This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2021 at 02:22:56 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS WILLIAM SCHUBERTH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against WILLIAM SCHUBERTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, SERENA R. MURILLO and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1866

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SCHUBERTH WILLIAM

BLOUNT DAMON LEONARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

O'CONNOR LEE

O'CONNOR LEE PATRICK ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

PETALE ALEXANDER

BUCKSBAUM DEBORAH SUE ESQ.

PETALE ALEXANDER JOHN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER COURT'S ORDER RE: MOTION TO STAY ACTION

6/25/2021: Order - ORDER COURT'S ORDER RE: MOTION TO STAY ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO STAY ACTION, FILED BY ATTORNEY ...)

6/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO STAY ACTION, FILED BY ATTORNEY ...)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT WILLIAM SCHUBERTHS MOTION TO STAY ACTION

6/28/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT WILLIAM SCHUBERTHS MOTION TO STAY ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

2/16/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE) OF 02/23/2021

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE) OF 02/23/2021

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

2/23/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE)

2/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/24/2021

2/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/24/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

3/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/22/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Status Conference and Order

2/8/2021: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Motion for Stay of Proceedings

11/9/2020: Motion for Stay of Proceedings

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEBORAH S. BUCKSBAUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WILLIAM SCHUBERTH'S MOTION TO STAY ACTION

11/9/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DEBORAH S. BUCKSBAUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WILLIAM SCHUBERTH'S MOTION TO STAY ACTION

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • Hearing06/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (ON DEFENDANT WILLIAM SCHUBERTH?S MOTION TO STAY ACTION); Filed by William Schuberth (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Motion - Other (To Stay Action, filed by Attorney for Defendant, William Schuberth) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOrder (Court's Order re: Motion to Stay Action); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other To Stay Action, filed by Attorney ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Damon Leonard Blount (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Damon Leonard Blount (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Damon Leonard Blount (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Damon Leonard Blount (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'CONNOR LEE PATRICK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'CONNOR LEE