This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2023 at 09:38:55 (UTC).

CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFONRIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION VS NILOUFAR GHAFOURI

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFONRIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NILOUFAR GHAFOURI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE W. MANDEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1840

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE W. MANDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

GHAFOURI NILOUFAR

Not Classified By Court

AMERICAN ROOFING PRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANSON DON EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

PIERCE DAVID HOWARD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Status Report

6/20/2023: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Status Report

4/13/2023: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Status Report

1/10/2023: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Status Report

11/21/2022: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Status Report

9/28/2022: Status Report

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

7/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 07/05/2022

7/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 07/05/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Status Report

6/14/2022: Status Report

Joint Status Conference Report

6/15/2022: Joint Status Conference Report

Notice - NOTICE OF OBJECTION AND OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

5/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF OBJECTION AND OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/19/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2024
  • Hearing04/08/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2023
  • Hearing11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/29/2024 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/08/2024 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P updated: Result Date to 07/06/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by: Calabasas Park Estates Owners Association (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketOrder for Publication; Signed and Filed by: CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, a Califonria non-profit mutual benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NILOUFAR GHAFOURI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by: CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, a Califonria non-profit mutual benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NILOUFAR GHAFOURI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order for Publication: Status Date changed from 02/14/2022 to 02/03/2022; As To Parties changed from NILOUFAR GHAFOURI (Defendant) to NILOUFAR GHAFOURI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, a Califonria non-profit mutual benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NILOUFAR GHAFOURI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, a Califonria non-profit mutual benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NILOUFAR GHAFOURI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, a Califonria non-profit mutual benefit corporation (Plaintiff); As to: NILOUFAR GHAFOURI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less