This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 00:30:18 (UTC).

CAHUENGA BICYCLE, LLC VS TOKIO LOS ANGELES, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 CAHUENGA BICYCLE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOKIO LOS ANGELES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6414

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAHUENGA BICYCLE LLC

Defendants

TOKIO LOS ANGELES LLC

STRATTON DAVID

WANG JERRY

MUNIZ NORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERKE MICHAEL NORMAN

Defendant Attorneys

CORDER TRAVIS

SMITH KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/24/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/14/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Case Management Statement

3/14/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/14/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/30/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

2/13/2019: Answer

Notice - Notice of Case Management Conference

2/1/2019: Notice - Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/25/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

1/8/2019: Answer

Complaint

11/28/2018: Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/28/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/28/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/5/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/7/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/4/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/4/2018: Proof of Personal Service

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Cahuenga Bicycle, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Jerry Wang (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jerry Wang (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kevin Smith (Attorney); David Stratton (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Cahuenga Bicycle, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Stratton (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Cahuenga Bicycle, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jerry Wang (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cahuenga Bicycle, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cahuenga Bicycle, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Cahuenga Bicycle, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Cahuenga Bicycle, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Cahuenga Bicycle, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Cahuenga Bicycle, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAHUENGA BICYCLE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERKE MICHAEL N