This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/11/2023 at 02:05:59 (UTC).

CALEB SALSTROM VS SOLNSOFT, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 CALEB SALSTROM filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOLNSOFT, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WENDY CHANG, GREGORY W. ALARCON and RICHARD J. BURDGE JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2264

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WENDY CHANG

GREGORY W. ALARCON

RICHARD J. BURDGE JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALSTROM CALEB

Defendants

RAJ AMRIT

SOLNSOFT LLC

TRINET GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILBUR AMANDA LEAH

LACOUR JONATHAN P.

Defendant Attorneys

SORSHER BORIS

GOODMAN MATTHEW JOSEPH

KOO JODIE

LEGITTINO TRICIA L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/20/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Substitution of Attorney

8/23/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

8/23/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/23/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS (PROPOSED) ORDER ON TRINET GROUP, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR

6/30/2022: Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS (PROPOSED) ORDER ON TRINET GROUP, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR

Objection - OBJECTION NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO REVISED [PROPOSED] ORDER SUBMITTED BY TRINET GROUP, INC. ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS; AND SUBMISSION OF PLAINTIFFS [PR

7/22/2022: Objection - OBJECTION NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO REVISED [PROPOSED] ORDER SUBMITTED BY TRINET GROUP, INC. ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS; AND SUBMISSION OF PLAINTIFFS [PR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

7/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 07/22/2022

7/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 07/22/2022

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CESAR RODRIGUEZ, CSR #13269 (VIA LACOURTCONNECT)

6/16/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CESAR RODRIGUEZ, CSR #13269 (VIA LACOURTCONNECT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

6/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JASMINE JAMILI, CSR #13742 (VIA LACOURTCONNECT)

6/9/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JASMINE JAMILI, CSR #13742 (VIA LACOURTCONNECT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

6/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT TRINET GROUP, INCS SUPPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

5/25/2022: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT TRINET GROUP, INCS SUPPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF VICTOR XU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

5/25/2022: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF VICTOR XU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS

Notice of Joinder - NOTICE OF JOINDER (NAME EXTENSION) DEFENDANTS SOLNSOFT, LLC'S AND AMRIT RAJ'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT TRINET GROUP, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

5/26/2022: Notice of Joinder - NOTICE OF JOINDER (NAME EXTENSION) DEFENDANTS SOLNSOFT, LLC'S AND AMRIT RAJ'S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT TRINET GROUP, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL

Brief - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSIVE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF

6/2/2022: Brief - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSIVE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/2/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

5/10/2022: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2023
  • Hearing07/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketAddress for Jonathan P. LaCour (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jonathan P. LaCour (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: SOLNSOFT, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Amrit Raj (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/22/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketObjection NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO REVISED [PROPOSED] ORDER SUBMITTED BY TRINET GROUP, INC. ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS; AND SUBMISSION OF PLAINTIFFS [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Caleb Salstrom (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Objection NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO REVISED [PROPOSED] ORDER SUBMITTED BY TRINET GROUP, INC. ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY OR DISMISS PROCEEDINGS; AND SUBMISSION OF PLAINTIFFS [PROPOSED] ORDER: Filed By: Caleb Salstrom (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 37

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Jonathan P. LaCour (Attorney): Middle Name changed from Pierre to P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Caleb Salstrom (Plaintiff): First Name changed from CALEB to Caleb; Last Name changed from SALSTROM to Salstrom

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amrit Raj (Defendant): First Name changed from AMRIT to Amrit; Last Name changed from RAJ to Raj

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CALEB SALSTROM (Plaintiff); As to: SOLNSOFT, LLC (Defendant); AMRIT RAJ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CALEB SALSTROM (Plaintiff); As to: SOLNSOFT, LLC (Defendant); AMRIT RAJ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CALEB SALSTROM (Plaintiff); As to: SOLNSOFT, LLC (Defendant); AMRIT RAJ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CALEB SALSTROM (Plaintiff); As to: SOLNSOFT, LLC (Defendant); AMRIT RAJ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard J. Burdge, Jr. in Department 37 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less