Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 10:39:51 (UTC).

CAITLIN JIMENEZ, ET AL. VS JESUS NAVA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 CAITLIN JIMENEZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESUS NAVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9275

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JIMENEZ CAITLIN

RAMIREZ CRISTIAN

Defendants

SOLORZANO DINA

NAVA JESUS

DOMINO'S PIZZA FRANCHISING LLC.

DOMINOS PIZZA INC.

DOMINOS PIZZA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOSHKARYAN VAHAGN

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

3/26/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

3/9/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/9/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2024
  • Hearing03/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • Hearing08/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Caitlin Jimenez (Plaintiff); Cristian Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Caitlin Jimenez (Plaintiff); Cristian Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Caitlin Jimenez (Plaintiff); Cristian Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Caitlin Jimenez (Plaintiff); Cristian Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Domino's Pizza Franchising LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DOMINOS PIZZA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOSHKARYAN VAHAGN