This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 05:53:51 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA CREDITS GROUP LLC VS PROSPECT ENTERPRISE INC ET A

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 CALIFORNIA CREDITS GROUP LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PROSPECT ENTERPRISE INC ET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1464

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA CREDITS GROUP LLC

Defendants and Respondents

AMERICAN FISH & SEAFOOD COMPANY

PROSPECT ENTERPRISE INCORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

CHAN PAUL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE - OTHER

9/18/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE - OTHER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/12/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

5/25/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

5/10/2017: Unknown

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/8/2017: ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

4/27/2017: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE ATTORNEY-FEE PRAYER FROM COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/24/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE ATTORNEY-FEE PRAYER FROM COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Unknown

3/30/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/3/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

2/21/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

2/21/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30; (Motion to Strike; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE ATTORNEY-FEE PRAYER FROM COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by California Credits Group, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN FISH & SEAFOOD COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PROSPECT ENTERPRISE INCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CREDITS GROUP LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAN PAUL S.