Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 21:22:55 (UTC).

CALDERON, KARINA VS DELEON BUEN, ROXANNE MELISSA

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 CALDERON, KARINA filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against DELEON BUEN, ROXANNE MELISSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WEINER, TIMOTHY M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0370

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WEINER, TIMOTHY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CALDERON KARINA

Respondent

DELEON BUEN ROXANNE MELISSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BRILLAULT ASHLIE NICOLE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/30/2021: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

4/30/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/30/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service

4/15/2021: Proof of Service

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

4/6/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/6/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

3/19/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Civil Harassment

3/19/2021: Petition - Civil Harassment

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

3/19/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - ADDENDUM

3/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - ADDENDUM

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

3/19/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • Hearing05/24/2021 at 8:30 AM in As Assigned (S14,S15,S16) at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Weiner, Timothy M., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (ADDENDUM )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRILLAULT ASHLIE N.