This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 01:42:38 (UTC).

CAMILA GODOY, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, GENARO GODOY VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 CAMILA GODOY, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, GENARO GODOY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0895

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMILA GODOY BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM GENARO GODOY

Defendants

LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

WONG CHUCK

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRESEN SOLOMON E.

GRESEN SOLOMON ERIC

HABASHY JOHN REFAAT

Defendant Attorney

GRAVEN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CAMILA

6/4/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CAMILA

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/3/2020: Complaint

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

6/11/2020: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/9/2020: PI General Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

8/6/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PROPOSED GUARDIAN AD LITEM GENARO GODOY TO REQUEST THAT PLAINTIFF PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM

7/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PROPOSED GUARDIAN AD LITEM GENARO GODOY TO REQUEST THAT PLAINTIFF PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYM

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/26/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

10/1/2020: Answer

Notice - OF CONTINUED TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES

11/16/2021: Notice - OF CONTINUED TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED PRE-TRIAL DATES

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

11/10/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Hearing04/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Hearing03/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketOf Continued Trial, FSC and Related Pre-Trial Dates; Filed by Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Camila Godoy, by and through her guardian ad litem, Genaro Godoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant); Chuck Wong (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Camila Godoy, by and through her guardian ad litem, Genaro Godoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Camila Godoy, by and through her guardian ad litem, Genaro Godoy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRESEN SOLOMON E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HABASHY JOHN