This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2021 at 02:54:26 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS ZAHRA NIKFARJAM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against ZAHRA NIKFARJAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6442

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ARABSHAHIN ATOOSA

NIKFARJAM ZAHRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

O'CONNOR LEE

O'CONNOR LEE PATRICK

Defendant Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement

11/2/2020: Separate Statement

Request - REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE

11/2/2020: Request - REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE

Notice of Settlement

12/4/2020: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT) OF 12/04/2020

12/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT) OF 12/04/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/27/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

7/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/13/2020: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/19/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/11/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/1/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/3/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/26/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

3/9/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/18/2020: Complaint

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docketat 3:34 PM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Unconditional Settlement) of 12/04/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Unconditional Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Atoosa Arabshahin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice ( of Case Reassignment); Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'CONNOR LEE PATRICK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'CONNOR LEE