This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 04:13:26 (UTC).

CANDELARIO AKA "CARLOS" CRUZ VS HARRY H JOH CONSTRUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2017 CANDELARIO AKA CARLOS CRUZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HARRY H JOH CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1765

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CANDELARIO

CRUZ CARLOS

CRUZ CANDELARIO AKA "CARLOS"

Defendants and Respondents

HARRY H. JOH CONSTRUCTION INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

ROJAS DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RAMIN R. YOUNESSI A.P.L.C

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ADREANI MICHAEL B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT'S FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE FOURTEENTH CAUSE OF ACTION - PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ACT FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES PURSUANT TO

4/5/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT'S FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE FOURTEENTH CAUSE OF ACTION - PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ACT FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES PURSUANT TO

NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT HARRY H. JOH CONSTRUCTION, INC. TO PLAINTIFF CANDELARIO CRUZ'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS,; ETC.

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT HARRY H. JOH CONSTRUCTION, INC. TO PLAINTIFF CANDELARIO CRUZ'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS,; ETC.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT HARRY H. JOH CONSTRUCTION, INC. TO PLAINTIFF CANDELARIO A/K/A/ "CARLOS" CRUZ'S SECOND SET

4/10/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES BY DEFENDANT HARRY H. JOH CONSTRUCTION, INC. TO PLAINTIFF CANDELARIO A/K/A/ "CARLOS" CRUZ'S SECOND SET

DEFENDANTS HARRY II. JOH CONSTRUCTION, INC. OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES-EMPLOYMFNT

4/25/2018: DEFENDANTS HARRY II. JOH CONSTRUCTION, INC. OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES-EMPLOYMFNT

DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE FOURTEENTH CAUSE OF ACTION - PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ACT FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST ADMINISTRATIV

4/27/2018: DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AS TO THE FOURTEENTH CAUSE OF ACTION - PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ACT FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST ADMINISTRATIV

NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES HEARING

5/9/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES HEARING

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REQUEST CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF TREVOR R. WITT IN SUPPORT THEREOF

6/27/2018: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REQUEST CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF TREVOR R. WITT IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Proof of Service by Mail

2/5/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

2/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Exhibit List

2/26/2019: Exhibit List

Minute Order

3/1/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/3/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/24/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/19/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/17/2017: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Unknown

9/18/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF?S JURY FEE DEPOSIT

10/3/2017: NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF?S JURY FEE DEPOSIT

Unknown

10/3/2017: Unknown

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant Harry H. John Constructions Inc's Person Most Knowledgeable) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
166 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • DEFENDANTS HARRY H. JOH CONSTRUCTION, INC. ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Harry H. Joh Construction, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Candelario Cruz (Plaintiff); Carlos Cruz (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE 1294O ET SEQ.; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Candelario Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harry H. Joh Construction Inc. is a litigant