This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 09:12:52 (UTC).

CALPORTLAND COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 CALPORTLAND COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2412

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALPORTLAND COMPANY DBA CATALINA PACIFIC CONCRETE

Defendants

1410 HIGHLAND VENTURE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ANGELES CONTRACTOR INC.

NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

Cross Defendant and Defendant

ANGELES CONTRACTOR INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIPSCHULTZ JAMES D.

Defendant Attorney

MEYERS ADAM H.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HOLBROOK EARL SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/4/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10/4/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/4/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/4/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/5/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Lis Pendens

11/14/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

11/28/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Mail

12/13/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

1/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/5/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - ANSWER BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC., AND THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY TO THE COMPLAINT FILED BY CALPORTLAND COMPANY

2/8/2023: Answer - ANSWER BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC., AND THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY TO THE COMPLAINT FILED BY CALPORTLAND COMPANY

Cross-Complaint

2/10/2023: Cross-Complaint

Answer

2/10/2023: Answer

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Nibbelink Masonry Construction Corporation (Defendant); As to: CalPortland Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Nibbelink Masonry Construction Corporation (Defendant); As to: Angeles Contractor, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketAnswer BY ANGELES CONTRACTOR, INC., AND THE WESTERN SURETY COMPANY TO THE COMPLAINT FILED BY CALPORTLAND COMPANY; Filed by: Western Surety Company (Defendant); Angeles Contractor, Inc. (Defendant); As to: CalPortland Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CalPortland Company (Plaintiff); As to: Angeles Contractor, Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/15/2022; Service Cost: 85.07; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CalPortland Company (Plaintiff); As to: Western Surety Company (Defendant); Service Date: 12/02/2022; Service Cost: 81.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CalPortland Company (Plaintiff); As to: Nibbelink Masonry Construction Corporation (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketSummons ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Issued and Filed by: CalPortland Company, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Nibbelink Masonry Construction Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: CalPortland Company, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Nibbelink Masonry Construction Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); Western Surety Company (Defendant); Angeles Contractor, Inc., (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: CalPortland Company, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketAddress for JAMES D. LIPSCHULTZ (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CalPortland Company, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Nibbelink Masonry Construction Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); 1410 Highland Venture, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CalPortland Company, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Nibbelink Masonry Construction Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); 1410 Highland Venture, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CalPortland Company, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Nibbelink Masonry Construction Corporation, a California corporation (Defendant); 1410 Highland Venture, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Terry Green in Department 14 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less