Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2021 at 14:21:31 (UTC).

CANALES LOPEZ, EMILIA PATRICIA - GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 CANALES LOPEZ, EMILIA PATRICIA - GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7160

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CANALES LOPEZ EMILIA PATRICIA

Guardian Ad Litem

LAZO MARIA DE JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LUTIN SULIANA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/20/2021: Minute Order

Order - Appointing Guardian - Person Only

1/28/2021: Order - Appointing Guardian - Person Only

Letters (Initial)

1/29/2021: Letters (Initial)

Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Due Diligent Search

1/14/2021: Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Due Diligent Search

Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Due Diligent Search

1/14/2021: Declaration of Due Diligence - Declaration of Due Diligent Search

Proposed Order - Appointment of Guardian - Order - Appointing Guardian

1/20/2021: Proposed Order - Appointment of Guardian - Order - Appointing Guardian

Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

1/20/2021: Probate Minute Order - Probate Master Minute Order

Minute Order

1/20/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

12/17/2020: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

12/17/2020: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Consent - Consent

8/31/2020: Consent - Consent

Consent - Consent

8/31/2020: Consent - Consent

Duties of Guardian - Duties of Guardian

8/31/2020: Duties of Guardian - Duties of Guardian

Consent - Consent

8/31/2020: Consent - Consent

Order - Prescribing Notice - Order - Probate

8/31/2020: Order - Prescribing Notice - Order - Probate

Consent - Consent

8/31/2020: Consent - Consent

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 - Fee Waiver FW003 -- Proposed Order

8/31/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 - Fee Waiver FW003 -- Proposed Order

Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) - Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Initial)

8/31/2020: Petition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) - Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Initial)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Guardian (Person Only ); Filed by Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketOrder - Eligibility for Special Immigrant Juvenile Status; Filed by Minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Guardian - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Special Immigrant Juvenile Status Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (Fee Waiver FW003 -- Proposed Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDuties of Guardian (Duties of Guardian ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketPetition - Appoint Guardian of the Person Only (Initial) (Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Initial) ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotification - Cons/Guard Address (Notification - Cons/Guard Address ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketConsent (Consent ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketConsent (Consent ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketConsent (Consent ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketOrder - Prescribing Notice (Order - Probate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form (Confidential Screening Form ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketConsent (Consent ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUTIN SULIANA