This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2023 at 08:07:00 (UTC).

CAMERON MANUEL PADILLA VS JANIE COHEN

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 CAMERON MANUEL PADILLA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JANIE COHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA M. SCHEPER and TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6429

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Defendant

COHEN JANIE

Not Classified By Court

CURTIS STACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PHILLIPS CAROLYN C

Other Attorneys

DORENFELD DAVID K.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PO...)

7/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PO...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 63 1(B)

5/25/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 63 1(B)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/22/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/28/2023: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

4/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

4/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER;)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

3/24/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

3/20/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Related Case

3/8/2023: Notice of Related Case

Case Management Statement

3/8/2023: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CONSENT FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

2/3/2023: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CONSENT FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR STACY

1/31/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR STACY

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/9/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2023
  • Hearing10/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Non-Appearance Case Review Re Po...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/18/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re Posting of Jury Fees by Plaintiff or Waiver of Jury scheduled for 07/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 updated: Result Date to 07/27/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 63 1(b); Filed by: Cameron Manuel Padilla (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re Posting of Jury Fees by Plaintiff or Waiver of Jury scheduled for 07/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/27/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketAddress for David K. Dorenfeld (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAMERON MANUEL PADILLA (Plaintiff); As to: JANIE COHEN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAMERON MANUEL PADILLA (Plaintiff); As to: JANIE COHEN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: CAMERON MANUEL PADILLA (Plaintiff); As to: JANIE COHEN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Cameron: Status Date changed from 11/21/2022 to 11/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less