This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2020 at 10:11:49 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA JOINT POWERS INSURANCE AUTHORITY VS GASTON RAGAZZ

Case Summary

On 05/16/2018 CALIFORNIA JOINT POWERS INSURANCE AUTHORITY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GASTON RAGAZZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6237

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CALIFORNIA JOINT POWERS INSURANCE

TORILLO ISRAEL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-20

RAGAZZO GASTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SMITH S. HENSLEE ESQ.

SMITH STEPHEN HENSLEE ESQ.

ROSENBERG DAVID BRIAN

Defendant Attorneys

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH

YOSTANTO JEFF MATTHEW

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: VACATING THE 05/06/2020 FINAL STATUS CONFERE...)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: VACATING THE 05/06/2020 FINAL STATUS CONFERE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: VACATING THE 05/06/2020 FINAL STATUS CONFERE...) OF 04/02/2020

4/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: VACATING THE 05/06/2020 FINAL STATUS CONFERE...) OF 04/02/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Substitution of Attorney

4/7/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

4/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice of Ruling

2/10/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE TWO RELATED MATTERS (BC70623...)

2/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE TWO RELATED MATTERS (BC70623...)

Motion to Consolidate

12/16/2019: Motion to Consolidate

Notice of Ruling

10/10/2019: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (BC706237 AND 18STCV04...) OF 09/09/2019

9/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (BC706237 AND 18STCV04...) OF 09/09/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (BC706237 AND 18STCV04...)

9/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (BC706237 AND 18STCV04...)

Notice of Related Case

9/9/2019: Notice of Related Case

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

9/17/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/17/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

9/17/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ACTION

6/13/2018: NOTICE OF ACTION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS -

5/16/2018: SUMMONS -

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Hearing05/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Hearing08/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial ((Consolidated herein 18STCV04303)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference ((Consolidated Herein 18STCV04303)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Court Order Re: Trial Setting Conference); Filed by California Joint Powers Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Israel Torillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docketat 10:38 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docketat 10:31 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Vacating the 05/06/2020 Final Status Confere...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Gaston Ragazzo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by California Joint Powers Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by California Joint Powers Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by California Joint Powers Insurance (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706237    Hearing Date: February 06, 2020    Dept: 29

California Joint Powers Insurance Authority v. Gaston Ragazz

Motion by Defendant, Gaston Ragazzo, to Consolidate Two Related Matters and Adopt Trial Date Set in Related Case is GRANTED in part and denied in part.  The motion to consolidate is granted; the motion to set the trial date as 5/7/2020 is denied.  The trial date is the trial date in the lead case, 5/18/2020. 

On 9/9/19, the Court deemed BC706237 related to 18STCV04303. Case No. BC706237 was designated the lead case. Defendant now seeks consolidation of the cases.

The decision to consolidate is a matter for the court’s discretion. Muller v. Robinson (1959) 174 Cal. App. 2d 511, 515. Consolidation is appropriate here since both cases arise from the same accident, involve substantially the same parties, and common questions of law or fact are pending. Cal. Code Civ. Proc. § 1048(a).

Accordingly, both matters are consolidated. The trial date in the lead matter of 5/18/20 is the trial date for these consolidated matters. All dates in 18STCV04303 are vacated.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.