This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 10:14:40 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY VS ALFREDO GOMEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ALFREDO GOMEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6438

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

GOMEZ ALFREDO

VONGKAVIIVATHANAKUL VINCENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'CONNOR LEE P.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/17/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/17/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/19/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • Hearing09/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less