This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 01:26:48 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, ANN I. JONES and DANIEL J. BUCKLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8515

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

ANN I. JONES

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY

UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

GUIDEONE SPECIALTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

FLORISTS' MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

GUIDEONE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARY TIMOTHY E.

Defendant Attorneys

DIXON DOUGLAS JAMES

HUESTON JOHN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Status Report

10/12/2021: Status Report

Notice of Remand from Federal Court

11/19/2021: Notice of Remand from Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMAND)

11/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMAND)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/29/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Answer - DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/20/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

1/18/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CONTINUANCE;)

1/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CONTINUANCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/3/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/3/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL

7/21/2021: Notice - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL) OF 07/27/2021

7/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL) OF 07/27/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL)

7/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • Hearing06/22/2022 at 2:00 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketat 2:37 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 10; Status Conference - Not Held - Trailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Trailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 1; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 2:08 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Removal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Removal) of 07/27/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDefendants Southern California Edison and Edison International's Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:33 AM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 05/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Mercury Casualty Company (Plaintiff); GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by California Automobile Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Mercury Casualty Company (Plaintiff); GuideOne Mutual Insurance Company (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORISTS' MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GUIDEONE SPECIALTY MUTUAL INSURANCE AS SUBROGEE OF PARK BIXBY TOWER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal North America Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant