kernel_data":"Id. at p. 97Id. at p. 97Id. at p. 97Id.CaseIdciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyLightCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyLightCaseName.SecondPartyDepartment of Parks & RecreationCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyDepartment of Parks & RecreationCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2017) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2017 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2017CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2017CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyLight HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESIdIbid.Id._PatternIbidGraph.IbidGraphId.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaId.IdIbid.master_name___RESULTS_39NY L Paren(NY R Paren)pagepageReporterat p. 97Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages97Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPagesFirst.PinPagesFirstReporter.__PinPages.First97Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber97Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRangeSupp.FirstPageInRangeSuppReporter._PatternIdAtReporter.IdAtReporterReporter.atatReporter.FirstPage75Reporter.NameCal. App. 5thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume14RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyDepartment of Parks & Recreation suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupra"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Id. at p. 97","CitationRichText":"Id. at p. 97","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":1,"Title":"Positive treatment - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalPositive.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5P78-V3S1-DXC8-725T-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":true,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Id. at p. 97","ShortText":"14 Cal. App. 5th 75","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Id. at p. 97","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Id. at p. 97"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Id. at p. 97

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Id. at p. 97Id. at p. 97Id. at p. 97citeCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyLightCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyLightCaseName.SecondPartyDepartment of Parks & RecreationCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyDepartment of Parks & RecreationCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2017) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2017 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2017CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2017CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyLight HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESIdIbid.Id._PatternIbidGraph.IbidGraphId.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaId.IdIbid.master_name___RESULTS_39NY L Paren(NY R Paren)pagepageReporterat p. 97Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages97Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPagesFirst.PinPagesFirstReporter.__PinPages.First97Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber97Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRangeSupp.FirstPageInRangeSuppReporter._PatternIdAtReporter.IdAtReporterReporter.atatReporter.FirstPage75Reporter.NameCal. App. 5thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume14RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyDepartment of Parks & Recreation suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupra","Markup":"Id. at p. 97","Master":"___RESULTS_39","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK34","Original_string":"Id. at p. 97","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Id.CaseId","PinPage":"97","ReadOrderIndex":22067,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"14 Cal. App. 5th 75","Start":22067,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Id.\r\nat\r\np. 97

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Id. at p. 97.) Notably,  “Correct quotation (No suggestions)","CitationText":"Id. at p. 101","ModifiedCitationText":"Id. at p. 101","IsUseMyText":true,"IsMarkMyText":false,"IsEditMyText":false,"SuggestionForCitation":[],"IconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":8,"UseCurrentMarkQuoteIconIndicator":0,"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":8,"IsEnabled":false,"IsUserConfirmed":false,"SuggestionCount":0,"IsManagedCite":true,"PinpointPageText":"Reassign pinpoint page","IsViewPinpointPage":false,"IsCorrect":true,"ShowPinPointPage":false,"SuggestionVisibility":false,"SuggestedDocUri":"unlawful%20discrimination%20and%20retaliation%20in%20violation%20of%20FEHA%20falls%20outside%20the%20compensation%c2%a0bargain%c2%a0and%20therefore%20claims%20of%20intentional%20infliction%20of%20emotional%20distress%20based%20on%20such%20discrimination%20and%20retaliation%20are%20not%20subject%20to%20workers%e2%80%99%20compensation%c2%a0exclusivity."}}}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">unlawful discrimination and retaliation in violation of FEHA falls outside the compensation bargain and therefore claims of intentional infliction of emotional distress based on such discrimination and retaliation are not subject to workers’ compensation exclusivity.” (\r\n PsychId\r\n Id\r\n 14 Cal. App. 5th 75\r\n","ParentCiteID":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK34","Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Id. at p. 101","original_string":"Id. at p. 101","error":null,"fullText":"Id. at p. 101","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"14 Cal. App. 5th 75","isParallel":false,"parallel":null,"start":22363,"end":22376,"pattern":"Id","readOrderIndex":22362,"index":22363,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":1,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5P78-V3S1-DXC8-725T-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"101","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK35","foundBy":"PsychId","FullTextParen":"Id. at p. 101","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$ref":"81"},"master":"___RESULTS_39","kernel_data":"Id. at p. 101Id. at p. 101Id. at p. 101Id.CaseIdciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyLightCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyLightCaseName.SecondPartyDepartment of Parks & RecreationCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyDepartment of Parks & RecreationCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2017) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2017 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2017CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2017CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyLight HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESIdIbid.Id._PatternIbidGraph.IbidGraphId.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaId.IdIbid.master_name___RESULTS_39NY L Paren(NY R Paren)pagepageReporterat p. 101Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages101Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPagesFirst.PinPagesFirstReporter.__PinPages.First101Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber101Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRangeSupp.FirstPageInRangeSuppReporter._PatternIdAtReporter.IdAtReporterReporter.atatReporter.FirstPage75Reporter.NameCal. App. 5thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume14RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyDepartment of Parks & Recreation suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupra"},"IconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"Display":"Id. at p. 101","CitationRichText":"Id. at p. 101","IconShepardSignal":{"Id":1,"Title":"Positive treatment - cases","IconType":0,"ImagePath":"/Content/Images/IconSignalPositive.gif","Description":null},"ShepardSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:5P78-V3S1-DXC8-725T-00000-00","ShowShepardSignal":true,"ShowParentLink":true,"ParentCitation":null,"SuggestionsForCitation":[],"SuggestionsForCite":[],"SelectedSuggestion":null,"IsSuggestionEnabled":false,"UseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"UseSuggestionIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"OriginalUseCurrentIconIndicator":{"Id":1,"Title":"Cite is formatted correctly, its long and short form are automatically being updated, and it will be included in TOA.","IconType":1,"ImagePath":"~/Content/Images/CCF/RecognizedNoSuggestions.png","Description":"Number of cites recognized by system as valid."},"CitationMarkupText":"Id. at p. 101","ShortText":"14 Cal. App. 5th 75","IsParentCorrect":true,"IsParentCorrectableConfirmed":false,"IsParentUnknownConfirmed":false,"IsParentCorrectable":false,"IsParentUnknown":false,"CitationOriginalText":"Id. at p. 101","ModifiedCiteText":null,"MarkUp":null,"IsCheckCurrent":false,"PreviousCitationRetain":"Id. at p. 101"},"CQ":"","TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Id. at p. 101

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Id. at p. 101Id. at p. 101Id. at p. 101citeCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyLightCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyLightCaseName.SecondPartyDepartment of Parks & RecreationCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyDepartment of Parks & RecreationCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (2017) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date2017 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year2017CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year2017CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyLight HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESIdIbid.Id._PatternIbidGraph.IbidGraphId.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaId.IdIbid.master_name___RESULTS_39NY L Paren(NY R Paren)pagepageReporterat p. 101Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages101Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPagesFirst.PinPagesFirstReporter.__PinPages.First101Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber101Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRangeSupp.FirstPageInRangeSuppReporter._PatternIdAtReporter.IdAtReporterReporter.atatReporter.FirstPage75Reporter.NameCal. App. 5thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaReporter.RequiredComma.Comma,Reporter.Volume14RequiredComma, RequiredComma._PatternRequiredComma.RequiredCommaSecondPartyDepartment of Parks & Recreation suprasupra, supra.,, supra._PatternShortCaseSupra.ShortCaseSuprasupra.suprasupra","Markup":"Id. at p. 101","Master":"___RESULTS_39","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK35","Original_string":"Id. at p. 101","Page":null,"Parallel":"","Pattern":"Id.CaseId","PinPage":"101","ReadOrderIndex":22363,"Refers_To":null,"ShortText":"14 Cal. App. 5th 75","Start":22363,"Story":"wdMainTextStory"},"TOA":"","html":"\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n

Id.\r\nat\r\np. 101

\r\n\r\n
\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n"}" docpart="C7A2C4E56FDF48C586B658C2B10851F5">Id. at p. 101.) Because there remains a claim for discrimination against UPS, the Court finds that workers’ compensation exclusivity does not apply as to the claim against UPS.

Next, the UPS Parties argue that Quon’s allegations regarding Price and Tefft’s conduct only rise to the level of personnel management decisions, and that such decisions are not extreme or outrageous as a matter of law. (\r\n PsychCase\r\n Full.CaseCitation\r\n 46 Cal. App. 4th 55\r\n","ParentCiteID":null,"Processed":true,"Citation":{"current_string":"Janken v. GM Hughes Electronics (1996) 46 Cal.App.4th 55, 80","original_string":"Janken v. GM Hughes Electronics (1996) 46 Cal.App.4th 55, 80","error":null,"fullText":"Janken v. GM Hughes Electronics (1996) 46 Cal.App.4th 55, 80","refers_to_cite":null,"shortText":"46 Cal. App. 4th 55","isParallel":false,"parallel":"","start":22761,"end":22821,"pattern":"Full.CaseCitation","readOrderIndex":22800,"index":22761,"citeType":1,"CiteShepSignal":2,"CiteShepSignalLink":"https://advance.lexis.com/api/shepards?context=1000516&id=urn:contentItem:7XWN-0BT1-2NSF-C492-00000-00","story":"wdMainTextStory","PinPage":"80","name":"CITRUS_BOOKMARK37","foundBy":"PsychCase","FullTextParen":"Janken v. GM Hughes Electronics (1996) 46 Cal.App.4th 55","ParentheticalType":null,"IntermediateCite":false,"TOAHeading":null,"ts":{"$id":"89","End":2333,"Offset":22540,"Start":0,"nref":0,"nind":0,"story":"wdMainTextStory","namedRanges":[{"$id":"90","Name":"Psych_Cite_37","Range":{"$id":"91","ts":{"$ref":"89"},"_Start":221,"_End":281,"_Text":"Next, the UPS Parties argue that Quon’s allegations regarding Price and Tefft’s conduct only rise to the level of personnel management decisions, and that such decisions are not extreme or outrageous as a matter of law. (Janken v. GM Hughes Electronics (1996) 46 Cal.App.4th 55, 80.) Because there are no allegations as to Price and Tefft that go beyond personnel management decisions, the Court sustains the demurrer to the twelfth cause of action as to Price and Tefft without leave to amend, but the demurrer as to UPS is overruled. \rFraud and Deceit\r\tThe UPS Parties argue that the cause of action for fraud and deceit must fail because the elements have still not been alleged with particularity. \r\tQuon alleges that on or about August 29, 2018, Price told Quon “that the suspension would be removed and to return to work” and that Quon would meet briefly with Tefft as a formality. (SACC, ¶ 202.) There are no allegations of any misrepresentations by Tefft. Furthermore, Quon still fails to allege any of the remaining elements of a fraud claim, including that Price knew that the representation was false, that Price intended to defraud Quon, that Quon justifiably relied on the representation, and that Quon was damaged as a result of the representation. (Charnay v. Cobert (2006) 145 Cal.App.4th 170, 184.) Therefore, the demurrer to the fourteenth cause of action is sustained without leave to amend.\rNegligent Hiring, Supervision, Retention\rThe UPS Parties contend that the negligent hiring claim must fail because Quon has not alleged that any of the UPS Parties owed a duty to Quon that was breached. The UPS Parties also contend that Quon’s negligence claim is preempted by workers’ compensation exclusivity. Here, unlike the IIED claim, the cause of action is based on conduct that is solely within the workers’ compensation system: the negligent hiring and retention of Price, Tefft, Stanford, and Vargas. (See Coit Drapery Cleaners, Inc. v. Sequoia Ins. Co. (1993) 14 Cal.App.4th 1595, 1606 [finding that negligence claim by employee against employer was barred by workers’ compensation exclusivity].) Quon has not alleged any new facts that take his claim outside of workers’ compensation exclusivity, so the demurrer to the fifteenth cause of action is sustained without leave to amend.\rUnfair Business Practices \r"},"foundBy":null,"pattern":null,"tabName":null}],"Range":{"$id":"92","ts":{"$ref":"89"},"_Start":0,"_End":2333,"_Text":"Next, the UPS Parties argue that Quon’s allegations regarding Price and Tefft’s conduct only rise to the level of personnel management decisions, and that such decisions are not extreme or outrageous as a matter of law. (Janken v. GM Hughes Electronics (1996) 46 Cal.App.4th 55, 80.) Because there are no allegations as to Price and Tefft that go beyond personnel management decisions, the Court sustains the demurrer to the twelfth cause of action as to Price and Tefft without leave to amend, but the demurrer as to UPS is overruled. \rFraud and Deceit\r\tThe UPS Parties argue that the cause of action for fraud and deceit must fail because the elements have still not been alleged with particularity. \r\tQuon alleges that on or about August 29, 2018, Price told Quon “that the suspension would be removed and to return to work” and that Quon would meet briefly with Tefft as a formality. (SACC, ¶ 202.) There are no allegations of any misrepresentations by Tefft. Furthermore, Quon still fails to allege any of the remaining elements of a fraud claim, including that Price knew that the representation was false, that Price intended to defraud Quon, that Quon justifiably relied on the representation, and that Quon was damaged as a result of the representation. (Charnay v. Cobert (2006) 145 Cal.App.4th 170, 184.) Therefore, the demurrer to the fourteenth cause of action is sustained without leave to amend.\rNegligent Hiring, Supervision, Retention\rThe UPS Parties contend that the negligent hiring claim must fail because Quon has not alleged that any of the UPS Parties owed a duty to Quon that was breached. The UPS Parties also contend that Quon’s negligence claim is preempted by workers’ compensation exclusivity. Here, unlike the IIED claim, the cause of action is based on conduct that is solely within the workers’ compensation system: the negligent hiring and retention of Price, Tefft, Stanford, and Vargas. (See Coit Drapery Cleaners, Inc. v. Sequoia Ins. Co. (1993) 14 Cal.App.4th 1595, 1606 [finding that negligence claim by employee against employer was barred by workers’ compensation exclusivity].) Quon has not alleged any new facts that take his claim outside of workers’ compensation exclusivity, so the demurrer to the fifteenth cause of action is sustained without leave to amend.\rUnfair Business Practices \r"}},"master":"___RESULTS_40","kernel_data":"Janken v. GM Hughes Electronics (1996) 46 Cal.App.4th 55, 80Janken v. GM Hughes Electronics (1996) 46 Cal.App.4th 55, 80Janken v. GM Hughes Electronics (1996) 46 Cal.App.4th 55, 80Full.CaseCitationciteCaseNameXYZZY v. KamalaCaseName.FirstPartyJankenCaseName.FirstParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.FirstParty.PartyJankenCaseName.SecondPartyGM Hughes ElectronicsCaseName.SecondParty._PatternParty.PartyCaseName.SecondParty.PartyGM Hughes ElectronicsCaseName.vv.CourtParenthetical (1996) CourtParenthetical._PatternCourtParenthetical.CourtParentheticalCourtParenthetical.Date1996 CourtParenthetical.Date._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.DateCourtParenthetical.Date.Year1996CourtParenthetical.Date.Year._PatternCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.YearCourtParenthetical.Date.Year.Year1996CourtParenthetical.ForbiddenComma._PatternForbiddenComma.ForbiddenCommaCourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L (CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L.((CourtParenthetical.Switch ( [ L._PatternSwitch ( [ L.Switch ( [ LCourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R) CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R.))CourtParenthetical.Switch ) ] R._PatternSwitch ) ] R.Switch ) ] RFirstPartyJanken HAS_AUTHORITATIVE_DATAYESNY L Paren(NY R Paren)Reporter46 Cal.App.4th 55, 80Reporter.[[Reporter.]]Reporter.__PinPages80Reporter.__PinPages._PatternPinPages.PinPagesReporter.__PinPages.First80Reporter.__PinPages.First.__PageNumber80Reporter.__PinPages.First._PatternFirstPageInRange.FirstPageInRangeReporter._PatternReporter.ReporterReporter.FirstPage55Reporter.NameCal. App. 4thReporter.pagepageReporter.Reporter.pagepageReporter.RequiredComma, Reporter.Required