This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 06:28:56 (UTC).

CALEB MCCLURE VS AUZAR MIDOCHT KANGAVARI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 CALEB MCCLURE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUZAR MIDOCHT KANGAVARI,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7474

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCLURE CALEB

Defendants

KANGAVARI AUZAR MIDOCHT

KOHANBASH AARON

KOHANBASH ELENA

KOHANBASH FARID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAZDANPANAH HESAM

Defendant Attorney

CULLINS DOUGLAS DRAKE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/1/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/1/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/1/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/1/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/1/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/1/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

3/1/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/1/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/1/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/1/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/24/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/24/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2025
  • Hearing02/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • Hearing08/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • Hearing08/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Aaron Kohanbash (Defendant); Farid Kohanbash (Defendant); Elena Kohanbash (Defendant); As to: Caleb McClure (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Aaron Kohanbash (Defendant); Farid Kohanbash (Defendant); Elena Kohanbash (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 02/25/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Caleb McClure (Plaintiff); As to: Auzar Midocht Kangavari (Defendant); Aaron Kohanbash (Defendant); Farid Kohanbash (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Caleb McClure (Plaintiff); As to: Auzar Midocht Kangavari (Defendant); Aaron Kohanbash (Defendant); Farid Kohanbash (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Caleb McClure (Plaintiff); As to: Auzar Midocht Kangavari (Defendant); Aaron Kohanbash (Defendant); Farid Kohanbash (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less