This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2021 at 12:22:29 (UTC).

CALEY-RAE PAVILLARD VS FANATICS, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 CALEY-RAE PAVILLARD filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FANATICS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2571

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAVILLARD CALEY-RAE

Defendant

FANATICS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HALL TIMOTHY A

HALL TIMOTHY A.

Defendant Attorney

ESQ JAMES SMITH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/21/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

8/12/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer

8/11/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

7/14/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/18/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/18/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/8/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Caley-Rae Pavillard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Caley-Rae Pavillard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Fanatics Inc. Erroneously Sued As Fanatics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Fanatics Inc. Erroneously Sued As Fanatics, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Caley-Rae Pavillard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Caley-Rae Pavillard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Caley-Rae Pavillard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Caley-Rae Pavillard (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FANATICS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL TIMOTHY A