This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:23:22 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA TAXPAYERS ACTION NETWORK VS GDL BEST CONTRACTORS

Case Summary

On 04/05/2017 CALIFORNIA TAXPAYERS ACTION NETWORK filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against GDL BEST CONTRACTORS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD FRUIN and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6614

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD FRUIN

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CALIFORNIA TAXPAYERS ACTION NETWORK

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 11-1000

LOPEZ BENJAMIN

GDL BEST CONTRACTORS INC

LOPEZ FRANCISCO M

LOPEZ JOSE C

DOES 1-100

Interested Parties

MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

RUTAN & TUCKER LLP

BURKE WILLIAMS & SORENSON LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BRIGGS CORY J.

BRIGGS CORY JAY

KIM ANTHONY N.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

LANAK & HANNA P.C.

CABAL MAC WALLACE

Interested Party Attorney

AUSTIN MARK JASON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/17/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Order

6/17/2019: Case Management Order

PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; DECLARATION OF G. RICK MARSHALL

2/23/2018: PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES; DECLARATION OF G. RICK MARSHALL

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

3/1/2018: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

3/2/2018: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

3/8/2018: ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

Minute Order

3/8/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/9/2018: Minute Order

ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER WRITTEN RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

3/9/2018: ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER WRITTEN RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

3/13/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO REAL PARTY IN INTEREST MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/14/2018: PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO REAL PARTY IN INTEREST MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REAL PARTY IN INTEREST MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DISTRICT?S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/21/2018: REAL PARTY IN INTEREST MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DISTRICT?S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE PENDING DEMURRER HEARING

5/22/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE PENDING DEMURRER HEARING

Minute Order

5/22/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/22/2018: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GDL BEST CONTRACTORS, INC.'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/23/2018: PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GDL BEST CONTRACTORS, INC.'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS GDL BEST CONTRACTORS, INC., FRANCISCO M. LOPEZ, JOSE C. LOPEZ AND BENJAMIN LOPEZ'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/30/2018: DEFENDANTS GDL BEST CONTRACTORS, INC., FRANCISCO M. LOPEZ, JOSE C. LOPEZ AND BENJAMIN LOPEZ'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order

6/6/2018: Minute Order

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • Hearingat 13:30 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Hearingat 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Hearingat 16:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
165 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 15; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-04-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by California Taxpayers Action Network (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF TO RECOVER ILLEGAL EXPENDITURES OF PUBLIC FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

RUTAN & TUCKER, LLP

Mark J. Austin (State Bar No. 208880) maustin@rutan.com

Emily Webb (State Bar No. 302118) ewebb@rutan.com

611 Anton Boulevard, Suite 1400 Costa Mesa, California 92626-1931 Telephone: 714-641-5100 Facsimile: 714-546-9035

Attorneys for Real Parties in Interest

MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

* (O 0>

SU e!'lor Cou oumy of Los n of Cg'e';g;nia

Sherr 1 2 jfl" {Cle

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

CALIFORNIA TAXPAYERS ACTION

NETWORK, a California corporation; and DOES 1 through 10,

Plaintiffs, V. GDL BEST CONTRACTORS, INC., a

California corporation; FRANCISCO M. LOPEZ, an individual; JOSE C. LOPEZ, an

individual; BENJAMIN LOPEZ, an individual;

and DOES 11 through 1,000,

Defendants.

MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL

DISTRICT, a California public entity; and ROES 1 THROUGH 100, :

Real Parties in Interest.

REAL PARTY IN INTEREST MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL | DISTRICT’S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED

COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF

POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

[RESERVATION NO. 171211273167

Date: May 25, 2018 Time: 8:30 a.m. Department: 50

Date Action Filed: April 5, 2017 Trial Date: None Set

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6614 Hearing Date: March 16, 2022 Dept: 50

There will be no written tentative other than the following:

For the reasons set forth in the briefs filed by GDL and MUSD, the Court finds that CTAN's prequalification claims under Public Contract Code section 20111.6 et seq and the conflict of interest claim are barred by the statute of limitations period for validation actions (i.e., 60 days). There is no need to reach issues 2 (mootness) and 3(standing).



Case Number: ****6614 Hearing Date: January 26, 2022 Dept: 50

THE COURT WILL NEED ADDITIONAL TIME TO PREPARE FOR THE HEARING.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GDL BEST CONTRACTORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA TAXPAYERS ACTION NETWORK is a litigant

Latest cases where Rutan & Tucker, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where MONTEBELLO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant