This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:10:08 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA SPINE AND NEUROSURGERY INSTITUTE VS OPERATING

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 CALIFORNIA SPINE AND NEUROSURGERY INSTITUTE filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against OPERATING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1985

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA SPINE AND NEUROSURGERY

Defendants

ZENITH AMERICAN SOLUTIONS INC

ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INS. CO

OPERATING ENGINEERS HEALTH & WELFARE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JONATHAN A STIEGLITZ

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

MICHELE R. STAFFORD

STAFFORD MICHELE R.

JOHANSEN SARAH

SMERSFELT KENNETH N. ESQ.

HUMBERT C. MARK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/2/2018: Minute Order

ORDER OF REMAND

7/9/2018: ORDER OF REMAND

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

8/6/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

8/8/2018: DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW P. MINSER RE: COMPLIANCE WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT

8/8/2018: DECLARATION OF MATTHEW P. MINSER RE: COMPLIANCE WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT

OPERATING ENGINEERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND'S NOTICE OF JOINDER TO DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INS. CO.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/8/2018: OPERATING ENGINEERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND'S NOTICE OF JOINDER TO DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INS. CO.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

OPERATING ENGINEERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND'S JOINDER TO DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE HEALTH INS. CO.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT TH

8/8/2018: OPERATING ENGINEERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND'S JOINDER TO DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE HEALTH INS. CO.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT TH

JOINDER OF DEFENDANT ZENITH AMERICAN SOLUTIONS, INC. IN DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INS. CO; SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER; M

8/8/2018: JOINDER OF DEFENDANT ZENITH AMERICAN SOLUTIONS, INC. IN DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INS. CO; SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER; M

OPERATING ENGINEERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND'S NOTICE OF JOINDER TO DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INS. CO.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/8/2018: OPERATING ENGINEERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND'S NOTICE OF JOINDER TO DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INS. CO.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF SARAH B. JOHANSEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/8/2018: DECLARATION OF SARAH B. JOHANSEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND ETC.

8/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND ETC.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER ETC.

8/10/2018: AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE & HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER ETC.

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

8/20/2018: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/4/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/7/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

9/7/2018: Minute Order

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/7/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/11/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 04/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by California Spine and Neurosurgery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by California Spine and Neurosurgery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. INTENTIONAL INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Attorney cr Party withoul Attorney: For Court Use Only

Law Ofices Of JONATHAN A. STIEGLITZ ESQ Bar #278028 sy LD 11845 DLYMPIC BLVD. i W Catifornt SUITE800 - guperiof E?j‘,w aneete’ | LOS ANGELES, CA 90064 Con™™™ . Telephone No: 323-979-2063 FAX No: 323-488-6748 PR 3 0 ?““" Attorney for: Plaintiff ecm“e UmcetlU “t‘

Insert name of Court. and Judicial District and Branch Court:

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Plaintiff- ZALIFORNIA SPINE AND NEUROSURGERY INSTITUTE Defendan: OPERATING ENGINEERS HEALTH & WELFARE TRUST FUND

PROOF OF SERVICE Hearing Date: Time: Dept/Div: Case Number:

SUMMONS & COMPLAINT BC691985

. At the time of service | was at least 18 yearsparty to this actioa.

2710 GATEWAY OAKS DRIVE

SUITE 150 N,

SACRAMENTO, CA 95833

. 1 served the party: a. by personal service. | personally delivered the documents listed in item 2 to the party or person authorized to receive

process for the party (1) on: Mon., Apr. 16, 2018 (2) at: 12:39PM R 6. The “Notice to the Person Served" (on the Summons) was completed as follows: ECE! VE D on benalf of: ZENITH AMERICAN SOLUTIONS, INC. APR 3 Uncer CCP 416.10 (corporation) 0 2018

7. Persaon Who Served Papers: Recoverable Cost Per CCP 1033. S{!ffli‘m W! NDOW

a. MICHAEL VAN HOOSER d. The Fee for Service was: $50.00 UESS' J, 2300 P Street e. 1am: (3) registered Califorma process server @4 fi .“fi Sacramento, CA 95816 (9 Independent Contractor ;.‘ {‘ . \x; Is (916) 498 0808 (ii) Regisrration No.: 2015-16 . IR (iii) County: Sacramento

FAX (916) 498-0817

8. Ideclare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the State of California that the foregoing is true and correct.

Dare: Mon, Apr. 16, 2018 W —— _ (MICHAELC VAN HOOSER} . .. _ .~

ouncil Form POS-010 PROQF OF SERVICE

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZENITH AMERICAN SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where California Spine and Neurosurgey Institute is a litigant

Latest cases where OPERATING ENGINEERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE TRUST FUND FOR NORTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS is a litigant