This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 03:11:57 (UTC).

CALVIN ALLS, VS MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 CALVIN ALLS, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0633

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABNDEH AMEERA

ACEVEDO ELVIA

ACOSTA NATALIE

AGUIRRE CRUZ

ALABADDI AYED

ALABADDI FARES

ALABBADI MOHAMMAD

ALEDWAN DUNIA

ALEXANDER ERICA

ALJALODY WOROUD

ALLEN ROBERT

ALLS CALVIN

ALLS DOROTHY

ALLS SHAWN

ANDERSON CASSIE

ANDERSON KRISTINA

ANDERSON ZOE

ANDREWS ERIN

ARCHIE DAVION

ARMSTEAD IANTHA P.

422 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARIM SOPHIA

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/11/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/11/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/11/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/11/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

1/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

1/19/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Initial Status Conference Order

2/17/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

2/17/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • Hearing04/10/2023 at 1:45 PM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 04/10/2023 at 01:45 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order Re: Setting Initial Status Conference); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Setting Initial Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stella Johnson (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Brandon Weaver (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Aboni Coleman (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Matthew Cooper (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
513 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Jazebel Tello (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ronald Fesus (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Porsha Williams (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- David Peterson (Plaintiff): Name Suffix: blank; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Calvin Alls, (Plaintiff); As to: Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Defendant); Prologis, Inc. (Defendant); Liberty Property, LP (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Calvin Alls, (Plaintiff); As to: Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less