This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 01:19:54 (UTC).

CAMILLE DEL ROSARIO VS PETER JOSEPH CAMARILLO ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 CAMILLE DEL ROSARIO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PETER JOSEPH CAMARILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE, AMY D. HOGUE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6718

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEL ROSARIO CAMILLE

Defendants

CAMARILLO PETER JOSEPH

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

JENSEN PAUL ROLF ESQ.

SHEMTOUB MICHAEL

VALENZUELA ERIC

SHEA ADAM KENT

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ELLIOTT KELLY R. ESQ.

WINTERMAN CRAIG L.

ELLIOTT KELLY REGAN ESQ.

WINTERMAN CRAIG LEE

ANDERSEN SUSAN KAY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (LINDA LEE, CSR #13568)

5/24/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (LINDA LEE, CSR #13568)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. WINTERMAN IN SUPPORT OF VWGOA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/11/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. WINTERMAN IN SUPPORT OF VWGOA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Request for Judicial Notice

7/11/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Motion for Summary Judgment

7/11/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

7/11/2019: Separate Statement

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SET JURY TRIAL

7/19/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER TO SET JURY TRIAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. WINTERMAN IN SUPPORT OF VWGOA'S MOTION TO SET JURY TRIAL

7/19/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. WINTERMAN IN SUPPORT OF VWGOA'S MOTION TO SET JURY TRIAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OFF COUNSEL RE: REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE OF SEPTEMBER 25, 2019 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING

7/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OFF COUNSEL RE: REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE OF SEPTEMBER 25, 2019 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM

8/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/13/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. TO PLAINTIFRFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. WINTERMAN

9/9/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. TO PLAINTIFRFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. WINTERMAN

Opposition - OPPOSITION OF VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/10/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OF VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO DENY MOTION F...)

9/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO DENY MOTION F...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/11/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

9/11/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Reply - REPLY OF VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. WINTERMAN

9/18/2019: Reply - REPLY OF VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; DECLARATION OF CRAIG L. WINTERMAN

Objection - OBJECTION BY VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/18/2019: Objection - OBJECTION BY VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Proof of Service by Mail

9/19/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • Hearing06/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Hearing06/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE TRIAL IN LIGHT OF COVID-19 EMERGENCY; AND ORDER); Filed by Camille Del Rosario (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Camille Del Rosario (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Camille Del Rosario (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Camille Del Rosario (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Camille Del Rosario (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH - AMENDED (NUMBER):1 - MOTOR VEHICLE -PERSONAL INJURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by Camille Del Rosario (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Camille Del Rosario (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6718    Hearing Date: February 24, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

On April 4, 2017, plaintiff Camille Del Rosario (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendants Peter Joseph Camarillo, U.S. Equipment Co., Inc., and Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (“Volkswagen”). In 2018, the Court granted terminating sanctions for Plaintiff’s failure to comply with discovery orders. Later, Plaintiff moved to vacate the dismissal due to attorney mistake, which was granted. The case was dismissed as to Volkswagen after the Court granted its summary judgment motion on September 25, 2019. Trial as to remaining defendants Peter Camarillo and U.S. Equipment Co., Inc. is currently set for March 27, 2020. Plaintiff seeks to continue the trial to November 2, 2020. The motion is unopposed.

A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332(b).) The request for continuance may be granted on an affirmative showing of good cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332.)

Plaintiff contends she needs more time to conduct discovery and pursue private mediation. Both sides claim conflicts in trial counsels’ calendars, although they fail to specify those conflicts. Plaintiff has shown little diligence in this case, as exemplified by her past failure to produce discovery and comply with discovery orders. Her prior attorneys took the blame for those failures. Plaintiff now has new attorneys. The Court will GRANT the motion, and expects counsel on both sides to proceed without further delay. If the parties wish to mediate, they are to schedule a mediation date forthwith. They should not expect a further continuance based on a particular mediator’s schedule.

Trial is continued to November 2, 2020. The Final Status Conference is continued to October 23, 2020. All dates are based on the new trial date. The parties are ordered to inform their witnesses and experts of the new date immediately. The Court has granted this continuance to the date selected by the moving party, and there was no opposition to the selected date. The Court presumes the date has been cleared with the parties, counsel, witnesses, and experts, and grants the continuance in reliance on the implicit representation that the parties, counsel, witnesses and experts will be available on the date of trial and day-to-day thereafter for the length of the trial plus a five-day trailing period. Given the age of this case, no further continuances should be expected.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ingersoll Rand Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIOTT KELLY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WINTERMAN CRAIG L.