This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 09:49:19 (UTC).

CANDIS VALDEZ VS CITY OF BALDWIN PARK ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 CANDIS VALDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF BALDWIN PARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3496

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

VALDEZ CANDIS

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Defendants

COMPANY MARK

SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

ROEM BUILDERS INCORPORATED

BJ COLLECTION

BALDWIN PARK CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 30

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

BJ COLLECTION INC

SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY DBA MARK COMPANY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

BJ COLLECTION INC

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

ROEM BUILDERS INCORPORATED

BALDWIN PARK CITY OF

BUENA PARK CITY OF

ROES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

ELLIS ANDREW L. ESQ.

ELLIS ANDREW LAWRENCE

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

BREMER KEITH G. ESQ.

LEE DAVID D.

SMITH KEVIN D. ESQ.

TAFOYA ROBERT N. ESQ.

JENSEN AMY K. ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN AMY K. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, AND RELATED DATES

9/12/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC, AND RELATED DATES

Request for Dismissal

10/12/2018: Request for Dismissal

Ex Parte Application

2/19/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

2/19/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

2/22/2019: Notice of Ruling

Unknown

4/29/2019: Unknown

Notice of Settlement

4/29/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order

4/29/2019: Minute Order

Notice

5/13/2019: Notice

OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S 998 OFFERS

2/15/2018: OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF?S 998 OFFERS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/2/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/31/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

8/1/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DEFENDANT CITY OF BALDWIN PARK'S ANSWER TO BJ COLLECTION, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/11/2017: DEFENDANT CITY OF BALDWIN PARK'S ANSWER TO BJ COLLECTION, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

10/17/2017: Answer

ANSWER TO CITY OF BALDWIN PARK'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/17/2017: ANSWER TO CITY OF BALDWIN PARK'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO BJ COLLECTION, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/10/2017: ANSWER TO BJ COLLECTION, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

5/31/2017: COMPLAINT-CONTRACT

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL); Filed by CANDIS VALDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docketat 2:54 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by CANDIS VALDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of 04/29/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY (Defendant); COMPANY, MARK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by CANDIS VALDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by CANDIS VALDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by CANDIS VALDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CANDIS VALDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUENA PARK CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where BALDWIN PARK CITY OF (DOE 2) is a litigant

Latest cases where SANTA ANA CREEK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA MARK COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Roem Builders, Inc. is a litigant