This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2021 at 16:16:56 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE CO. VS SOPHIA NOWINA-KONOPKA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE CO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOPHIA NOWINA-KONOPKA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0866

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE CO.

Defendants

NOWINA-KONOPKA SOPHIA

LAWES KIMBERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAHAM BRUCE

Defendant Attorney

TITTMANN RAYMOND J

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC) / REQUESTED BY PLAINTIFF,...)

5/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC) / REQUESTED BY PLAINTIFF,...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/6/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF EDWARD J. VALDESPINO ISO MSJ

11/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF EDWARD J. VALDESPINO ISO MSJ

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/25/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Separate Statement

11/25/2020: Separate Statement

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/25/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY LAWES ISO MSJ

11/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY LAWES ISO MSJ

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SOPHIA NOWINA-KONOPKA ISO MSJ

11/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SOPHIA NOWINA-KONOPKA ISO MSJ

Notice of Motion

11/25/2020: Notice of Motion

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-JU...) OF 01/25/2021

1/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-JU...) OF 01/25/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-JU...)

1/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-JU...)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET ONE)

2/3/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET ONE)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

2/3/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE)

Separate Statement

2/3/2021: Separate Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/3/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE, WITH DEMAND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS

2/3/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE, WITH DEMAND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/3/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/3/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Hearing10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Status Conference (ReMandatory Settlement Dates/Discovery Referee) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (/ Requested by Plaintiff, the Motions are Filed by the Defendant on 2-3-2021) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) / Requested by Plaintiff,...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) (/ Requested by Plaintiff, the Motions are Filed by the Defendant on 2-3-2021) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) / Requested by Plaintiff,...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Meet and Confer Declaration of Edward J. Valdespino); Filed by Sophia Nowina-Konopka (Defendant); Kimberly Lawes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketBrief (Informal Discovery Conference); Filed by Sophia Nowina-Konopka (Defendant); Kimberly Lawes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((2-3 day estimate)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sophia Nowina-Konopka (Defendant); Kimberly Lawes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by California Capital Insurance Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by California Capital Insurance Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by California Capital Insurance Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by California Capital Insurance Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by California Capital Insurance Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by California Capital Insurance Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by California Capital Insurance Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMAPY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tittmann, Raymond J