This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 11:34:27 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INS. CO. VS LA HOOD, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INS CO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LA HOOD, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2377

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INS. CO.

Defendants

ARRELOA MOISES

LA HOOD INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

LA HOOD INC.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAHAM BRUCE N.

Defendant Attorney

MADARIAGA DAVID BERRY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Mail

6/30/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

6/30/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/4/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

8/4/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

8/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/23/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/15/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2024
  • Hearing06/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Hearing12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by LA Hood, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by LA Hood, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LA Hood, Inc. (Defendant); Moises Arreloa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES); Filed by LA Hood, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by California Capital Ins. Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by California Capital Ins. Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by California Capital Ins. Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by California Capital Ins. Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by California Capital Ins. Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by California Capital Ins. Co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA CAPITAL INSURANCE COMAPY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAHAM BRUCE N