Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2019 at 01:20:12 (UTC).

CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC VS THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 CAL NET ENTERPRISES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6978

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAL NET ENTERPRISES LLC

Defendants

THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC.

WROAN DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NEUFELD TIMOTHY L

Attorney at Neufeld Marks

315 W 9Th St Ste 501

Los Angeles, CA 90015

NEUFELD TIMOTHY L. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

RICHLAND FELIPA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

8/2/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/26/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/31/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Proof of Service by Mail

8/1/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

4/26/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Minute Order

4/2/2019: Minute Order

Notice

4/3/2019: Notice

Case Management Statement

3/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

1/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Related Case

12/6/2018: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

12/24/2018: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

12/24/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Proof of Personal Service

12/18/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

12/3/2018: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to complaint;) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice; Complaint; Entire action of all parties and all causes of action;); Filed by Cal Net Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Cal Net Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Cal Net Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Cal Net Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Third Wave Technology Services, Inc. (Defendant); David Wroan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cal Net Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Docketat 09:18 AM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 12/24/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 12/24/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cal Net Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Cal Net Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cal Net Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cal Net Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAL NET ENTERPRISE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THIRD WAVE TECHNOLOGY SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEUFELD TIMOTHY L.