This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2023 at 10:11:26 (UTC).

CAMEY LOPEZ, DIANA VALESKA VS CUC, MIGUEL IXMATA

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 CAMEY LOPEZ, DIANA VALESKA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CUC, MIGUEL IXMATA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RIFF, LAWRENCE P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1223

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAMEY LOPEZ DIANA VALESKA

Respondent

CUC MIGUEL IXMATA

 

Court Documents

Notice - Case Assignment

7/9/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/9/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

7/7/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

7/7/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - (copies mailed)

7/7/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - (copies mailed)

Summons

7/7/2021: Summons

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

7/7/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

1/25/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Request - Enter Default FL165

1/25/2022: Request - Enter Default FL165

Proof of Service of Summons

1/25/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

Minute Order

2/16/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Mail - PROPOSED JUDGMENT

6/9/2022: Proof of Service - Mail - PROPOSED JUDGMENT

Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

6/9/2022: Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Default FL170

6/9/2022: Declaration - Default FL170

Notice - Entry of Judgment

7/15/2022: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Judgment

7/15/2022: Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (PROPOSED JUDGMENT ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 128, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Case Review Conference - Held - FCCR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketNotice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child ((copies mailed) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less