This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/22/2020 at 08:28:17 (UTC).

CANDICE POINDEXTER VS TAXOMETRY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 CANDICE POINDEXTER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TAXOMETRY, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3568

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POINDEXTER CANDICE

Defendants

TAXOMETRY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GIBSON JOHN

TAXOMETRY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOB MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

ANGEL ARTHUR RONALD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

10/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/29/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/31/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CO...)

6/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CO...)

Answer

5/30/2019: Answer

Case Management Statement

5/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CANDICE POINDEXTER

5/21/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CANDICE POINDEXTER

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

5/21/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/22/2019: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Case Management Statement

5/13/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/29/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/8/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint

2/5/2019: Complaint

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • Hearing11/09/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Hearing10/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Candice Poindexter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Continued Case Management Conference); Filed by Candice Poindexter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Candice Poindexter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Candice Poindexter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by Taxometry, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (stipulation Extending Time For Response to Complaint); Filed by Candice Poindexter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Candice Poindexter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Candice Poindexter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Candice Poindexter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Candice Poindexter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Candice Poindexter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGEL ARTHUR R. ESQ.