This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2023 at 20:02:01 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0092

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEUSSEYAN NATALIE M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/10/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/10/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/10/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/11/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • Hearing05/31/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: California Automobile Insurance Company, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Edison International (Defendant); Service Date: 01/12/2023; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: California Automobile Insurance Company, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Service Date: 01/12/2023; Service Cost: 129.71; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Olivia Rosales in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: California Automobile Insurance Company, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: California Automobile Insurance Company, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: California Automobile Insurance Company, a Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less