This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 01:22:35 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS PAM SMYTH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PAM SMYTH,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3260

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

GARCIA CLAUDIA

JELINEK ASHALATA

SMYTH BRIOHNY

SMYTH PAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'CONNOR LEE P.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND/OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

2/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND/OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND/OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...) OF 02/28/2023

2/28/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND/OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...) OF 02/28/2023

Case Management Statement

2/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Settlement

2/14/2023: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/6/2022: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/17/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Continuance

11/1/2022: Notice of Continuance

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/27/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

10/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

9/13/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

9/13/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

7/19/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • Hearing04/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal and/or Case Management Conf...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal and/or Case Management Conf...) of 02/28/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal and/or Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34 updated: Result Date to 02/28/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal and/or Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Lee P. O'Connor (Attorney): Organization Name changed from O'Connor, Schmeltzer & O'Connor to Law Offices of O'Connor, Schmeltzer & O'Connor; Middle Name: P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketAddress for Lee P. O'Connor (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Linfield in Department 34 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Pam Smyth (Defendant); Briohny Smyth (Defendant); Ashalata Jelinek (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Pam Smyth (Defendant); Briohny Smyth (Defendant); Ashalata Jelinek (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Pam Smyth (Defendant); Briohny Smyth (Defendant); Ashalata Jelinek (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less