This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 04:59:22 (UTC).

CAMILO RANGEL, ET AL. VS PIERRE LANDSCAPE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 CAMILO RANGEL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PIERRE LANDSCAPE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN, ANN I. JONES, YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1366

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

ANN I. JONES

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RANGEL CAMILO

Defendant

PIERRE LANDSCAPE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HARITOONIAN NATALIE ROSE

YEREMIAN DAVID HARMIK

Defendant Attorney

TURNER WILLIAM MARLIN

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

8/20/2021: Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

8/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 06/30/2021, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE NOTICE - FIRST AM

6/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 06/30/2021, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE NOTICE - FIRST AM

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

6/16/2021: Amended Complaint - (AMENDED)

Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT IN ADVANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW SANCTIONS

6/16/2021: Status Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT IN ADVANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW SANCTIONS

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/18/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 06/24/2021

6/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 06/24/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

6/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

4/8/2021: Case Management Order

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/8/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Notice of Appearance

3/8/2021: Notice of Appearance

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • Hearing10/26/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • Hearing10/11/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Hearing06/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order Trial Preparation]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketOrder (Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Pierre Landscape, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pierre Landscape, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by Pierre Landscape, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Camilo Rangel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Setting Initial Status Conference) of 02/03/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Setting Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Camilo Rangel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Camilo Rangel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FYR LANDSCAPING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARITOONIAN NATALIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEREMIAN, DAVID