This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2022 at 16:14:57 (UTC).

CALDEN FOOD SERVICES, INC., ET AL. VS FARMERS GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 CALDEN FOOD SERVICES, INC , filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FARMERS GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1762

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGOURA HOSPITALITY GROUP INC. DBA TWISTED OAK TAVERN

LEGEND ASSOCIATES INC. DBA DENNY'S

WEAZROCK INC. DBA THE HILLS LOCAL PUB

PIQUEOS LLC DBA PIQUEOS

CURIEL ENRIQUE DBA CASA JIMENEZ

SPECTRUM NAILS SPA

JRUCW INC. DBA STARBUCKS

BF HOSPITALITY L.P. DBA BAYMONT INN & SUITES

CELEBRITY BURGER DBA WAHLBURGS

JRUCW PIZZA INC. DBA BLAZE PIZZA

TINSELTOWN SUNSET INC. DBA WAHLBURGERS

MALBEC CENTRAL LLC DBA MALBEC CENTRAL

BODEGA MALBEC LLC DBA MALBEC MARKET

CRAFT ON DRAUGHT LLC DBA VALLEY TAVERN

URBAN HILL LLC

CALDEN FOOD SERVICES INC. DBA DENNY'S

MALBEC RESTAURANTS INC. DBA MALBEC

Defendants

FARMERS GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A CALIFORNIA RECIPROCAL INSURER AND EXCHANGE

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILLIAMS JESSICA SUZANNE

GOMEZ JOHN

Defendant Attorney

MADDIGAN MICHAEL M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

3/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/28/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RELATING CASES)

6/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RELATING CASES)

Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASES

8/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/18/2021

8/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/18/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF AUGUST 18, 2021 ORDER GRANTING FARMERS DEFENDANTS' THIRD PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASES

8/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF AUGUST 18, 2021 ORDER GRANTING FARMERS DEFENDANTS' THIRD PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/23/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

2/8/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Calden Food Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); Bodega Malbec LLC (Plaintiff); Malbec Restaurants, Inc. (Plaintiff); Malbec Central, LLC (Plaintiff); Malbec Restaurants 2 (Plaintiff); CCA Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff); JRUCW Pizza Inc. (Plaintiff); JRUCW, Inc. (Plaintiff); JRUCW, Inc. (Plaintiff); ROCNEVA, Inc. (Plaintiff); K Star Coffee Company, Inc. (Plaintiff); Celebrity Burger (Plaintiff); Tinseltown Sunset, Inc. (Plaintiff); Cristcat Hollywood, Inc. (Plaintiff); Pacific Rock, Inc. (Plaintiff); Supermall Rockets, Inc. (Plaintiff); American Road Trip, Inc. (Plaintiff); Agoura Hospitality Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Weazrock, Inc. (Plaintiff); C-Brothers Corp. (Plaintiff); Enrique Curiel (Plaintiff); Barranco, Inc. (Plaintiff); Granja, Inc. (Plaintiff); Parada Kitchen, Inc. (Plaintiff); Piqueos LLC (Plaintiff); Altamirano LLC (Plaintiff); Brasas Do Brazil Churrascaria (Plaintiff); Simply Casual, Inc. (Plaintiff); Legend Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); AK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of August 18, 2021 Order Granting Farmers Defendants' Third Petition to Coordinate Add-On Cases; Filed by: Farmers Group, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Truck Insurance Exchange, a California reciprocal insurer and exchange (Defendant); Farmers Insurance Exchange, a California reciprocal insurer and exchange (Defendant); Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 08/18/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Submission of Petition to Coordinate Add-on Cases; Filed by: Farmers Group, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Truck Insurance Exchange, a California reciprocal insurer and exchange (Defendant); Farmers Insurance Exchange, a California reciprocal insurer and exchange (Defendant); Mid-Century Insurance Company, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketAddress for John Gomez (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 69

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Calden Food Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); Bodega Malbec LLC (Plaintiff); Malbec Restaurants, Inc. (Plaintiff); Malbec Central, LLC (Plaintiff); Malbec Restaurants 2 (Plaintiff); CCA Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff); JRUCW Pizza Inc. (Plaintiff); JRUCW, Inc. (Plaintiff); JRUCW, Inc. (Plaintiff); ROCNEVA, Inc. (Plaintiff); K Star Coffee Company, Inc. (Plaintiff); Celebrity Burger (Plaintiff); Tinseltown Sunset, Inc. (Plaintiff); Cristcat Hollywood, Inc. (Plaintiff); Pacific Rock, Inc. (Plaintiff); Supermall Rockets, Inc. (Plaintiff); American Road Trip, Inc. (Plaintiff); Agoura Hospitality Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Weazrock, Inc. (Plaintiff); C-Brothers Corp. (Plaintiff); Enrique Curiel (Plaintiff); Barranco, Inc. (Plaintiff); Granja, Inc. (Plaintiff); Parada Kitchen, Inc. (Plaintiff); Piqueos LLC (Plaintiff); Altamirano LLC (Plaintiff); Brasas Do Brazil Churrascaria (Plaintiff); Simply Casual, Inc. (Plaintiff); Legend Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); AKFA Holding, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Calden Food Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); Bodega Malbec LLC (Plaintiff); Malbec Restaurants, Inc. (Plaintiff); Malbec Central, LLC (Plaintiff); Malbec Restaurants 2 (Plaintiff); CCA Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff); JRUCW Pizza Inc. (Plaintiff); JRUCW, Inc. (Plaintiff); JRUCW, Inc. (Plaintiff); ROCNEVA, Inc. (Plaintiff); K Star Coffee Company, Inc. (Plaintiff); Celebrity Burger (Plaintiff); Tinseltown Sunset, Inc. (Plaintiff); Cristcat Hollywood, Inc. (Plaintiff); Pacific Rock, Inc. (Plaintiff); Supermall Rockets, Inc. (Plaintiff); American Road Trip, Inc. (Plaintiff); Agoura Hospitality Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Weazrock, Inc. (Plaintiff); C-Brothers Corp. (Plaintiff); Enrique Curiel (Plaintiff); Barranco, Inc. (Plaintiff); Granja, Inc. (Plaintiff); Parada Kitchen, Inc. (Plaintiff); Piqueos LLC (Plaintiff); Altamirano LLC (Plaintiff); Brasas Do Brazil Churrascaria (Plaintiff); Simply Casual, Inc. (Plaintiff); Legend Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); AKFA Hol

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Calden Food Services, Inc. (Plaintiff); Bodega Malbec LLC (Plaintiff); Malbec Restaurants, Inc. (Plaintiff); Malbec Central, LLC (Plaintiff); Malbec Restaurants 2 (Plaintiff); CCA Foods, Inc. (Plaintiff); JRUCW Pizza Inc. (Plaintiff); JRUCW, Inc. (Plaintiff); JRUCW, Inc. (Plaintiff); ROCNEVA, Inc. (Plaintiff); K Star Coffee Company, Inc. (Plaintiff); Celebrity Burger (Plaintiff); Tinseltown Sunset, Inc. (Plaintiff); Cristcat Hollywood, Inc. (Plaintiff); Pacific Rock, Inc. (Plaintiff); Supermall Rockets, Inc. (Plaintiff); American Road Trip, Inc. (Plaintiff); Agoura Hospitality Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Weazrock, Inc. (Plaintiff); C-Brothers Corp. (Plaintiff); Enrique Curiel (Plaintiff); Barranco, Inc. (Plaintiff); Granja, Inc. (Plaintiff); Parada Kitchen, Inc. (Plaintiff); Piqueos LLC (Plaintiff); Altamirano LLC (Plaintiff); Brasas Do Brazil Churrascaria (Plaintiff); Simply Casual, Inc. (Plaintiff); Legend Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff); AKFA Holding, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Fahey in Department 69 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AGOURA HOSPITALITY GROUP INC. DBA TWISTED OAK TAVERN is a litigant

Latest cases where JRUCW INC. DBA STARBUCKS is a litigant