This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2023 at 09:36:24 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION VS FENIX MARINE SERVICES, LTD.

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FENIX MARINE SERVICES, LTD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0704

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

Defendant

FENIX MARINE SERVICES LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLEIMANPOUR MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

WASSER SHAIN A.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/19/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion to Consolidate

4/19/2023: Motion to Consolidate

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES NO. 22LBCV00704 WITH 22STCV31687

4/19/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES NO. 22LBCV00704 WITH 22STCV31687

Notice of Related Case

4/4/2023: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/3/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/03/2023

4/3/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 04/03/2023

Case Management Statement

3/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer - DEFENDANT FENIX MARINE SERVICES, LTD.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/15/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT FENIX MARINE SERVICES, LTD.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/15/2023

3/15/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/15/2023

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT FENIX MARINE SERVICES, LTD. AND TO PERMIT DEFENDANT TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; ORDER THERON

3/15/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT FENIX MARINE SERVICES, LTD. AND TO PERMIT DEFENDANT TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; ORDER THERON

Case Management Statement

3/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/6/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/1/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/31/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/31/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2023
  • Hearing10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • Hearing06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Consolidate scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate; Filed by: Fenix Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Fenix Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration in Support of Motion to Consolidate Related Cases for All Purposes No. 22LBCV00704 with 22STCV31687; Filed by: Fenix Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Fenix Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: California Truckers Safety Association (Plaintiff); As to: Fenix Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant); Service Date: 11/14/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: California Truckers Safety Association (Plaintiff); As to: Fenix Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: California Truckers Safety Association (Plaintiff); As to: Fenix Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: California Truckers Safety Association (Plaintiff); As to: Fenix Marine Services, Ltd. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less