This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 09:12:57 (UTC).

CANDELARIOS LORA VS VICENTE TAPIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 CANDELARIOS LORA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VICENTE TAPIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL JOHNSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7435

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LORA CANDELARIOS

LORA CANDELARIO

Defendants and Respondents

BLACKWOOD PROPERTIES

TAPIA VICENTE

BLACKWOOD CAPITAL INCORPORATION

GRECIA ANGILOO

HUNTINGTON ESCROW INCORPORATION

HERNANDEZ FRANK

BLACKWOOD EQUITIES LLC

ALFARO SANDRA

AJG REALTY INC.

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

GARCIA ARMANDO

RE/MAX PROFESSIONALS

BLACKWOOD CAPITAL INC. AKA BLACKWOOD PROPERTIES

GARCIA

HUNTINGTON ESCROW INC

AJG REALTY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SCANDURA STEVEN P. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LEFF ANDREW L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF STEVEN P. SCANDURA RE SETTLEMENT

1/17/2018: PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF STEVEN P. SCANDURA RE SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

2/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/15/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER RE: MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

5/25/2018: ORDER RE: MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Minute Order

5/25/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/31/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

9/11/2018: PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Minute Order

12/10/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/10/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Order - Dismissal

12/10/2018: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order

1/29/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

6/6/2019: Unknown

DECLARATION OF ANDREW LEFF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUNTINGTON ESCROW, INC.'S APPLICATION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT

1/26/2018: DECLARATION OF ANDREW LEFF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HUNTINGTON ESCROW, INC.'S APPLICATION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF RULING

1/22/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF STEVEN P. SCANDURA RE SERVICE OF PROCESS

1/22/2018: PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION OF STEVEN P. SCANDURA RE SERVICE OF PROCESS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/23/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/3/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (for Application and order for Publication re: Vicente Tapia)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Candelario Lora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Candelario Lora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD AND THEFT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Candelario Lora (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC677435    Hearing Date: February 28, 2020    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

CANDELARIO LORA,

Plaintiff,

vs.

VICENTE TAPIA, et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: BC677435

ORDER RE:

DEFAULT JUDGMENT APPLICATION

Date: February 28, 2020

Time: 3:00 p.m.

Dept. 56

Plaintiff seeks default judgment against Defendants Angiloo Grecia (“Grecia”); Frank Hernandez (“Hernandez”); and Vicente Tapia (“Tapia”). Plaintiff’s default judgment application is valid in all respects except that while Plaintiff seeks attorneys’ fees pursuant to California Penal Code, Section 496(c)[1] which allows for “[a]ny person who has been injured by a violation of subdivision (a) or(b) may bring an action for three times the amount of actual damages, if any, sustained by the plaintiff, costs of suit, and reasonable attorney’s fees,” neither the declaration of Plaintiff nor the declaration of her counsel, Steven P. Scandura (“Scandura”), in support of Plaintiff’s default judgment application states whether such attorneys’ fees are allowed by a contractual provision or were calculated in accordance with the fee schedule in Local Rule 3.214. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1800(a)(9).) Moreover, Scandura’s declaration does not set forth his hourly rate or time spent on this matter. The Court cannot ascertain whether such requested attorneys’ fees are reasonable.

Plaintiff’s default judgment application is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

Dated this 28th day of February 2020

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court


[1] Plaintiff’s complaint alleges the following causes of action: (1) fraud and theft; (2) treble damages pursuant to California Penal Code, Section 496(c); and (3) breach of fiduciary duty.