Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 22:10:47 (UTC).

CAMARERO ESPARZA, RICARDO NEFTALI VS GONZALEZ, CHRISTINA

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 CAMARERO ESPARZA, RICARDO NEFTALI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GONZALEZ, CHRISTINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY, CHARLES Q.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1763

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY, CHARLES Q.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAMARERO ESPARZA RICARDO NEFTALI

Respondent

GONZALEZ CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BARRY SAMUEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/25/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Continuance

6/3/2020: Notice - Continuance

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Attend Mediation Appointment

10/7/2020: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Attend Mediation Appointment

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

10/7/2020: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Minute Order

8/20/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/20/2020: Minute Order

Declaration - Income and Expense

8/13/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Summons

9/27/2019: Summons

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

10/21/2019: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service

11/8/2019: Proof of Service

Proof of Service - Mail

11/21/2019: Proof of Service - Mail

Notice - Change of Address

11/21/2019: Notice - Change of Address

Declaration - Income and Expense

12/24/2019: Declaration - Income and Expense

Request - Continue Hearing

1/7/2020: Request - Continue Hearing

Proof of Service - Mail

1/22/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

Proof of Service - Mail

2/13/2020: Proof of Service - Mail

FCS - Agreement

2/18/2020: FCS - Agreement

Minute Order

3/25/2020: Minute Order

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • Hearing05/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 202 at 7339 South Painter Ave., Whittier, CA 90602; Short Cause Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Hearing05/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 202 at 7339 South Painter Ave., Whittier, CA 90602; Request for Order re: Modification Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 202; Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 202; Short Cause Trial - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointment and Payment of FCS Specialist

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketChild Interview (Full Amount); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketResponsive Declaration (to Request for Order ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRY SAMUEL