This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 07:13:44 (UTC).

CALVARY SPV I, LLC ET AL VS JERI L CARTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 CALVARY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JERI L CARTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1159

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC-SIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA

Defendants

DOES 1 - 10 INC.

JERI L CARTER AKA JERI CARTER

CARTER JERI L AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP

Defendant Attorney

MASAI MCDOUGALL LAW OFFICE OF

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/20/2018: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Answer; Filed by JERI L AKA CARTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2017
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by CAVALRY SPV I, LLC-SIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by CAVALRY SPV I, LLC-SIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Motion to Transfer; Filed by CAVALRY SPV I, LLC-SIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • at 08:35 AM in Department S27; Hearing on Motion to Transfer (Motion to Transfer; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Motion to Transfer; Filed by CAVALRY SPV I, LLC-SIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department S27; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by CAVALRY SPV I, LLC-SIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by CAVALRY SPV I, LLC-SIGNEE OF CITIBANK NA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less