This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 23:28:59 (UTC).

CAMRYNN WILLIAMS ET AL VS IKEA US WEST INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 CAMRYNN WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against IKEA US WEST INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2239

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

WILLIAMS MELVANTE

WILLIAMS CHRISTI

Defendants and Respondents

IKEA US WEST INC

IKEA DISTRIBUTION SERVICES INC

IKEA US EAST LLC

IKEA INDIRECT MATERIAL & SERVICES LLC

IKEA NORTH AMERICA CAPITAL INC.

IKEA PROPERTY INC.

IKEA SUPPLY AG

DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

Minors

WILLIAMS CAMRYNN

WILLIAMS MAYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCMILLAN SHELLY D.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

FOX DANA ALDEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

12/26/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

12/26/2018: Unknown

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/11/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise Hearing

2/11/2019: Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise Hearing

Minute Order

2/27/2019: Minute Order

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

2/27/2019: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous)

2/27/2019: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous)

Request for Dismissal

3/8/2019: Request for Dismissal

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

3/14/2019: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/21/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

6/21/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

6/23/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

7/14/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

8/29/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit to Blocked Account) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Melvante Williams (Legacy Party); Maya Williams (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Melvante Williams (Legacy Party); Camrynn Williams (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Camrynn Williams (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account (Re Claimant Maya Williams); Filed by Christi Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Christi Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. STRICT PRODUCTS LIABILITY ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less