This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 14:31:10 (UTC).

CANDICE WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE DON AND OLGA WONG REVOCABLE TRUST VS SOO WOOK SHIN

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 CANDICE WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE DON AND OLGA WONG REVOCABLE TRUST filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SOO WOOK SHIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9051

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WONG TRUSTEE OF THE DON AND OLGA WONG REVOCABLE TRUST CANDICE

Defendant

SHIN SOO WOOK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

6/17/2021: Writ - Return

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

6/2/2021: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

6/2/2021: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/11/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

Application for Order to Post - APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST (AMENDED)

5/11/2021: Application for Order to Post - APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST (AMENDED)

Proof of Service by Posting

5/13/2021: Proof of Service by Posting

Proof of Service by Posting

4/6/2021: Proof of Service by Posting

Proof of Service by Mail

4/6/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/12/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Application for Order to Post

3/18/2021: Application for Order to Post

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

3/8/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SOO WOOK SHIN)

3/9/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SOO WOOK SHIN)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/9/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketWrit - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Filed by Candice Wong, trustee of the Don and Olga Wong Revocable Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by Candice Wong, trustee of the Don and Olga Wong Revocable Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by Candice Wong, trustee of the Don and Olga Wong Revocable Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Candice Wong, trustee of the Don and Olga Wong Revocable Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by Candice Wong, trustee of the Don and Olga Wong Revocable Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 10:08 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Filed by Candice Wong, trustee of the Don and Olga Wong Revocable Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Soo Wook Shin)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Candice Wong, trustee of the Don and Olga Wong Revocable Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Candice Wong, trustee of the Don and Olga Wong Revocable Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Candice Wong, trustee of the Don and Olga Wong Revocable Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Candice Wong, trustee of the Don and Olga Wong Revocable Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MD, WONG DR. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE