This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2021 at 18:53:24 (UTC).

CANDIDO SANTANA, ET AL. VS ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 CANDIDO SANTANA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMY D. HOGUE and ANN I. JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7470

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMY D. HOGUE

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANTANA CANDIDO

LOPEZ LUZ EVELIA

URBINA DE HUIPIO ALICIA

BALTODANO MARIA AUXIHIADORA

AGUIRRE ERIKA

PEREZ MARGARITA

CANIZO MARIA

VALENZUELA KARINA STEPHANIE

GARCIA MICHAEL

LARA ARTURO MORENO

RIOS ROSAURA

ALCARAZ MARIA DE LOURDES

AGUIRRE IRMA DE LOS SANTOS

MENDOZA LIDIA

Defendant

ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NALBANDYAN AKOP JACOB

Defendant Attorney

FEARS DANIEL F.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVED CASE)

7/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVED CASE) OF 07/06/2021

7/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF REMOVED CASE) OF 07/06/2021

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

4/20/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

3/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 03/04/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NEWLY ASSIGNED CASE) OF 03/04/2021, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Initial Status Conference Order

3/4/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment

3/18/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Answer - ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/22/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/24/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE OF JUDGE PURSUANT TO C.C....) OF 03/25/2021

3/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE OF JUDGE PURSUANT TO C.C....) OF 03/25/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE OF JUDGE PURSUANT TO C.C....)

3/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE OF JUDGE PURSUANT TO C.C....)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

3/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 03/30/2021

3/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 03/30/2021

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

4/5/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 04/13/2021

4/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 04/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

4/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Status of Removed Case) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Removed Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Status of Removed Case) of 07/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by ABM Industry Groups, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 09:42 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court) of 04/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Candido Santana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by ABM Industry Groups, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Unverified Complaint); Filed by ABM Industry Groups, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by Candido Santana (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:14 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case) of 03/04/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Candido Santana (Plaintiff); Luz Evelia Lopez (Plaintiff); Alicia Urbina De Huipio (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Candido Santana (Plaintiff); Luz Evelia Lopez (Plaintiff); Alicia Urbina De Huipio (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM INDUSTRY GROUPS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEARS DANIEL F.